IN RE: WIRECARD AG SECURITIES LITIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-05017-AB
District Judge Anita B. Brody, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 12, 2021 at 10:59 AM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LAWRENCE GALLAGHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucas E Gilmore +1 510 725 3000 +1 510 725 3001 lucasg@hbsslaw.com
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
Space Danielle Smith +1 510 725 3038 +1 510 725 3001 danielles@hbsslaw.com
No Logo Mark DalPoggetto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucas E Gilmore +1 510 725 3000 +1 510 725 3001 lucasg@hbsslaw.com
Space Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 896 6300 +1 415 896 6301 reed@hbsslaw.com
Space Danielle Smith +1 510 725 3038 +1 510 725 3001 danielles@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
v.
No Logo ALEXANDER VON KNOOP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kahn +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 393 8306
No Logo BURKHARD LEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kahn +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 393 8306
No Logo ERNST & YOUNG GMBH WIRTSCHAFTSPRUEFUNGSGESELLSCHAFT, Defendant
No Logo JAN MARSALEK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kahn +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 393 8306
No Logo MARKUS BRAUN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kahn +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 393 8306
No Logo SUSANNE STEIDL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kahn +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 393 8306
Wirecard AG Wirecard AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Kahn +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 393 8306
No Logo Wulf, Matthias, Defendant
Office Philadelphia
Filed 10/9/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Outside the State of PA.
Terminated
Origin 5
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
220-cv-03326-AB
Other Court Case 2:19-cv-00986[California Central]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags MEMBERCASE,STANDARD
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Remark
Document Nos. 92 & 93 mailed to counsel. (kw, )
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Order
    ORDER THAT CIVIL ACTION NO 20-CV-5017 IS CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVIL ACTION 20-CV-3326. EVERY PLEADING IN THIS ACTION MUST HAVE THE CAPTION IN RE WIRECARD AG SECURITIES LITIGATION, CIVIL ACTION 20-CV-3326; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/17/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Order Reassigning Case
      ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/16/20. 10/16/20 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(JL )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 Notice - other
        NOTICE by Thanh Sam Notice of Related Case and Request for Consolidation (STENGEL, LAWRENCE)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020 Notice - other
          NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS WULF MATTHIAS AND ERNST & YOUNG GMBH WIRTSCHAFTSPRUEFUNGSGESELLSCHAFT, PURSUANT TO RULE 4(m) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, UNLESS SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT IS MADE BY 11/12/2020. (aeg)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 case transferred in - district transfer
            Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-00986. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 Order on Motion to TransferCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION [85] TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 AND GRANTING LIMITED REQUEST TO LIFT STAY by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The stay is lifted for the limited purpose of this Court's consideration of the Motion to Transfer. The above-captioned action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Response to motion
                NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Current Stay for the Limited Purpose of Considering the Instant Motion [85] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Notice - other
                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Transfer [85]. The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020, Terminated: 10/8/2020 Motion to Transfer
                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Current Stay for the Limited Purpose of Considering the Instant Motion filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue and Limited Request to Lift Stay, # (2) Proposed Order) (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Notice - other
                      NOTICE of Filing of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene in the Second Filed Case in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) E.D. Pa. Withdrawal of Motion)(Smith, Danielle)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020 Notice - other
                        NOTICE Filing of Motion to Intervene in the Second Filed Case in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Smith, Danielle)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Amended Complaint
                          Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop, Wulf Matthias, Ernst & Young GmbH amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, [62], Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER REGARDING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND STAY OF BRIEFING PENDING SERVICE ON ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS [80] by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 14, 2020. *See Order for Details.* (iv)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 stipulation
                              STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Service on Additional Defendants filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 summons returned executed
                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher, upon Defendant Burkhard Ley served on 12/10/2019, answer due 4/29/2020; Susanne Steidl served on 12/10/2019, answer due 4/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wirecard AG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Smith, Danielle)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Application [74] is granted. No later than 8/14/2020, lead plaintiff shall file a motion to amend the First Amended Complaint. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [73] is denied as moot. (vdr)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                    REPLY In Further Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, Notice of Intent and Request to File Motion for Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint [74] filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 Notice - other
                                      NOTICE of Plaintiff's Failure to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 MEMORANDUM
                                        OPPOSITION TO re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, Notice of Intent and Request to File Motion for Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint [74] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brian M. Lutz ISO Defendants' Opposition, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020, Terminated: 5/11/2020 Motion To Stay
                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, Notice of Intent and Request to File Motion for Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex Parte Application, # (3) Declaration of Danielle Smith In Support of Ex Parte Application, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F, # (10) Exhibit G, # (11) Exhibit H, # (12) Exhibit I, # (13) Exhibit J) (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: 4/17/2020, Terminated: 5/11/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendants' Motion, # (2) Declaration of I. Stoeckl, # (3) Exhibit A to Decl. of I. Stoeckl, # (4) Declaration of G. Wagner, # (5) Exhibit 1 to Decl. of G. Wagner, # (6) Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion) (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/16/2020 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
                                              ORDER RE: PENDING MOTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint (Document No. [64]) is denied without prejudice. 2. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Staying the Case (Document No. [68]) is denied as moot. 3. Defendants shall file their Answer to the Complaint or a Rule 12(b)(6) motion without incorporating any documents by reference or attaching any exhibits no later than April 29, 2020. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Notice - other
                                                NOTICE of Plaintiff's Failure to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brian M. Lutz ISO Notice)(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                  REPLY In Further Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Publication and Review of KPMG Audit Results for Defendant Wirecard AG [68] filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Smith, Danielle)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 MEMORANDUM
                                                    OPPOSITION TO re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Publication and Review of KPMG Audit Results for Defendant Wirecard AG [68] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020, Terminated: 4/15/2020 Motion To Stay
                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Publication and Review of KPMG Audit Results for Defendant Wirecard AG filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Case, # (2) Declaration of Danielle Smith in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Case, # (3) Proposed Order) (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER STRIKING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: REQUEST to Stay Case [66]. The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. No pleading of a request attached; and (2) Local Rule 83-2.5 Communications with the Judge. Attorneys or parties to any action or proceeding shall refrain from writing letters to the judge. (vdr)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020, Terminated: 4/8/2020 Motion To Stay
                                                          *STRICKEN* REQUEST to Stay Case pending Publication and Review of KPMG Audit Results for Defendant Wirecard AG filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Smith, Danielle) Modified on 4/8/2020 (vdr). [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Praecipe/Request
                                                            REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [64] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Lutz, Brian)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020, Terminated: 4/15/2020 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # (2) Declaration of Brian M. Lutz ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # (3) Exhibit 1 to B. Lutz Decl., # (4) Exhibit 2 to B. Lutz Decl., # (5) Exhibit 3 to B. Lutz Decl., # (6) Exhibit 4 to B. Lutz Decl., # (7) Exhibit 5 to B. Lutz Decl., # (8) Exhibit 6 to B. Lutz Decl., # (9) Declaration of Iris Stoeckl ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # (10) Exhibit A to I. Stoeckl Decl., # (11) Declaration of Gerhard Wagner ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, # (12) Exhibit 1 to G. Wagner Decl., # (13) Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint) (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: 3/13/2020 Notice - other
                                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Chubb European Group Limited. (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17)(Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher, upon Defendant Markus Braun served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Suzana Ninkovic of Wirecard AG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Certificate of Service on Markus Braun (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher, upon Defendant Jan Marsalek served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Suzana Ninkovic of Wirecard AG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Certificate of Service on Jan Marsalek (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher, upon Defendant Alexander von Knoop served on 12/24/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Suzana Ninkovic of Wirecard AG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Certificate of Service on Alexander von Knoop (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE: STIPULATION [53] by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Lead plaintiff shall file its first amended complaint no later than 2/14/2020. *See order for other deadlines.* (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICAITON by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Application [54] is granted as set forth. Plaintiff shall effect service of process no later than March 15, 2020, and file proofs of service no later than March 17, 2020. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                              REPLY In Further Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extending Time for International Service of Process [54] filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                Defendants' Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extending Time for International Service of Process [54] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 1/27/2020 Motion for order
                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extending Time for International Service of Process filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for International Service of Process, # (2) Declaration of Danielle Smith in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for International Service of Process, # (3) Proposed Order) (Smith, Danielle)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 stipulation
                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Clarify Schedule for the Filing of an Amended Complaint and the Motion to Dismiss Briefing filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher, upon Defendant Wirecard AG served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ninkovic Suzana, of Wirecard AG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT WIRECARD AG (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Smith, Danielle)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for International Service of Process is granted. Plaintiff shall effect service of process no later than 1/15/2020. (cw)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                          REPLY In Further Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extending Time for International Service of Process [48] filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                            OPPOSITION to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extending Time for International Service of Process [48] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Motion for order
                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extending Time for International Service of Process filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for International Service of Process, # (2) Declaration of Danielle Smith in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for International Service of Process, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Proposed Order Extending Time for International Service of Process) (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                NOTICE Regarding Service of Foreign Defendants Pursuant to Hague Convention International Process filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint [1] (Germany) as to Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: 7/18/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION [41] by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The application is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff shall effect service no later than 11/8/2019. (vdr)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                        REPLY In Support of Ex Parte Application filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Appointing Hague Convention International Process Server [41] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019, Terminated: 7/15/2019 Motion for order
                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Appointing Hague Convention International Process Server filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Appointing International Process Server, # (2) Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application for Order Appointing Hague Convention International Process Server, # (3) Declaration of Danielle Smith In Support Of Ex Parte Application for Order Appointing Hague Convention International Process Server, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F, # (10) Exhibit G) (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 Order on Motion for ServiceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Ex Parte Application by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Having considered the briefing filed with respect to lead plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher's (plaintiff) Ex Parte Application for Leave to Effect Electronic Service (Dkt. 38, Application), the Application (Document No. 38) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. Plaintiff shall effect service of process no later than September 9, 2019. Service must be made in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Effect Electronic Service on Defendants Resident Outside the United States [38] filed by Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brian M. Lutz, # (2) Exhibit A)(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019, Terminated: 6/12/2019 Motion for Service
                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION to Effect Electronic Service on Defendants Resident Outside the United States filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Proposed Order) (Smith, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Wirecard AG.(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING STIPULATION [34] by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,, [32], Notice of Appearance,, [33]. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Continue Deadline for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wirecard AG. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Kahn on behalf of Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop (Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Markus Braun(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Burkhard Ley(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Jan Marsalek(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Susanne Steidl(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Wirecard AG(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kahn added to party Alexander von Knoop(pty:dft))(Kahn, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian Michael Lutz on behalf of Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop (Attorney Brian Michael Lutz added to party Markus Braun(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Michael Lutz added to party Burkhard Ley(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Michael Lutz added to party Jan Marsalek(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Michael Lutz added to party Susanne Steidl(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Michael Lutz added to party Wirecard AG(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Michael Lutz added to party Alexander von Knoop(pty:dft))(Lutz, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher, upon Defendant Markus Braun served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019; Burkhard Ley served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019; Jan Marsalek served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019; Susanne Steidl served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019; Wirecard AG served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019; Alexander von Knoop served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, agent for service of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., agent for service of Wirecard AG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendant Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                      21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendant Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 6/7/2019, plaintiff shall file proof of service of the summons and complaint on defendants. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Lead Plaintiff Lawrence Gallagher. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lucas E Gilmore counsel for Movant Lawrence Gallagher. Adding Lucas E. Gilmore as counsel of record for Movant Lawrence Gallagher for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Attorney Lucas E Gilmore added to party Lawrence Gallagher(pty:mov))(Gilmore, Lucas) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Order on motion to appoint counselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION [16] OF LAWRENCE GALLAGHER FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court hereby appoints Lawrence Gallagher as Lead Plaintiff in this action. Lead Plaintiff has selected and retained Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Lead Counsel, and the Court approves those selections. *See Order for Details.* (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagherto Order to Show Cause[22] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Amended)(Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/7/2019. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff[16] filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. correcting Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties[11] (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher, (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Reed R. Kathrein In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff[16] filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Notice of Pendency), # (2) Exhibit B (Certification), # (3) Exhibit C (Loss Chart), # (4) Exhibit D (Firm Resume))(Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff[16] filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019, Terminated: 5/6/2019 Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Lead Plaintiff [12]. The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Judge Olguin hears civil motions on Thursday's, not Tuesday's. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Reed R. Kathrein In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff[12] filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff[12] filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019, Terminated: 4/10/2019 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                      **STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Attorney Reed R Kathrein added to party Lawrence Gallagher(pty:mov)) (Kathrein, Reed) Modified on 4/10/2019 (vdr). [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Lawrence Gallagher, (Attorney Reed R Kathrein added to party Lawrence Gallagher(pty:bkmov))(Kathrein, Reed) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Mark DalPoggettoto Order to Show Cause[9] (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/18/2019. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 set motion and R&R deadlines/hearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) [1] as to Defendants Markus Braun, Burkhard Ley, Jan Marsalek, Susanne Steidl, Wirecard AG, Alexander von Knoop. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mark DalPoggetto, (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Mark DalPoggetto. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mark DalPoggetto. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Complaint (Attorney)
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23185610 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mark DalPoggetto. (Attachments: # (1) PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Mark DalPoggetto(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)[Transferred from California Central on 10/9/2020.]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?