Farnsworth v. Biden et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-01351-RGA
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 26, 2021 at 5:19 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leo Brandon Farnsworth, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Curtis C. Dunn, Defendant
No Logo Delaware Forensic Examiner's Office, Defendant
No Logo Delaware State Police, Defendant
No Logo Hunter Biden, Defendant
No Logo Jill Biden, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph R. Biden, Jr."
Office Wilmington
Filed 10/6/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County New Castle
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag PRO-SE
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 1915
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Opinion - Memorandum Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None PLRA - Authorization Form
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Order - PLRA for Pay Authorization
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None PLRA - Trust Fund Account Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Order - PLRA Missing DocumentsCourt Filing
                    ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Copy to pltf.)(*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/13/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2020. (nms)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                      Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                        MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief - filed by Leo Brandon Farnsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Letter)(nmg)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Complaint - Pro Se
                            COMPLAINT filed Pro Se against Hunter Biden, Jill Biden, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Delaware Forensic Examiner's Office, Delaware State Police, Curtis C. Dunn - filed by Leo Brandon Farnsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Letter)(nmg)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020, Terminated: 10/14/2020 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Leo Brandon Farnsworth. (nmg)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 2,451 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?