Clearview Strategic Partners Inc. v. Clearview Ai, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91265095-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2021 at 8:03 AM EDT (3.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Clearview Strategic Partners Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M. Drangel +1 212 292 5390 jdrangel@ipcounselors.com
v.
Clearview AI, Inc. Clearview AI, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher D. Olszyk, Jr. ipdocket@foxrothschild.com;colszyk@foxr
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MARY B MYLES
Date in Location 10/2/2020
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 11/5/2021, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 11/5/2021, Entered: None T
    P Mot For Ext W/ Consent
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None T
        P Mot For Ext W/ Consent
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None T
            P Mot For Ext W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: None T
                P Mot For Ext W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None W
                    P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None W
                      Extension Of Time Granted
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None T
                        D Mot For Ext W/ Consent
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: None N
                          Answer
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None T
                            Instituted
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None T
                              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None N
                                Filed And Fee
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?