USA v. BROIDY
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cr-00210-CKK

Tags
Last Updated June 15, 2021 at 1:15 PM DT (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Dixon Keller +1 202 598 2231 +1 202 514 3003 john.keller2@usdoj.gov
Space Nicole Rae Lockhart +1 202 514 0188 nicole.lockhart@usdoj.gov
Space James Craig Mann +1 510 637 3705 +1 510 637 3724 James.Mann@usdoj.gov
Space Sean F. Mulryne +1 202 598 2816 +1 202 514 3003 sean.mulryne@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Broidy, Elliott, Defendant
Officially listed as "ELLIOTT BROIDY"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

ELLIOTT BROIDY (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/6/2020
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371; CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES; Conspiracy to Serve as an Unregistered Agent of a Foreign Principal
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Travel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Trial by Jury
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Statement of Offense
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 information - felony
                            INFORMATION as to ELLIOTT BROIDY (1) count(s) 1. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION). (bb)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 93 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?