District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

United States of America v. Zarrab (Turkiye Halk Bankasi)
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 20-3499

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 30, 2020 at 12:31 AM DT (5.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abdullah Happani, Defendant
No Logo Camelia Jamshidy, Aka Kamelia Jamshidy, Defendant
No Logo Hossein Najafzadeh, Defendant
No Logo Levent Balkan, Defendant
No Logo Mehmet Hakan Atilla, Defendant
No Logo Mehmet Zafer Caglayan, Abi, Defendant
No Logo Mohammad Zarrab, Aka Can Sarraf, Aka Kartalmsd, Defendant
No Logo Reza Zarrab, Aka Riza Sarraf, Defendant
No Logo Suleyman Aslan, Defendant
No Logo Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.s., Aka Halkbank, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M Cary +1 202 434 5000
United States of America United States of America, Appellee USA

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Rebold +1 212 637 2512 jrebold@usa.doj.gov
Space Won S. Shin +1 212 637 2226
Nature of Suit
Case Type Criminal
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:15-cr-867-10
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:15-cr-867-10
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207908912 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None ?
NEW CASE MANAGER, Gerard Whidbee, ASSIGNED.[2960297] [20-3499]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207906379 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
    FORM B, on behalf of Appellant Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2959354] [20-3499]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207906370 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None ?
      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2959352] [20-3499]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
        ATTORNEY, Jonathan Rebold for United States of America, in case 20-3499 , [6], ADDED.[2951541] [20-3499]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207884603 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2951189] [20-3499]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207882764 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2950490] [20-3499]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207883950 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
              PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., district court receipt # 465401267998, FILED.[2950484] [20-3499]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207882748 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/01/2020, RECEIVED.[2950483] [20-3499]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207882728 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                  NOTICE OF CRIMINAL INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Turkiye Halk Bankasi A.S., FILED. [2950475] [20-3499]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 23 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?