James Carson, et al v. Steve Simon, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 20-3139

Tags
Last Updated October 29, 2020 at 10:10 PM DT (11 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

District of Columbia District of Columbia, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel F. Callahan
Space Daniel Jacobson +1 202 942 5000 daniel.jacobson@apks.com
Space Robert Stanton Jones +1 202 942 5563 +1 202 942 5999 stanton.jones@aporter.com
Space Elisabeth S. Theodore +1 202 942 5891
No Logo State of California, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Connecticut, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Illinois, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Maryland, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Massachusetts, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Nevada, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo STATE OF NEW JERSEY, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State Of New Mexico, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Oregon, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State Of Pennsylvania, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Vermont, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State of Virginia, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo State Of Washington, Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loren L. AliKhan +1 202 727 6287
No Logo Eric Lucero, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danyll Foix +1 202 861 1500
Space Andrew Michael Grossman +1 202 861 1697
Space Nathan Myrum Hansen +1 651 704 9600 +1 651 704 9604 nathan@hansenlawoffice.com
Space Jenna M. Lorence +1 202 861 1697
Space Richard Bryan Raile +1 202 861 1711
Space David B. Rivkin +1 202 861 1697
No Logo James Carson, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danyll Foix +1 202 861 1500
Space Andrew Michael Grossman +1 202 861 1697
Space Nathan Myrum Hansen +1 651 704 9600 +1 651 704 9604 nathan@hansenlawoffice.com
Space Jenna M. Lorence +1 202 861 1697
Space Richard Bryan Raile +1 202 861 1711
Space David B. Rivkin +1 202 861 1697
No Logo Gary Severson, Intervenor Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda R. Callais +1 202 654 6200
Space Samuel Joseph Clark +1 612 373 0830
Space Will McDonell Conley +1 608 663 7460
Space Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 0830
Space Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200
Space Caitlinrose Hoolihan Fisher +1 612 373 0830
Space Jonathan Patrick Hawley +1 206 359 6467
Space Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Mary Sansom, Intervenor Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda R. Callais +1 202 654 6200
Space Samuel Joseph Clark +1 612 373 0830
Space Will McDonell Conley +1 608 663 7460
Space Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 0830
Space Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200
Space Caitlinrose Hoolihan Fisher +1 612 373 0830
Space Jonathan Patrick Hawley +1 206 359 6467
Space Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Minnesota Alliance For Retired Americans Education Fund, Intervenor Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda R. Callais +1 202 654 6200
Space Samuel Joseph Clark +1 612 373 0830
Space Will McDonell Conley +1 608 663 7460
Space Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 0830
Space Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200
Space Caitlinrose Hoolihan Fisher +1 612 373 0830
Space Jonathan Patrick Hawley +1 206 359 6467
Space Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Robert Larose, Intervenor Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda R. Callais +1 202 654 6200
Space Samuel Joseph Clark +1 612 373 0830
Space Will McDonell Conley +1 608 663 7460
Space Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 0830
Space Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200
Space Caitlinrose Hoolihan Fisher +1 612 373 0830
Space Jonathan Patrick Hawley +1 206 359 6467
Space Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Teresa Maples, Intervenor Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda R. Callais +1 202 654 6200
Space Samuel Joseph Clark +1 612 373 0830
Space Will McDonell Conley +1 608 663 7460
Space Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 0830
Space Marc E. Elias +1 202 654 6200
Space Caitlinrose Hoolihan Fisher +1 612 373 0830
Space Jonathan Patrick Hawley +1 206 359 6467
Space Abha Khanna +1 206 359 8312 akhanna@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Steve Simon, Secretary Of State Of The State Of Minnesota, In His Official Capacity, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Marisam +1 651 296 9412
Space Cicely Rosemary Miltich +1 651 757 1243
Nature of Suit 3441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=0:20-cv-02030-NEB
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=0:20-cv-02030-NEB
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804124935 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the originating court is REVERSED and REMANDED in accordance with the opinion. BOBBY E. SHEPHERD, JANE KELLY and L. STEVEN GRASZ Hrg Oct 2020 [4971127] [20-3139] (BNW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804124920 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
    PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Bobby E. Shepherd, Jane Kelly and L. Steven Grasz (PUBLISHED),
    DISSENT BY: Jane Kelly. [4971121] [20-3139] (BNW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804124917 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
      28(j) citation filed by Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/29/2020 - FOR CAL [4971120] [20-3139] (SLD)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804124867 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
        BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by Arnold Schwarzenegger w/service 10/29/2020. Length: 4,696 words.
        [4971099] [20-3139] (BNW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804124856 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
          JUDGE ORDER: The motion of Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Appellees is granted [4969636-2]. The amicus brief will be filed as of this date. Hrg Oct 2020 [4971095] [20-3139] (BNW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804124061 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None ?
            Response of Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero to 28(j) citation, [4970721-2], filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson, 28(j) citation for Calendar, [4970721-3], filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson. w/service 10/29/2020 - FOR CAL [4970766] [20-3139] (AMG)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804123980 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None ?
              28(j) citation filed by Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/28/2020 - FOR CAL [4970721] [20-3139] (SLD)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804123817 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                28(j) citation filed by Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero w/service 10/28/2020 - FOR CAL [4970661] [20-3139] (AMG)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                  ARGUED & SUBMITTED Via Videoconference to Judges Bobby E. Shepherd, Jane Kelly, L. Steven Grasz on 10/27/2020;
                  Mr. Andrew Michael Grossman for Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero;
                  Ms. Abha Khanna for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson and Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund;
                  Mr. Jason Marisam for Appellee Steve Simon.
                  Rebuttal by Mr. Andrew Michael Grossman for James Carson and Eric Lucero
                  RECORDED. Click Here To Listen to Oral Argument [4970122] [20-3139] (KAS)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804122173 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Response of Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson to 28(j) citation, [4969789-2], filed by James Carson and Eric Lucero, 28(j) citation for Calendar, [4969789-3], filed by James Carson and Eric Lucero. w/service 10/27/2020 - FOR CAL [4969890] [20-3139] (SLD)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121989 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                      28(j) citation filed by Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero w/service 10/27/2020 - FOR CAL [4969789] [20-3139] (AMG)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121863 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                        BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by James Carson and Eric Lucero. w/service 10/27/2020 , Length: 12,942 words
                        [4969734] [20-3139] (AMT)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121839 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                          APPEARANCE filed by Loren L. AliKhan for Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s) State of Vermont w/service 10/27/2020 [4969724] [20-3139] (LLA)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121798 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                            BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by California, State of, District of Columbia, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington w/service 10/26/2020 , Length: 2574 words
                            [4969707] [20-3139] (JPP)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121773 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                              ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero , w/service 10/26/2020 [4969694] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121770 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                ADDENDUM of APPELLEE FILED by Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson , w/service 10/26/2020 [4969692] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121761 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson,
                                  w/service 10/26/2020 , Length: 12,864 words
                                  [4969689] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    RECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: PDF version of appellants' appendix
                                    [4969684] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121741 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by James Carson and Eric Lucero. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4969682] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121734 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        APPELLANT brief of James Carson and Eric Lucero submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4969680] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121731 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Addendum of INTERVENOR submitted for review by Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4969678] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121728 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            INTERVENOR brief of Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4969677] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121702 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Steve Simon,
                                              w/service 10/26/2020 , Length: 7723 words
                                              [4969660] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121631 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                MOTION interested party, Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger , for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Appellees. w/service 10/26/2020. [4969636] [20-3139] (RSJ)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  RECORD FILED - APLEE/RES APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: appendix of separate appellee Minnesota Secretary of State (electronically filed)
                                                  [4969626] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121528 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    APPELLEE brief of Steve Simon submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4969583] [20-3139] (JM)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121510 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      AMICUS/INTERVENOR brief of the District of Columbia, and the States of California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Nevada, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington supporting Appellees submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4969577] [20-3139] (LLA)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804121057 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Ms. Abha Khanna for Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson for argument in October, at the Tele/Video Conference in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4969365] [20-3139] (AK)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          RECORD FILED - APLEE/RES APPENDIX filed by appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund; 3 volumes of electronically filed appendix--[Edited to reflect party filers 10/26/2020 by AMT]
                                                          [4969338] [20-3139] (JPP)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804120860 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Andrew Michael Grossman for James Carson and Eric Lucero for argument in October, at the Tele/Video Conference in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4969269] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804120806 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Jason Marisam for Steve Simon for argument in October, at the Tele/Video Conference in St. Paul, Minnesota. [4969245] [20-3139] (JM)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                SET FOR ARGUMENT - CASE PLACED ON CALENDAR - for Argument Via Videoconference on Tuesday, October 27, 2020. To be heard before Judges Bobby E. Shepherd, Jane Kelly and L. Steven Grasz in Division I. The courtroom deputy will be Kimberly Smith. All attorneys presenting oral argument must complete a Response Form. Click Here to Complete the Oral Argument Response Form. Click Here for the Complete Calendar
                                                                PLEASE REVIEW THE ENTIRE CALENDAR CAREFULLY, PARTICULARLY THE COUNSEL NOTICE PAGE. [4969219] [20-3139] (KAS)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  RECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Preliminary Injunction Hearing - District Court document #48 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / MN, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 10/02/2020, No. of Pgs.: 72, Court Reporter: Drost, Erin D.
                                                                  [4969038] [20-3139] (STL)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804119614 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    JUDGE ORDER: The motion for an expedited appeal is granted, and the following expedited briefing and argument schedule is established for this case: (1) the parties shall file simultaneous merits brief by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, October 26, 2020; and (2) the clerk is directed to set this case for videoconference oral argument at 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 27, 2020. The clerk will contact counsel regarding the procedures for the videoconference. [4965905-3] Adp Oct 2020 [4968696] [20-3139] (AMT)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804117757 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      REPLY to response [4967314-2], response [4967410-2] filed by Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero w/service 10/21/2020. [4967857] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804117210 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Loren L. AliKhan for Interested Partys District of Columbia, California, State of, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Virginia and State of Washington w/service 10/20/2020 [4967583] [20-3139] (LLA)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804117133 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund. - FOR CAL [4967548] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804116912 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            AMICUS/INTERVENOR brief of District of Columbia and the States of California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Nevada, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Virginia, and Washington submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4967429] [20-3139] (LLA)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804116884 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              RESPONSE in opposition to motion [4965905-2], motion [4965905-3] filed by Attorney Ms. Sybil Louise Dunlop for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson , w/service 10/20/2020. [4967410] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804116702 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                RESPONSE in opposition to motion [4965905-2], motion [4965905-3] filed by Attorney Mr. Jason Marisam for Appellee Steve Simon , w/service 10/20/2020. [4967314] [20-3139] (JM)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804116376 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  JUDGE ORDER: The motion to file an overlength response is denied. [4966438-3] Adp Oct 2020 [4967157] [20-3139] (AMT)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804115460 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Originating court document filed consisting of court order of 10/16/2020 denying emergency motion for inj. pending appeal. [4966759] [20-3139] (MMH)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804115199 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Status report filed by James Carson and Eric Lucero. w/service 10/16/2020 [4966622] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804114820 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        MOTION to file an overlength response, filed by Attorney Ms. Sybil Louise Dunlop for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/16/2020. [4966438] [20-3139] [4966438] [20-3139]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by JPP - Reason: INCORRECT RELIEF] (SLD)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113620 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal, for an expedited appeal, filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Michael Grossman for Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero w/service 10/15/2020. [4965905] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113368 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Amanda R. Callais for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965786] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113357 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Will M. Conley for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965784] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113354 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Marc E. Elias for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965782] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113348 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Abha Khanna for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965781] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113342 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan Hawley for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965780] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113338 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Caitlinrose H. Fisher for Appellees Robert LaRose, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom, Gary Severson and Teresa Maples w/service 10/15/2020 [4965777] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113334 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Samuel J. Clark for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965773] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804113328 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Sybil L. Dunlop for Appellees Robert LaRose, Teresa Maples, Minnesota Alliance for Retired Americans Education Fund, Mary Sansom and Gary Severson w/service 10/15/2020 [4965771] [20-3139] (SLD)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804112986 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Andrew M. Grossman for Appellants James Carson and Eric Lucero w/service 10/14/2020 [4965591] [20-3139] (AMG)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804112774 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Cicely R. Miltich for Appellee Steve Simon w/service 10/14/2020 [4965482] [20-3139] (CRM)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804112427 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
                                                                                                                Transcript due on or before 11/23/2020. Appendix due 12/03/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, James Carson and Eric Lucero due 12/03/2020
                                                                                                                Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
                                                                                                                [4965319] [20-3139] (MMH)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804112426 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order on Motion for Preliminary injunction. NOTE: THIS IS AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. [4965316] [20-3139] (MMH)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00804112416 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Civil case docketed. [4965304] [20-3139] (MMH)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?