Kristian Edwards et al v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV371054

Tags
Last Updated September 14, 2021 at 6:38 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edwards, Jason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space POORAD RAZAVI +1 561 515 1400 +1 561 515 1401 prazavi@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space POORAD RAZAVI +1 561 515 1400 +1 561 515 1401 prazavi@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo Edwards, Kristian, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space POORAD RAZAVI +1 561 515 1400 +1 561 515 1401 prazavi@cohenmilstein.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren O. Miller

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowman and Brooke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Galvin +1 408 279 5393
Case Type Product Liability Unlimited (24)
Case Status Transfer In
Case Location Civil
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POS
Re: Hrg 6-10-21 Granted Pro Hac Vice Appl for Adam J. Langino
    Blank 28 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POS
    Re: Hrg 6-10-21 Granted Pro Hac Vice Appl for Theodore J. Leopold
      Blank 27 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
        Blank 26 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
          Blank 25 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
            Case Management Statement
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
              Case Management Statement
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                Notice: Entry of Order
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                  Stipulation and protective order is GRANTED, signed Judge Rudy. [Env# 6090043]
                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
                    of Adam L. Langino. Hearing 6-10-21 D7
                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                      of Adam J. Langino ISO PHV Application.
                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                          of Elise Sanguinetti ISO PHV Application.
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
                            of Theodore J. Leopold. Hearing 6-10-21 D7
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                              of Theodore J. Leopold ISO PHV Application.
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                  of Elise Sanguinetti ISO PHV Application.
                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                        Amended Case Management Statement
                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                          Case Management Statement
                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                            Case Management Statement
                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                              Notice of Appearance of Elise R. Sanguinetti for Plaintiff's Kristian Edwards and Jason Edwards
                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                to complaint, Atty Miller
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                  $150 paid
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Transfer
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Transfer In
                                                      From Alameda County.
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Bulk Scanned Documents
                                                        From June 26, 2020 to June 26, 2020. [Complaints / Summons]
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Bulk Scanned Documents
                                                          From June 29, 2020 to September 11, 2020. [Stipulation & Order Re: Transfer / Register of Actions]

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?