Shulyak v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-06040-MAT
District Judge Mary Alice Theiler, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2020 at 12:26 PM ST (4.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ivan Shulyak, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gretchen J. Hoog +1 206 962 5040 ghoog@corrdowns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Corr Downs PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P. Corr +1 206 962 5042 jcorr@corrdowns.com
Office Tacoma
Filed 10/21/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Pierce
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 20-2-07536-7[Pierce County Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulated Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Stipulated Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Verification of State Court Records
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Notice to Filer
                    NOTICE TO FILER: re [1] Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Notice to Filer
                        NOTICE TO FILER: re [1] Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP) Modified on 10/23/2020 (SP). (Please see Dkt.[5])
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
                          LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
                            NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Tesla Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/30/2020. (SP)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                              Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SP)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Civil Cover Sheet
                                CIVIL COVER SHEET re [1] Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Tesla, Inc.. (Corr, Joseph)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 notice of removal
                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-07536-7; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6683143), filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint)(Corr, Joseph)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?