USA v. Baugh et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:20-cr-10263-PBS

Tags
Last Updated Today at 10:24 AM (3 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SETH B. KOSTO +1 973 645 2700 seth.kosto@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jim Baugh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel N. Marx +1 857 321 8360 dmarx@fickmarx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fick & Marx LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William W. Fick +1 857 321 8360 wfick@fickmarx.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Jim Baugh (1)
Office Boston
Filed 11/3/2020
County Barnstable
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
120-mj-02398-MBB
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT STALKING THROUGH TRAVEL AND THROUGH FACILITIES OF INTERSTATE COMMERCE
Count 10-11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1512B.F
Offense Level 4
181512(b)(3) and 2 - WITNESS TAMPERING; AIDING AND ABETTING
Count 13-14
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519 and 2 - DESTRUCTION, ALTERATION AND FALSIFICATION OF RECORDS IN A FEDERAL INVESTIGATION; AIDING AND ABETTING
Count 2-3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2261.F
Offense Level 4
182261A(1)(B) and 2 - STALKING THROUGH INTERSTATE TRAVEL; AIDING AND ABETTING
Count 6-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2261.F
Offense Level 4
182261A(2)(B) and 2 - STALKING THROUGH FACILITIES OF INTERSTATE COMMERCE; AIDING AND ABETTING
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags CASREF,VICTIM
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Excludable Delay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Appeal of MJ Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Compel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Excludable Delay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: 7/22/2021 Response to letter requesting additional discovery
                  Response to letter requesting additional discovery pursuant to Local Rule 116.3 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville (Kosto, Seth)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                    Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Jim Baugh, David Harville. Time excluded from June 29, 2021 until July 29, 2021. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Belpedio, Lisa)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Excludable Delay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 65 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/7/2021 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [64] MAssented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from June 29, 2021 to July 29, 2021 as to Jim Baugh (1), David Harville (2) (Belpedio, Lisa)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021, Terminated: 7/6/2021 Motion for Excludable Delay
                          Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from June 29, 2021 to July 29, 2021 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Kosto, Seth)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 63 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 7/1/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Jim Baugh, David Harville held on 6/29/2021, Case called, counsel appear by telephone, government will promptly respond to latest discovery request, further Status Conference set for 7/29/2021 02:45 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is. Counsel agree to exclude time through that date and government will file an assented to motion. (Attorneys present: Kosto, Fick, Marx, Gelb, McDougal. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com. (Belpedio, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 6/29/2021 Letter- non-motion
                              Letter (non-motion) regarding Discovery as to Jim Baugh (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2, # (3) Attachment 3, # (4) Attachment 4)(Fick, William)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: 6/22/2021 Response to letter requesting additional discovery
                                Response to letter requesting additional discovery pursuant to Local Rule 116.3 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville (Kosto, Seth)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Letter requesting additional discovery
                                  Letter requesting additional discovery pursuant to Local Rule 116.3 as to David Harville (Gelb, Daniel)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                    Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Jim Baugh, David Harville. Time excluded from May 10, 2021 until June 29, 2021. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Belpedio, Lisa)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 58 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [57] Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from May 10, 2021 to June 29, 2021 as to Jim Baugh (1), David Harville (2) (Belpedio, Lisa)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021, Terminated: 6/1/2021 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                        Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from May 10, 2021 to June 29, 2021 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Kosto, Seth)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Jim Baugh, David Harville held on 5/10/2021. Government reports that automatic discovery is complete, anticipates additional discovery requests from defendants. Further date set during which potential motions to dismiss or suppress will be addressed. Government to file assented to motion to exclude the time from this date until 6/29/2021. (Status Conference set for 6/29/2021 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.) (Attorneys present: Kosto, Fick, Geld.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com. (Putnam, Harold)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [54] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jim Baugh (1). (Bowler, Marianne)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021, Terminated: 4/6/2021 motion to modify conditions of release
                                              Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jim Baugh. (Fick, William)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/21/2021, Entered: 3/21/2021 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Jim Baugh, David Harville. Time excluded from 3/8/2021 until 5/10/2021. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Putnam, Harold)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 3/21/2021, Entered: 3/21/2021 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [51] Motion to Exclude as to Jim Baugh (1), David Harville (2) (Putnam, Harold)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: 3/9/2021, Terminated: 3/21/2021 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from 03/08/2021 to 05/10/2021 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Kosto, Seth)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Jim Baugh, David Harville held on 3/8/2021. Government reports that automatic discovery has been completed; defense continues to wade through discovery. Further date set. Government to file assented to motion to exclude the time from this date until 5/10/2021. (Status Conference set for 5/10/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.) (Attorneys present: Kosto, Fick, Gelb, McDougall.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com. (Putnam, Harold)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Order on Excludable Delay
                                                        ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Jim Baugh, David Harville. Time excluded from 1/7/2021 until 3/8/2021. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Putnam, Harold)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [46] Motion to Exclude as to Jim Baugh (1), David Harville (2) (Putnam, Harold)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Jim Baugh, David Harville held on 1/7/2021. Counsel report on discovery, request further date. Government to file assented to motion to exclude the time from this date until 3/8/2021. (Status Conference set for 3/8/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.) (Attorneys present: Kosto, Fick, Gelb, McDougall.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com. (Putnam, Harold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021, Terminated: 1/11/2021 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                              Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from 01/07/2021 to 03/08/2021 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Kosto, Seth)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Jim Baugh, David Harville. Status Conference reset for 1/7/2021 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.(Putnam, Harold)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/20/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Jim Baugh, David Harville (Putnam, Harold)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                    Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [42] Motion for Protective Order as to Jim Baugh (1) and David Harville (2). (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020, Terminated: 12/11/2020 Motion for protective order
                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Discovery Materials as to Jim Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kosto, Seth)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [40] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jim Baugh (1). (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020, Terminated: 12/10/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Jim Baugh. (Fick, William)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5 as to Jim Baugh, David Harville. (Putnam, Harold)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/21/2020 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Arraignments as to Jim Baugh (1) Count 1,2-3,6-7,10-11,13-14 and David Harville (2) Count 1,4-5,8-9,12,15 held on 11/19/2020. Court conducts colloquy with defendants, find that they knowingly and voluntarily waive their rights to be physically present in the courtroom. Hearing proceeds by video. Government states maximum penalties as to both defendants, anticipates a trial lasting seven to eight days, and anticipates calling in excess of 20 witnesses. Pleas entered by Jim Baugh (1) Count 1,2-3,6-7,10-11,13-14 and David Harville (2) Count 1,4-5,8-9,12,15: not guilty as to all counts. On the record, court instructs parties regarding the provisions of the Due Process Protections Act. Written order to issue. (Status Conference set for 1/6/2021 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. If, for some reason, the call is disconnected, dial back in. NOTE that yours may not be the first case called, but please remain on the line until it is.) (Attorneys present: Kosto, Fick, McDougall, Gelb.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com. (Putnam, Harold)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jim Baugh, David Harville This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Arraignment set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Belpedio, Lisa)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Reason for referral: Full Pretrial Proceedings as to Jim Baugh, David Harville (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Jim Baugh, David Harville; Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 indictment
                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to Jim Baugh (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 6-7, 10-11, 13-14, David Harville (2) count(s) 1, 4-5, 8-9, 12, 15. (Attachments: # (1) JS45 Baugh, # (2) JS45 Harville)(Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Bail Review HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Initial Appearance in this District and Bail Review Hearing as to David Harville held on 9/17/2020. Court conducts colloquy with defendant, finds that he knowingly and voluntarily waives his right to be physically present at the courthouse. Hearing proceeds by video. Defendant waives probable cause. Court sets conditions of release in this district and sets $100,000 unsecured appearance bond. Conditions and bond to be emailed to defense counsel for signature, then back to the clerk for docketing. (Attorneys present: Kosto, Gelb, McDougall, USPO Fitzpatrick.) Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to David Harville. Bail Review Hearing set for 9/17/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [29] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to James Baugh (1). (Bowler, Marianne)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020, Terminated: 9/11/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to James Baugh. (Fick, William)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 bond
                                                                                                Replacement Secured Bond Entered as to James Baugh in amount of $200,000 with Jillian Baugh as surety. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered as to James Baugh vacating the original [17-5] Appearance Bonddated June 16, 2020. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [25] Motion as to James Baugh (1), there being no objection from the government. (Bowler, Marianne)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020, Terminated: 7/28/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION Substitute Third-Party Bond Surety re [17] Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received (17-5 Release Conditions and Bond) as to James Baugh. (Fick, William)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [24] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to David Harville (2). (Bowler, Marianne)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020, Terminated: 7/25/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to David Harville. (Gelb, Daniel)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline
                                                                                                            Considering that both defendants have waived probable cause and that conditions have been set as to both, ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING 7/21/2020 Status Conference as to James Baugh, David Harville. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to James Baugh, David Harville. Telephone Conference set for 7/21/2020 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. ALL COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO APPEAR BY PHONE by calling 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline
                                                                                                                Considering [19] and [20] WAIVERS of Preliminary Hearings as to James Baugh, David Harville, ELECTRONIC NOTICE cancelling 7/9/2020 Probable Cause Hearings as to both defendants. Issue of probable cause may be reopened upon motion. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing
                                                                                                                  WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by James Baugh (Fick, William)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing
                                                                                                                    WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by David Harville (Gelb, Daniel)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to James Baugh, David Harville This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: www.forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Preliminary Examination set for 7/9/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                        Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to James Baugh (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Complaint, # (2) JS45, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Arrest Warrant, # (5) Conditions of Release) (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [15] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Harville (2). (Bowler, Marianne)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [13] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to James Baugh (1). (Bowler, Marianne)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020, Terminated: 6/26/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan D. McDougall Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-8302953. as to David Harville. (Gelb, Daniel)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel N. Marx appearing for James Baugh. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Marx, Daniel)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020, Terminated: 6/26/2020 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to James Baugh. (Fick, William)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                    Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to David Harville. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel K. Gelb appearing for David Harville. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Gelb, Daniel)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William W. Fick appearing for James Baugh. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Fick, William)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [9] Motion to Unseal Case as to James Baugh (1), David Harville (2) (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020, Terminated: 6/15/2020 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Partially Unseal Case as to James Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                              Arrest of David Harville in Southern District of New York. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                Arrest of James Baugh in Northern District of California. (Putnam, Harold)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [7] Motion to Partially Unseal Case and Redact as to James Baugh (1), David Harville (2) once arrested. (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020, Terminated: 6/15/2020 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Partially Unseal Case and Redact as to James Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to James Baugh, David Harville; Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler as to David Harville. (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler as to James Baugh. (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Complaint (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED COMPLAINT as to James Baugh (1), David Harville (2). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Mark Wilson, # (2) REDACTED Affidavit of Mark Wilson, # (3) JS45 Baugh, # (4) JS45 Harville)(Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [1] Motion to Seal Case as to James Baugh (1), David Harville (2) (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020, Terminated: 6/11/2020 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Case as to James Baugh, David Harville by USA. (Belpedio, Lisa)[1:20-mj-02398-MBB]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?