USA v. Vilneus
Criminal Case Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:20-cr-00099-WES-PAS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 12, 2021 at 2:44 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacey Pires Veroni +1 401 709 5000 +1 401 709 5001 Stacey.Veroni@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise Marie Barton +1 415 436 7359 +1 415 436 7234 denise.barton@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Irvin Vilneus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of John L. Calcagni Iii, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Louis Calcagni +1 401 351 5100 jc@calcagnilaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Irvin Vilneus (1)
Office Providence
Filed 11/6/2020
County Providence
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
120-mj-00099-WES
Count 1-3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
WIRE FRAUD in Violation of 18 USC 1343
Count 4-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
AGGRAVATED IDENTITY THEFT in Violation of 18 USC 1028A(a)(1)
Count 1s-3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
WIRE FRAUD in Violation of 18 USC 1343
Count 4s-6s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
AGGRAVATED INDETITY THEFT in Violation of 18USC 1028A
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag FORFEITURE ALLEGATION
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 summons returned executed
Summons Returned Executed on 4/20/2021 as to Irvin Vilneus. (Saucier, Martha)
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 warrant returned executed
    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/21/2021. in case as to Irvin Vilneus. (Saucier, Martha)
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021 Arraignment OrderCourt Filing
      ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to Irvin Vilneus Motions due by 8/10/2021;. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/20/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
        LREF
        Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
        TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice [32] MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport as to Irvin Vilneus (1). Motion for temporary return of passport denied without prejudice to being refiled in the event that other documents are not sufficient, in which event the Court will promptly conduct a phone conference on the renewed motion.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/20/2021.(Saucier, Martha)
          LREF
          Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
          TEXT ORDER finding as moot [29] Assented MOTION TO AMEND ARRAIGNMENT ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DATE FOR FILING OF PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND FOR AN EXCLUSION OF TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Irvin Vilneus (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/20/2021.(Saucier, Martha)
            LREF
            Blank  arraignment
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan:Arraignment as to Irvin Vilneus (1) Count 1-3,1s-3s,4-6,4s-6s held on 4/20/2021, Motion Hearing as to Irvin Vilneus held on 4/20/2021 re [32] MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport filed by Irvin Vilneus, [29] Assented MOTION TO AMEND ARRAIGNMENT ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DATE FOR FILING OF PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND FOR AN EXCLUSION OF TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT filed by USA. Michael Seaman and Stacey Veroni for the government; John Calcagni for the defendant. Court informs defendant of his rights; Defendant consents to appearance by video; Court informs defendant of pending charges and forfeiture allegation; Court enters a plea of not guilty as to all counts on behalf of the defendant; Court enters an arraignment order; Court finds motion to amend arraignment order [29] moot; Attorneys argue motion for return of passport; Court denies the motion without prejudice; Defendant remains released on conditions.(Courtroom Video Hearing at 1:08.)(Saucier, Martha)
              LREF
              Blank  Notice of hearing on motion
              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Irvin Vilneus [32] MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport , [29] Assented MOTION TO AMEND ARRAIGNMENT ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DATE FOR FILING OF PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND FOR AN EXCLUSION OF TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT :VIDEO Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2021 at 01:00 PM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 142 7447, Passcode: 760105) (Saucier, Martha)
                LREF
                Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                TEXT ORDER finding as moot [30] MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Document , MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport as to Irvin Vilneus (1); granting [31] MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Document , MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport as to Irvin Vilneus (1). Interpreting Defendants motion to remove incorrectly filed document 31 as a motion to seal to protect confidential information, the motion is hereby granted and the document filed at ECF No. 30 is ordered to be sealed.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/15/2021.(Saucier, Martha)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Notice of Hearing Defendant Request
                    NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Irvin Vilneus. Arraignment set for 4/20/2021 at 01:00 PM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 142 7447, Passcode: 760105) (Saucier, Martha)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/20/2021 motion for miscellaneous relief
                        MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport by Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Calcagni, John)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/15/2021 motion for miscellaneous relief
                          MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Document by Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 4/23/2021.(Calcagni, John)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/15/2021 motion for miscellaneous relief
                            MOTION - Temporary Return of U.S. Passport by Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Calcagni, John)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021, Terminated: 4/20/2021 motion for miscellaneous relief
                              Assented MOTION TO AMEND ARRAIGNMENT ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DATE FOR FILING OF PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND FOR AN EXCLUSION OF TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by USA as to Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 4/23/2021.(Barton, Denise)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 indictment
                                SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Irvin Vilneus (1) count(s) 1s-3s, 4s-6s. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet)(Saucier, Martha)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Notice - other
                                  NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ALLEGATION by USA as to Irvin Vilneus re [26] Superseding Indictment (Saucier, Martha)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Order
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021, Terminated: 1/29/2021 motion to modify conditions of release
                                      Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 2/12/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A - Employment Offer Letter)(Calcagni, John)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  order on motion to modify conditions of release
                                        TEXT ORDER finding as moot [24] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Irvin Vilneus (1); granting [25] AMENDED Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Irvin Vilneus (1).. Defendant's curfew is hereby modified to 2 am to 9am for purposes of the employment described in the motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/29/2021.(Saucier, Martha)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021, Terminated: 1/29/2021 motion to modify conditions of release
                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) by Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 2/9/2021.(Calcagni, John)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: 12/31/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion as to Irvin Vilneus held on 10/28/2020 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option Redaction Request due 1/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2021. (Schwam, Lisa)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Transcript Order Acknowledgment
                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: [21] Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam (Dias, Jennifer)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 28, 2020 before Judge William E. Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 days calendar days. (Calcagni, John)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 summons returned executed
                                                  Summons Returned Executed on 11/17/2020 as to Irvin Vilneus. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 Arraignment OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to Irvin Vilneus Motions due by 2/8/2021;. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/17/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5 as to Irvin Vilneus. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/17/2020.(Saucier, Martha)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Oral Order
                                                        ORAL ORDER: Judge issues Rule 5(f) oral Brady disclosure order to counsel in accordance with Due Process Protections Act as to Irvin Vilneus. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/17/2020.(Saucier, Martha)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  arraignment
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan:Arraignment as to Irvin Vilneus (1) Count 1-3,4-6 held on 11/17/2020. Denise Barton for the government; John Calcagni for the defendant. Court informs defendant of his rights; Defendant consents to appearance by video; Court enters oral disclosure/Brady Order; Court informs defendant of pending charges; Court enters a plea of not guilty as to all counts on behalf of the defendant; Court enters an arraignment order; Defendant remains released on conditions.(Courtroom Video Hearing at 1:04.)(Saucier, Martha)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Notice of Hearing Defendant Request
                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Irvin Vilneus. VIDEO Arraignment set for 11/17/2020 at 01:00 PM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Invitation and instructions to video hearing emailed to counsel.(Saucier, Martha)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 indictment
                                                              INDICTMENT as to Irvin Vilneus (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-6. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet)(Saucier, Martha)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John L. Calcagni, III appearing for Irvin Vilneus (Calcagni, John)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                  Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Irvin Vilneus from Southern District of Florida (Saucier, Martha)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Appearance BondCourt Filing
                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to Irvin Vilneus. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/28/2020. Docket note: Documents are currently unsigned. Once signed documents are received they will be placed on the docket. (Potter, Carrie)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Irvin Vilneus (1) $200,000 unsecured and $100,000 secured. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/28/2020. Docket note: Documents are currently unsigned. Once signed documents are received they will be placed on the docket. (Potter, Carrie)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  order on motion to revoke
                                                                        TEXT ORDER denying [7] Motion to Revoke as to Irvin Vilneus (1) (GOVERNMENTS MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER OF RELEASE). The United States of America's motion to revoke Magistrate Judge Hunt's (SDFL) order of release as to this defendant is denied and Magistrate Judge Hunt's order is upheld with the following modifications: 1) defendant is to be placed on GPS monitoring with curfew conditions; 2) the defendant is restricted to travel within the Southern District of Florida and the District of RI, and 3) bond is adjusted to the amount indicated in the bond/bail papers to be entered. All other conditions of release remain in effect. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/28/2020.(Jackson, Ryan)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith:Motion Hearing as to Irvin Vilneus held on 10/28/2020 re: [7] MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER OF RELEASE filed by USA: counsel present: D. Barton, S. Veroni, J. Moreira; J. O'Donnell; U.S. Probation: M. Picozzi, K. Mattias; Court addresses on inability of defendant to attend. Defense Counsel (O'Donnell) waives defendant's appearance at this hearing. Court allows Mr. O'Donnell to appear at this hearing only without local counsel in this matter. Government (Barton) argues it's motion. Court questions counsel. Defendant argues it's objection to the motion. Court DENIES the United States' Motion for Revocation and sets modified conditions of release. Adjourned.(Court Reporter Lisa Schwarm; conducted as a Remote Hearing via Zoom Videoconfernece at 9:40 AM (10:55 AM as to this defendant; joint hearing)(Jackson, Ryan)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Notice of Hearing Defendant Request
                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Irvin Vilneus. Hearing on [7] MOTION to Revoke MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER OF RELEASE: Motion Hearing via Zoom Videoconference scheduled for WEDNESDAY 10/28/2020 at 9:30 AM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith; Zoom invite and information will be emailed to all counsel; every effort will be made to have defendants present at this multi-case hearing via Zoom, but if they cannot appear, the Court will proceed with the hearing with counsel only(Jackson, Ryan)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 Notice - other
                                                                              NOTICE of Related Case by USA as to Irvin Vilneus (Barton, Denise)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stacey Pires Veroni appearing for USA. (Veroni, Stacey)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020, Terminated: 10/28/2020 motion to revoke
                                                                                  MOTION to Revoke GOVERNMENTS MOTION and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER OF RELEASE by USA as to Irvin Vilneus. Responses due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Affidavit in Support of Complaint))(Barton, Denise)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                    Case as to Irvin Vilneus reassigned to District Judge William E. Smith. Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (Saucier, Martha)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020, Terminated: 10/13/2020 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Irvin Vilneus.(Saucier, Martha)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                        Arrest of Irvin Vilneus in Southern District of Florida. (Saucier, Martha)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                          TEXT ORDER granting [6] Motion to Unseal Case as to Irvin Vilneus (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/13/2020.(Saucier, Martha)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Complaint
                                                                                            COMPLAINT as to Irvin Vilneus (1). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Redacted Cover Sheet, # (3) Cover Sheet Attachment)(Simoncelli, Michael)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal Case as to Irvin Vilneus (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/8/2020.(Simoncelli, Michael)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020, Terminated: 10/8/2020 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Irvin Vilneus. (Simoncelli, Michael)[1:20-mj-00099-WES]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 503 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?