Maslic v. ISM vuzem d.o.o.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20072866

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Drzaic, Ivan, Plaintiff
No Logo Hernaus, Robert, Plaintiff
No Logo Hubek, Leopold, Plaintiff
No Logo Hudoldetnjak, Leon, Plaintiff
No Logo Koscak, Elvis, Plaintiff
No Logo Maslic, Sasa, Plaintiff
No Logo Maslic, Sesa, Plaintiff
No Logo Panic, Tomica, Plaintiff
No Logo Panic, Tornica, Plaintiff
No Logo Papes, Stjepan, Plaintiff
No Logo Pogorevc, Mitja, Plaintiff
No Logo Puljko, Zeljko, Plaintiff
No Logo Rebic, Gogo, Plaintiff
No Logo Sincek, Darko, Plaintiff
No Logo Stante, David, Plaintiff
No Logo Zivani, Nedeljko, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Eisenmann Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Hrid-mont D.o.o., Defendant
No Logo ISM Vuzem d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo Ism Vuzem Usa, Inc, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vuzem Usa, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Vuzem, Ivan, Defendant
No Logo Vuzem, Robert, Defendant
No Logo Dresser, William C., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
Summons on Complaint Issued (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
    First Amended Complaint Filed (35 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None ?
        Initial Case Management Conference 04/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 20 (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sesa Maslic (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
              Complaint - Other Employment Filed (34 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 112 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?