Chaine v. TESLA ENERGY OPERATIONS, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-09082

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2021 at 12:41 PM EST (4.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Oliver Chaine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Wiener and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Francis Brennan +1 818 249 5291 +1 818 249 4329 rbrennan@brennanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services LLC, Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/3/2021, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Dismiss Party
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Compel arbitration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Compel arbitration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Compel arbitration
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Summons Request
                                                                              Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties[3], Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)[2], Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Oliver Chaine. (Brennan, Robert)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Summons Request
                                                                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties[3], Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)[2], Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Oliver Chaine. (Brennan, Robert)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Oliver Chaine, (Brennan, Robert)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Oliver Chaine. (Brennan, Robert)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                      COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28363968 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Oliver Chaine. (Attorney Robert F Brennan added to party Oliver Chaine(pty:pla))(Brennan, Robert)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?