Ni v. Gonzales et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-03110-JGK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bao Hua Ni, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fishman & Neil, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Thomas Donovan +1 212 897 5818 +1 212 897 5819 cdonovan@lawsuites.net
v.
No Logo Alberto R. Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Defendant
No Logo Gerard Heinauer, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/18/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Bronx
Terminated 6/5/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Received Return Receipt of Order by Certified Mail
Received Return Receipt of Mail Order by Certified Mail as to Craig Thomas Donovan, which was served by Certified Mail # 7001 2510 0002 8738 0967, on 5/25/07. (cd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: this action is dismissed as moot, without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/5/07) (dle)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Received Return Receipt of Order by Certified Mail
      Received Return Receipt of Mail Order by Certified Mail as to the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York, which was served by Certified Mail # 7001 2510 0002 8738 0974, on 6/4/07. (rdz)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Order to AnswerCourt Filing
        ORDER the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order and Petition, by certified mail, upon the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York, and shall also send a copy of this Order, by certified mail, upon Bao Hua Ni. Respondent shall file an answer within sixty(60) days from the date of receipt of this order. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/3/07) (rdz) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2007 (Velez, Tamara).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Mail Order by Certified Mail
          Mailed a copy of [3] Order to Answer, [1] Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus, to the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York by Certified Mail # 7001 2510 0002 8738 0974 with Return Receipt Requested. (rdz)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Mail Order by Certified Mail
            Mailed a copy of [3] Order to Answer, to Craig T. Donovan (Bao Hua Ni) by Certified Mail # 7001 2510 0002 8738 0967 with Return Receipt Requested. (rdz)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bao Hua Ni served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007; Alberto R. Gonzales served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007; Michael Chertoff served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007; Emilio T. Gonzalez served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007; Gerard Heinauer served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007; USCIS(Nebraska Service Center) served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007; USCIS(New York City Field Office) served on 4/18/2007, answer due 5/8/2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Bao Hua Ni. (Donovan, Craig)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
                COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Gerard Heinauer, USCIS(Nebraska Service Center), USCIS(New York City Field Office) (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 612038).Document filed by Bao Hua Ni.(tro) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                Case Designated ECF. (tro)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Case Designation
                  Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton is so designated. (tro)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 59 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?