LaSala v. Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02829-SAS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph P. LaSala, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kessler, David +1 619 645 5241 +6677 667 667 7056
Space Richard S.. Schiffrin, . +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jeffrey Berg +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 berg@bernlieb.com
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
Space Rebecca M Katz +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 katz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
Space Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com
Space Rachell Roffe Sirota +1 212 425 9055 + 212 425 9093

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
Space Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
Space Alexander H. Schmidt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4677 schmidt@whafh.com
v.
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/9/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 4/10/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
121-mc-00092-SAS
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RELATED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Judgment*
JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That defendants' motion to dismiss is granted, with prejudice; any other pending motions in those actions are denied as moot; and the action is closed. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, Clerk on 7/19/07) (dt)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Order
    ORDER that any stay of the entry of judgment in the cases listed in Appendix I is hereby lifted. The clerk of court will enter judgment in each of the LaSala actions listed in Appendix I. (entry made in all cases listed in Appendix I) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/11/07) (cd) (Entered: 08/09/2007) (orig fld in 21mc92, doc #5627)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC served on 5/8/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. Service was accepted by Gladys Ryan and Services of Processs Representative. Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala. (jmi)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Case Designation
          Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (jeh)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Case Accepted as Related
            CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00092-SAS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jeh)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
              STIPULATION: Counsel for the parties hereby stipulate and agree that this action shall be governed by this stipulation and order filed in the related action titled LaSala v. Goldman Sachs & Co. No. 06cv2567 (SAS) Counsel for plaintiffs is authorized to sign this stipulation on behalf of Defendant Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/10/07) (js)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER: For the reasons stated in my February 24, 2006 Opinion and Order in LaSala V. Needham & Company, Inc. No. 04civ9237; and my June 20, 2006 Memorandum opinion and Order in LaSala v. Goldman Sachs & Co., No. 06Civ 2567, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. However, for the reasons stated in my April 28, 2006 Opinion and Order in La Sala v. Needham & Co., No. 04Civ 9237, entry of final judgement in this action is hereby stayed pending resolution of the appeal captioned LaSala v. Needham & Co., No. 06-2643 (2d Cir. June 2, 2006) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/10/07) (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Motion to Stay
                  MOTION for an Order to Stay re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala.(tro)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala.(jpo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 611197)Document filed by Joseph P. LaSala.(jpo)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                        CASE REFERRED TO Judge Shira A. Scheindlin as possibly related to 21mc92. (jpo)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (jpo)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 164 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?