District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Illinois Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit United States Supreme Court

Rashun Singleton v. Amita Health, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 19-1060

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 22, 2020 at 12:50 AM DT (5.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amita Health, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Z. Goldstein +1 312 345 9600
Space April Renee Walkup +1 312 345 9600 awalkup@hpslaw.com
No Logo Ann Marie Caulfield, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Jason Burris, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Ronald Bryson, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Singleton, Rashun, Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Rashun Singleton"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rashun Singleton kelis1992@yahoo.com
Nature of Suit 3442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1:17-cv-04514
Lower Court Case https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=1:17-cv-04514
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703623150 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None ?
FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/13/2020 Nonprecedential Disposition with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7084966-2] [7084966] [19-1060] (LJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703623138 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None ?
    Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [57] [7084959] [19-1060] (LJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703618732 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
      ORDER: re: Rule 41 motion to stay the mandate pending the filing of a petition for writ of certiorari in the Supreme Court. [55] The motion is DENIED. EBG [56] [7083092] [19-1060] (CG)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703617607 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None ?
        Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to stay the mandate pending the filing of a petition for writ of certiorari in the Supreme Court. [55] [7082658] [19-1060] (JR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703614033 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None ?
          ORDER: On consideration of the petition for rehearing filed on April 28, 2020, and the petition for rehearing en banc filed on April 28, 2020, in the above-entitled cause by pro se appellant, Rashun Singleton, no judge in active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc and all members of the original panel have voted to deny rehearing. It is, therefore, ORDERED that rehearing and rehearing en banc are DENIED. [54] [7081225] [19-1060] (AP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703611540 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None ?
            ORDER re: Motion for extensions of time to file briefs. The motion is DENIED as moot. The court notes that it had warned the appellant in its March 6, 2020, order that no further extensions would be allowed. [48] SCR [53] [7080253] [19-1060] (ER)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703605095 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None ?
              30 copies Filed Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc by Appellant Rashun Singleton. DIST. [52] [7077619] [19-1060] (CAH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703604849 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                15 copies Filed Petition for Rehearing by Appellant Rashun Singleton. DIST. [51] [7077526] [19-1060] (CAH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703597226 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                  ORDER: Final judgment filed per nonprecedential disposition. With costs: yes. [50] [7074504] [19-1060] (AP)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703597216 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                    Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [49] [7074501] [19-1060] (AP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703583470 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's reply brief. [48] [7068970] [19-1060] (CM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703579112 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703578744 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's reply brief. [46] [7067157] [19-1060] (CAH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703567430 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's reply brief [44] Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/16/2020 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. CMD [45] [7062613] [19-1060] (AP)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703567011 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's reply brief. [44] [7062450] [19-1060] (CAH)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Amita Health. [43] [7060624] [19-1060] (CAH)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703561316 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Amita Health. Paper copies due on 02/10/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [42] [7060277] [19-1060] (CAH)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703560846 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Submitted appellee brief by Jacob Z. Goldstein for Appellee Amita Health. [41] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7060104] [19-1060] (Goldstein, Jacob)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703537815 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [39] Appellee's brief due on or before 02/03/2020 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/24/2020 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. CMD [40] [7050759] [19-1060] (ER)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703537597 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Motion filed by Appellee Amita Health to extend time to file appellee brief. [39] [7050663] [19-1060] (Goldstein, Jacob)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703529387 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton. Disk not required. [38] [7047393] [19-1060] (CM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703511458 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            ORDER re: Motion for extension of time to file brief. [36] The motion is GRANTED and briefing shall proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/02/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/02/2020 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/23/2020 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. Appellant Rashun Singleton is warned that no further briefing extensions will be granted. Failure to file the opening brief by December 2, 2019, will result in dismissal of this appeal for lack of prosecution. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7017 2680 0001 1550 1198. SCR [37] [7040436] [19-1060] (PS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703509739 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [36] [7039796] [19-1060] (VG)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703492528 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                ORDER issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [34] Appellant's brief due on or before 10/31/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/02/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/23/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. No further extensions of time will be allowed, except in extraordinary circumstances. CMD [35] [7033064] [19-1060] (AD)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703492234 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [34] [7032957] [19-1060] (VG)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703483922 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [32] Appellant's brief due on or before 10/01/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/15/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/06/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. The appellant is expected to meet this deadline. CMD [33] [7029731] [19-1060] (AG)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703483702 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton for extension of time. [32] [7029675] [19-1060] (VG)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703471486 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        ORDER re: Motion for Reconsideration to Unseal Court Records Rule 5.4(c)(2) [28] The motion for reconsideration is DENIED. This court has access to all sealed items in the record and will be able to review any arguments regarding the content of the documents that the parties raise in their briefs. SCR [31] [7024910] [19-1060] (MM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703467579 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          ORDER issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [29] Appellant's brief due on or before 09/16/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/16/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/06/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. CMD [30] [7023396] [19-1060] (AD)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703467246 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [29] [7023271] [19-1060] (VG)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703466740 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton for reconsideration to unseal court records. [28] [7023094] [19-1060] (CG)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703451392 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703449626 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee Amita Health to Appellant Motion to Unseal Court Records. [26][7016595] [19-1060] (Walkup, April)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703449294 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton for extensions of time to file briefs CIRCUIT RULE 26 and motion to unseal sealed court records April 16, 2018, June 25, 2018, July 17, 2018, and November 27, 2018. [25] [7016427] [19-1060] (CG)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703435742 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief only to the extent that briefing shall proceed as follows: [23] Appellant's brief due on or before 07/17/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/16/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/06/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. To the extent that the appellant seeks to supplement the record with or produce additional transcripts, he should make that request before the district court in the first instance.CMD [24] [7011139] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703434973 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [23] [7010827] [19-1060] (JR)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703419255 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief only to the extent that briefing shall proceed as follows: [21] Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/17/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/07/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton CMD [22] [7004604] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703418658 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [21] [7004357] [19-1060] (PS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703402261 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief to the extent that briefing will proceed as follows: [19] Appellant's brief due on or before 05/17/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/17/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/08/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. CMD [20] [6997947] [19-1060] (FP)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703400088 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [19] [6997100] [19-1060] (FP)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703382483 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief to the extent that Appellant's brief due on or before 04/17/2019 for Rashun Singleton. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/17/2019 for Amita Health. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/07/2019 for Appellant Rashun Singleton. [16] CMD [18] [6990069] [19-1060] (AG)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703382311 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Party Rashun Singleton. [17] [6990016] [19-1060] (AG)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703382287 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Pro se motion filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton to extend time to file appellant's brief. [16] [6990009] [19-1060] (AG)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703382048 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Amita Health. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [15] [6989911] [19-1060] (Goldstein, Jacob)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703375924 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [14] [6987528] [19-1060] (PS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703367846 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            ORDER: Appellant Rashun Singleton is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Rashun Singleton by 02/26/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0632. JR [13] [6984083] [19-1060] (MM)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703362674 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703358159 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [11] [6980341] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703357306 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Amita Health. [10] [6979972] [19-1060] (Goldstein, Jacob)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703356934 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jacob Z. Goldstein for Appellee Amita Health. [9] [6979810] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1060]-[Edited 01/24/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Goldstein, Jacob)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703356122 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheets by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [8] [6979475] [19-1060] (CG)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703356071 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [7] [6979453] [19-1060] (CG)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703355965 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [6] [6979417] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703355960 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rashun Singleton. [5] [6979415] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703350099 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703349847 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                ORDER: Appellant Rashun Singleton and Appellee Amita Health shall file, on or before January 24, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6977067] DW [2] [6977067] [19-1060] (AG)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  No attorney(s) added for Appellees Ronald Bryson, Jason Burris and Ann Marie Caulfield, per District Court docket and information sheet. [4] [6977569] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00703349500 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rashun Singleton by 01/15/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/23/2019. [1] [6976924] [19-1060] (AP)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?