Shin v. ICON Foundation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-07363-WHO
District Judge William H. Orrick, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 1, 2021 at 7:52 PM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Shin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Stone +1 646 350 0527 dstone@rcfllp.com
Space Katherine Ann Eskovitz +1 646 791 6883 +1 646 392 8842 keskovitz@rcfllp.com
Space Edward John Normand +1 646 970 7513 tnormand@rcfllp.com
Space Ivy T. Ngo +1 646 350 0527 +1 646 392 8842 ingo@rcfllp.com
Space Kyle William Roche +1 646 970 7509 kyle@rcfllp.com
v.
No Logo ICON Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Misa Kanik Eiritz +1 310 312 4124 +1 310 312 4224 meiritz@manatt.com
Space Michael A Mix +1 212 735 8747 mmix@morrisoncohen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher L. Wanger +1 415 291 7400 +1 415 291 7474 cwanger@manatt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason P. Gottlieb +1 212 735 8837 +1 212 735 8600 jgottlieb@morrisoncohen.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 10/20/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,PRVADR
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: 5/11/2021 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING [36] MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING [37] MOTION TO STRIKE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
      Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/28/21, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, e-mail joann.bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [54] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2021. (Related documents(s) [54]) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/28/2021 before Judge William H. Orrick by ICON Foundation, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/2021 before Judge William H. Orrick by Mark Shin, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Motion HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2021 re [37] MOTION to Strike and [36] MOTION to Dismiss. Motions taken under submission; written orders to follow. Total Time in Court: 35 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2021)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 52 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
              CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jean_davis@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10:00 a.m. 4/28/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                  REPLY (re [36] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Mark Shin on January 8, 2021) filed by ICON Foundation. (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [48] Stipulation to extend deadlines as to [37] MOTION to Strike and [36] MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/26/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/19/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: 3/17/2021, Terminated: 3/19/2021 stipulation
                      JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON MOTIONS re [39] Stipulation and Order, re [47] Clerk's Notice, re [36] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Mark Shin on January 8, 2021 - Stipulation for One-Week Continuance of the Deadline for Defendant's Reply Briefs on the Motions filed by ICON Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Misa Eiritz in Support)(Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 47 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: 3/16/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                        CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING as to [37] MOTION to Strike and [36] MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 4/28/2021 02:00 PM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re [36] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Mark Shin on January 8, 2021) filed by Mark Shin. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                              Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [42] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael Mix. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [41] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jason Gottlieb. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021, Terminated: 3/5/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15655778) filed by ICON Foundation. (Mix, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021, Terminated: 3/5/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15655736) filed by ICON Foundation. (Gottlieb, Jason) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Notice - other
                                      Icon Foundation's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Rebecca Rettig (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [38] STIPULATION re: [37] MOTION to Strike [28] Amended Complaint. Response due by 3/5/2021. Reply due by 3/19/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/16/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021, Terminated: 2/16/2021 stipulation
                                          STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Motion to Strike Scheduling filed by Mark Shin. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021, Terminated: 5/11/2021 Motion to strike
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021, Terminated: 5/11/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Mark Shin on January 8, 2021 filed by ICON Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2021 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/26/2021. Replies due by 3/5/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Rettig, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: 2/9/2021 Notice - other
                                                NOTICE filed by ICON Foundation of Notice Regarding Choice of ADR Unit Pursuant to Minute Order re [33] Initial Case Management Conference (Rettig, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Wanger Notice of Appearance of Christopher L. Wanger on Behalf of Defendant Icon Foundation (Wanger, Christopher) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2021). Close of Fact Discovery: 10/1/2021. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 1/14/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2022 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/26/2022 09:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick.Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorneys: Kyle W. Roche and Daniel M. Stone. Defendant Attorneys: Rebecca Rettig and Miza K. Eiritz. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2021)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
                                                      CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                        Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [30] Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021, Terminated: 1/22/2021 stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss Scheduling filed by Mark Shin. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Mark Shin. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Amended Complaint
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT; JRY TRIAL DEMANDED against ICON Foundation. Filed by Mark Shin. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting [22] Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Miles Eiritz. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                  Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Mark Shin (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020, Terminated: 1/22/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by ICON Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/22/2021. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Eiritz, Misa) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                      L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by ICON Foundation (Eiritz, Misa) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ICON Foundation (Eiritz, Misa) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020, Terminated: 1/8/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number 0971-15343820) filed by ICON Foundation. (Rettig, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Misa Kanik Eiritz (Eiritz, Misa) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Shin re [19] Case Management Scheduling Order, (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/19/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/18/20. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Shin.. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/20/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting [13] Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Service of Process and Responsive Papers Schedule. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020, Terminated: 10/28/2020 stipulation
                                                                                            JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Service of Process and Responsive Papers Schedule filed by Mark Shin. (Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                              Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting [11] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel M. Stone representing Plaintiff. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020, Terminated: 10/27/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-15111207) filed by Mark Shin. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Stone, Daniel) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting [8] Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Kyle William Roche. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting [7] Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Edward John Normand. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 10/23/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-15106263) filed by Mark Shin. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Roche, Kyle) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020, Terminated: 10/23/2020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-15106085) filed by Mark Shin. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Normand, Edward) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Ann Eskovitz (Eskovitz, Katherine) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Defendant ICON Foundation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                              Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against ICON Foundation, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-15090206). Filed by Mark Shin. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Ngo, Ivy) (Filed on 10/20/2020) Modified on 10/21/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?