Annunziato et al v. 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-14466-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 29, 2018 at 5:52 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eleanor V. Annunziato, Plaintiff
No Logo Philip Annunziato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Tyrell, Jr. +1 973 868 5600
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
American Express Bank, FSB American Express Bank, FSB, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Express Bank, Ltd"
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Atlantic-heydt Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Atlantic Heydt Corp."
No Logo Battery Park City Authority, Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation"
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C MM LLC., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Tyrell, Jr. +1 973 868 5600
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, LP, Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Canron Construction Corp."
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Entech Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "En-Tech Corp."
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz Murray Steficek LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P."
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo H.P. Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc., Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp
No Logo Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Group"
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo McClier Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Corp., Defendant
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Rita Cohen +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 cohenj@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Moretrench American Corp., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Plaza Construction Corp."
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Structure Tone Global Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Trammel Crow Company, Defendant

Represented by Gordon & Silber, P.C.,

No Logo Trammel Crow Corporate Services, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gordon & Silber, P.C.,

No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tucker Anthony, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tully Construction Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Tyrell, Jr. +1 973 868 5600
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Turner Construction Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Tyrell, Jr. +1 973 868 5600
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo WFP Retail Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 12/8/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101 Air Trans. Safety and Sys. Stabilization Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00100-AKH
Related Case
121-mc-00100-AKH
Other Court Case 114771-06[State Court-Supreme]
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Notice of Adoption of Master Answer
    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Tucker Anthony, Inc.. (Caputo, Ida)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by McClier Corporation. (Leff, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Adoption of Amended Complaint. Document filed by Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., BFP Tower C Co. LLC., BFP Tower C MM LLC., WFP Retail Co. L.P.. (Smith, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Notice of Adoption To Master Complaint. Document filed by Ann Taylor Stores Corporation. (Joyce, William)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION for reimbursement of filing fees. Document filed by Philip Annunziato. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(LoPalo, Christopher)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service)(Joyce, William)
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Rita Cohen on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co, Inc. (Cohen, Judith)
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Battery Park City Authority's Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Flannery, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by American Express Bank, Ltd, American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Leff, Richard)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Inc., Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Commercial Paper Inc.. (Leff, Richard)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Merrill Lynch & Co, Inc.. (Cohen, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of ADOPTION (ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT). Document filed by H.P. Environmental. (Rosmarin, Sam)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Trammel Crow Company, Trammel Crow Corporate Services, Inc..(Lichtenstein, Jon)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of Structure Tone Global Services, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Halbardier, Suzanne)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tully Construction Co., Inc..(gf)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying M/L Bovis Holdings, Ltd., Bovis Lend Lease Holdings, Inc., Lend Lease Corporation Limited as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc..(gf)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hochtief AG as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Turner Construction Company.(gf)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying AMEC Holdings, Inc, AMEC Properties and Overseas Investments, Ltd., AMEC USA Ltd., AMEC plc as Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMEC Construction Management, Inc.(gf)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Notice of Removal
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 114771-06. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 599001).Document filed by Tully Construction Co., Inc., Turner Construction Company, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc.(gf) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2007 (Automated User, ). Modified on 4/13/2007 (Automated User, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                        Case Designated ECF. (gf)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Case Consolidation - Member
                                          CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00100-AKH. (gf)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Case Accepted as Related
                                            CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00100-AKH. (gf)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 3/28/2007 Case Designation
                                              Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (gf)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?