District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Texas Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Hotze et al v. Hollins
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:20-cv-03709

Tags
Last Updated November 3, 2020 at 11:44 AM ST (6.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Modify
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Emergency
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Approval
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/31/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - CivilCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Setting as to 5 MOTION to Intervene, 1 Complaint, 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Intervene
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by MJ for Texas, DSCC, DCCC, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., Jekaya Simmons, Daniel Coleman, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Howton, Skyler)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Brief
                                                                                                                              BRIEF Support of Petitioners' Moton for a Preliminary Injunction re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Hotze, MD, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Woodfill, Jared)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Hotze, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Woodfill, Jared)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25428296) filed by Steven F. Hotze, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, # 4 Exhibit Ex D, # 5 Exhibit Ex E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodfill, Jared)
                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?