USA v. Gilbert et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:20-cr-10098-WGY

Tags
Last Updated July 31, 2021 at 1:17 PM DT (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. D'Addio +1 617 748 3100 david.daddio@usdoj.gov
Space SETH B. KOSTO +1 973 645 2700 seth.kosto@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Brian Gilbert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas S. Brooks +1 617 338 9300 +1 617 338 9911 dbrooks@lhblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane+Kimball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miranda Kane +1 510 704 1400 mkane@kanekimball.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Brian Gilbert (1)
Office Boston
Filed 5/22/2020
County Middlesex
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 371- CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT CYBERSTALKING
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 371- CONSPIRACY TO TAMPER WITH A WITNESS
Defendant Custody Status
Flag VICTIM
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: 6/4/2021 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Brian Gilbert. Sentencing reset for 9/30/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Counsel shall notify the Court and Probation by 7/15/2021 of the suitability of the new sentencing date. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
      Transcript of Plea Change as to Brian Gilbert, Stephanie Stockwell held on October 29, 2020, before Judge William G. Young. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 5/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 59 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [58] Assented to Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Stephanie Popp (2). (Gaudet, Jennifer)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021, Terminated: 4/13/2021 motion to modify conditions of release
          Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Stephanie Popp. (Vyas, Rachna)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 57 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 set/reset hearingsCourt Filing
            Set/Reset Hearings as to Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea. Sentencing reset for 9/28/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
              LREF
              Blank 54 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Brian Gilbert Sentencing REset (per request of counsel) for 7/15/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Notice - other
                NOTICE of Change of Firm Association by Brian Gilbert as to Brian Gilbert, Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea (Kane, Miranda)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: 1/6/2021 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING (per request of counsel) as to Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea. Sentencing reset for 5/27/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Procedural Order re Sentencing HearingCourt Filing
                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Brian Gilbert. Sentencing set for 5/6/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Brian Gilbert (1). Personal recognizance bond as to Brian Gilbert. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 bond
                        Personal recognizance bond entered as to Brian Gilbert. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Procedural Order re Sentencing HearingCourt Filing
                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Stephanie Stockwell. Sentencing set for 3/11/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 bond
                            Personal recognizance bond entered as to Stephanie Stockwell. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                              Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Stephanie Stockwell (3). Personal recognizance as to Stephanie Stockwell. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Waiver of Indictment
                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Brian Gilbert. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Waiver of Indictment
                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Stephanie Stockwell. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 plea agreement
                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Stephanie Stockwell (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 plea agreement
                                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Brian Gilbert. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Waiver of Indictment and Plea to InformationCourt Filing
                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information as to Stephanie Stockwell held by video on 10/29/2020. The defendant consents to proceed by video and is sworn. The Court conducts colloquy with defendant. Defendant waives indictment, waiver is filed. The government announces top of sentencing guideline without regard to any mitigating factors. Defendant waives reading of information. After hearing facts of the case, the Court finds the defendant knowingly, intelligently and voluntarily exercises her right to plead guilty. Plea entered by Stephanie Stockwell (3) Count 1,2 Guilty. Sentencing is set for March 11, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Defendant is released on conditions. (Attorneys present: Ausa Kosto for the government, Attorneys Miner and Shifman for the defendant and US probation officer Fitzpatrick. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 40 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Waiver of Indictment and Plea to InformationCourt Filing
                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information as to Brian Gilbert held by video on 10/29/2020. The defendant consents to proceed by video and is sworn. The Court conducts colloquy with defendant. Defendant waives indictment, waiver is filed. The government announces top of sentencing guideline without regard to any mitigating factors. Defendant waives reading of information. After hearing facts of the case, the Court finds the defendant knowingly, intelligently and voluntarily exercises his right to plead guilty. Plea entered by Brian Gilbert (1) Count 1, 2 (1) Guilty. Sentencing is set for May 6, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Defendant is released on conditions. (Attorneys present: Ausa Kosto for the government and Attorney Kane for the defendant, US Probation Officer Fitzpatrick. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Veronica Zea (4). Personal recognizance bond as to Veronica Zea. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 bond
                                              Personal recognizance bond entered as to Veronica Zea. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Stephanie Popp (2). Personal recognizance bond as to Stephanie Popp. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 bond
                                                  Personal recognizance Bond entered as to Stephanie Popp. (Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 10/28/2020 to change the type of bond (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                      Transcript of Plea Change as to Stephanie Popp held on October 8, 2020, before Judge William G. Young. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Procedural Order re Sentencing HearingCourt Filing
                                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Stephanie Popp, Veronica Zea. Sentencing set for 2/25/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Waiver of Indictment
                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Veronica Zea. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 plea agreement
                                                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Veronica Zea. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Waiver of Indictment and Plea to InformationCourt Filing
                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information as to Veronica Zea held by video on 10/8/2020. Defendant consents to proceed by video. Plea agreement filed. Defendant is sworn. The Court conducts colloquy with the defendant. Defendant waives indictment, waiver filed. The government announces top of applicable guideline without mitigating factors and guideline range with discount for guilty plea. Defendant waives reading of information. After hearing facts of the case, the Court finds the defendant knowingly, intelligently and voluntarily exercises her right to plead guilty. Plea entered by Veronica Zea (4) Guilty Count 1 and 2. Sentencing is set for February 25, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Defendant released on conditions recommended by probation. (Attorneys present: Ausa Kosto for the government, Attorney Ubhaus for the defendant and US Probation Officer Sousa. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Stephanie Popp. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 plea agreement
                                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Stephanie Popp. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Waiver of Indictment and Plea to InformationCourt Filing
                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information as to Stephanie Popp held by video on 10/8/2020. Defendant consents to proceed by video. Plea agreement filed. Defendant is sworn. The Court conducts colloquy with the defendant. Defendant waives indictment, waiver filed. The government announces top of applicable guideline without mitigating factors and guideline range with discount for guilty plea. Defendant waives reading of information. After hearing facts of the case, the Court finds the defendant knowingly, intelligently and voluntarily exercises her right to plead guilty. Plea entered by Stephanie Popp (2) Guilty Count 1 and 2. Sentencing is set for February 25, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Defendant released on conditions recommended by probation. (Attorneys present: Ausa Kosto for the government, Attorneys Bookbinder and Vyas for the defendant and US Probation Officer Sousa. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 10/23/2020 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [25] Assented to Motion to Continue as to Stephanie Stockwell (3).Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information hearing reset for 10/29/2020 at 3:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020, Terminated: 10/7/2020 Motion to Continue
                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Continue to October 29, 2020 to Rule 11 Hearng as to Stephanie Stockwell. (Shifman, Gail)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rachna Vyas appearing for Stephanie Popp. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Vyas, Rachna)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [20] Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Stephanie Popp (2). (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Brian Gilbert. Time excluded from 10/8/2020 until 10/29/2020. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [19] Motion to Continue as to Brian Gilbert (1).Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information hearing reset for 10/29/2020 at 3:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020, Terminated: 10/6/2020 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney as to Stephanie Popp. (Bookbinder, Adam)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020, Terminated: 10/6/2020 Motion to Continue
                                                                                    MOTION to Continue to 10-29-2020 to Rule 11 hearing as to Brian Gilbert. (Kane, Miranda)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Brian Gilbert, Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea: Waiver of Indictment and Plea to Information hearing set for 10/8/2020 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Counsel is to contact U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services as soon as possible http://www.map.uscourts.gov/psi-interview-schedule to determine scheduling of the presentence interview. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [16] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Frank R. Ubhaus. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to Veronica Zea (4) (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020, Terminated: 9/14/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank R. Ubhaus Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-8413313. as to Veronica Zea. (Scammon, Kristen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: # (1) Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 16 replaced on 9/14/2020) (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gail Shifman appearing for Stephanie Stockwell. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Shifman, Gail)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Gail Shifman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to Stephanie Stockwell (3) (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kristen S. Scammon appearing for Veronica Zea. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Scammon, Kristen)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020, Terminated: 9/10/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gail Shifman Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-8410934. as to Stephanie Stockwell. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Miner, Tracy)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tracy A. Miner appearing for Stephanie Stockwell. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Miner, Tracy)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2020, Entered: 9/6/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Miranda Kane appearing for Brian Gilbert. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Kane, Miranda)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [7] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Miranda Kane. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. as to Brian Gilbert (1) (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Adam J. Bookbinder appearing for Stephanie Popp. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Bookbinder, Adam)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020, Terminated: 9/3/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Miranda Kane Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-8401015, by Brian Gilbert. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Certificate of Miranda Kane))(Brooks, Douglas) Modified on 9/10/2020 to Correct Parties Filers as Counsel Incorrectly Filed the Motion as to All Defendants - The Motion ONLY Applies to Defendant Gilbert (Paine, Matthew).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas S. Brooks appearing for Brian Gilbert. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Brooks, Douglas)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [4] MOTION to Unseal Case Upon Arrest as to Brian Gilbert (1), Stephanie Popp (2), Stephanie Stockwell (3), Veronica Zea (4) (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020, Terminated: 6/15/2020 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Unseal Case Upon Arrest as to Brian Gilbert, Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea by USA. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Brian Gilbert, Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea; Judge William G. Young assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020, Terminated: 6/15/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal as to Brian Gilbert, Stephanie Popp, Stephanie Stockwell, Veronica Zea by USA. (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/22/2020 Information - Felony - Sealed
                                                                                                                        INFORMATION - Felony (Sealed) as to Brian Gilbert (1) count(s) 1, 2, Stephanie Popp (2) count(s) 1, 2, Stephanie Stockwell (3) count(s) 1, 2, Veronica Zea (4) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # (1) JS45 Gilbert, # (2) JS45 Popp, # (3) JS45 Stockwell, # (4) JS45 Zea)(DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?