Bank Of America Corporation v. Binance Holdings Limited
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91265740-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2021 at 8:01 AM EST (2.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randel S. Springer
v.
Binance Holdings Limited Binance Holdings Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter L. Brewer
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney GEOFFREY MCNUTT
Date in Location 11/2/2020
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 11/13/2021, Entered: None S
Suspended
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 11/13/2021, Entered: None W
    P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None S
      Suspended
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 10/13/2021, Entered: None W
        P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None S
          Suspended
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None W
            P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None S
              Suspended
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None W
                P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None W
                    P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None S
                      Suspended
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None W
                        P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None S
                          Suspended
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None W
                            P Mot To Susp W/ Consent Pend Settl Negotiations
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None N
                              Answer
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None T
                                Instituted
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None T
                                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None N
                                    Filed And Fee
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?