Cooper v. Thew et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:04-cv-08928-KMK-LMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Melinda Thew Cooper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe & Mack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Russell DuVall +1 845 486 6800 +1 845 486 7621 rduvall@mccm.com
No Logo John Thew, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Paul Russo +21294 030 00x3771 +1 212 940 3111 mrusso@nixonpeabody.com
v.
No Logo John Thew, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Paul Russo +21294 030 00x3771 +1 212 940 3111 mrusso@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Larry Thew, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Paul Russo +21294 030 00x3771 +1 212 940 3111 mrusso@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo Michele Thew, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Paul Russo +21294 030 00x3771 +1 212 940 3111 mrusso@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo O'Hare & O'Hare P.C., Defendant
No Logo Patricia Carson, Defendant
No Logo Reed Smith LLP, Defendant

Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Represented by Riker, Danzig, Scherer, Hyland, Perretti, LLP

No Logo Stephen P. O'Hare, Defendant
No Logo Taconic 82, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Paul Russo +21294 030 00x3771 +1 212 940 3111 mrusso@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo The Curry Family Partnership, Defendant
No Logo William J. O'Hare, Defendant
No Logo Melinda Thew Cooper, Counter-Defendant
Office White Plains
Filed 11/12/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 3/6/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE:... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for all the parties in the above-entiled action...the above-entitled action be, and hereby is discontinued pursuant to the terms of a Settlement and Mutual Release Agreement...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 03/05/2008) (gco)
    LREF
    Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/7/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/7/08) (fk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF CASE REASSINGMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (fk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM From: Judge McMahon, To: All Litigants: Effective August 3, 2007, Judge McMahon will no longer be responsible for any cases, civil or criminal in White Plains. Her entire pending docket, civil and criminal, will be transferred to The Hon. Kenneth M. Karas. From August 4, 2007 until September 3, 2007, Judge Karas will be transitioning into White Plains; in case of emergencies, he can be reached at 500 Pearl Street, Chambers 920, New York, New York 10007, telephone number (212) 805-0274. Routine applications for matters like adjournments should be addressed to the assigned Magistrate Judge, to the Magistrate Judge on duty in White Plains (if your assigned Magistrate Judge is on vacation), or to the Judge sitting in Part I in Foley Square. Beginning September 4, 2007 Judge Karas will be in Chambers 533, his telephone number will be (914) 390-4145. After August 3, DO NOT send any correspondence or inquiry relating to a White Plains case to Judge McMahon. (mj)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa Margaret Smith : Pretrial Conference held on 6/1/2007. Adjourned date 6/6/07 @ 2:00 p.m. (ip). (Submitted by James Galvin). (mde)
            LREF
            Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lisa M. Smith from Richard R. DuVall dated 5/22/2007 re: extention of time to produce documents and answer interrogatories be extended one week to 5/31/2007...ENDORSED: SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 5/23/2007) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(mde)
              LREF
              Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edwin Francis Chociey, Jr on behalf of Reed Smith, LLP (Chociey, Edwin)
                LREF
                Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Reply
                REPLY re: [43] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand served on McCabe & Mack, LLP; O'Hare & O'Hare, PC; Reed Smith, LLP; Patricia Carson; Williiam J. O'Hare; The Curry Family Partnership; Stephen O'Hare, Esq. on 5/9/2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John Thew. (Weinstein, Fred)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs. Document filed by John Thew. (Attachments: # (1) Jury Demand)(Weinstein, Fred)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Certificate of Service Other
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer served on McCabe & Mack LLP on May 9, 2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP. (Laffey, Casey)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP.(Laffey, Casey)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: In order to facilitate the progress of pre-trial discovery of this litigation in a just, speedy and inexpensive manner, to insure compliance with the case management plan, and to prevent the accumulation of unresolved discovery issues, the following procedures will be followed for the resolution of discovery disputes:...SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 5/3/2007) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(mde)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lisa Margaret Smith : Pretrial Conference held on 5/3/2007. 5/9 to Answer (non-answering Ds only); 5/11 Rule 26 disclosure; Plaintiff also to id subject matter for plaintiff's experts; 5/14 all document demands and interrogatories; 5/18 Dft to id any subject matter for dft's experts in addition to the subject matter id'd by plaintiff; 5/24 response to doc demands and interrogatorries; 5/28 all parties to id experts with Rule 26 material other than expert report; 6/8 complete all party deposition; 6/13 exchange all experts reports; 6/18 complete all other non-party depositions except experts; 6/22 complete expert depositions; 6/26 supplemental expert reports exchanged, discovery concluded. Adjourned date 5/29/2007 @ 9:15. (Submitted by James Galvin). (mde)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: The matter of Cooper v. Thew has been scheduled for a conference before the Hon. Lisa Margaret Smith, Chief United States Magistrate Judge, on 5/3/2007 11:30 AM in Courtroom 420...SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 4/27/2007) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(mde)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER LIFTING STAY, DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, SETTING SCHEDULE AND EXPEDITING DISCOVERY...The court-imposed stay of this action is hereby lifted, effective immediately...THERE WILL BE NO EXTENSION OF THIS DEADLINE FOR ANY REASON.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/26/2007) "Copies Sent By Chambers".(mde)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement)... Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/26/2007) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(mde)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 RemarkCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM From: Judge McMahon, To: All Litigants, Re: Transfer to Foley Square Effective January 2, 2007, Judge McMahon's duty station will change from White Plains to Foley Square. Her new contact information will be: Daniel P. Moynihan Courthouse, Chambers 640, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, (212) 805-6325 (telephone for emergencies only) (212) 805-6326 (fax). Judge McMahon will remain in the White Plains wheel through December 29, 2006. Pending the confirmation of a new judge to fill the vacancy created by the retirement of Judge Mukasey, Judge McMahon will continue to administer all White Plains cases previously assigned to her. Judge McMahon will keep her White Plains chambers and her emergency telephone and fax numbers in White Plains (914-390-4145 and 4152, respectively) as long as she is handling White Plains cases. She will be in White Plains every Friday to conduct case conferences (criminal and civil) and sentencings. She will try her White Plains cases in Courtroom 533 in the White Plains courthouse. She will not try White Plains cases in Foley Square. She will, however, conference White Plains civil cases in Foley Square for the convenience of counsel if all parties agree. Out-of-district counsel in civil cases may request telephone conferences. The White Plains magistrate judges will supervise discovery in Judge McMahon's White Plains cases. Effective January 2, communications to chambers should be faxed to BOTH chambers (White Plains and Foley Square). Courtesy copies of motion papers and briefs in White Plains cases should be delivered to White Plains unless otherwise instructed by chambers. (mj, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Order Placing Case on SuspenseCourt Filing
                                      ORDER STAYING ACTION and PLACING CASE ON SUSPENSE; All motions should be administratively close; they may be reopened upon the application of any party when the stay is lifted. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/4/05) "Copies Mailed By Chambers".(ae, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion
                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [14] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(DuVall, Richard)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Brief
                                          BRIEF re: [32] Order to Show Cause dated April 18, 2005. Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP.(Greenwald, Kenneth)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER to show cause why this federal action should not be stayed pending the outcome of the state case. The parties shall submit briefs to the Court by 5/2/05. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/18/05) "Copies Faxed By Chambers".(ae, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Second Declaration of Kathryn P. Beller, Esq. served on Thomas Halley on 02/10/05. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Martin P Russo. (Russo, Martin)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Martin P Russo. (Russo, Martin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Response to Defendants Thew Motion for Summary Judgment served on Thomas Halley, Esq. on February 3, 2005. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Response to Motion of Reed Smith LLP for Summary Judgment served on Thomas Halley, Esq. on February 2, 2005. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Declaration of Kathryn Beller served on Defendants Respective Counsel on 02-09-05. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Martin P Russo. (Russo, Martin)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law served on Defendants Respective Counsel on 02-09-05. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Martin P Russo. (Russo, Martin)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                          DECLARATION of Kathryn Beller in Support re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Martin P Russo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Russo, Martin)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Martin P Russo. (Russo, Martin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant Reed Smith LLP's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) and Fed R Civ P 56 served on Thomas Halley, Esq. and Patricia Carson on February 8, 2005. Service was made by UPS Overnight Mail. Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP. (Greenwald, Kenneth)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [14] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant Reed Smith LLP's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) and Fed.R.Civ.P.56. Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Lexis Case Attached to Brief# (2) Supplement Lexis Case Attached to Brief)(Greenwald, Kenneth)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Richard R. DuVall in Opposition re: [15] MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit Memo of Law)(DuVall, Richard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                      MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK - Decision: Plaintiff has two weeks to respond to (1) The Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Reed Smith, LLP and (2) The Motion to Dismiss filed defendants Larry Thew, John Thew, Taconic 82, Inc., and Michele Thew. Defendants will have 1 week to reply. Submitted By: A Dolger. (dcr, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re: [14] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [14] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Richard R. DuVall in Opposition re: [14] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List# (2) Exhibit Pagones' Order# (3) Exhibit Gerald Thew Family Trust Declaration of Trust# (4) Exhibit Deed (Gerald Thew to Trust) 4-1-94# (5) Exhibit R.W. Thew Irrevocable Trust Declaration of Trust# (6) Exhibit Deed 5-17-02 Doc #2002-7542# (7) Exhibit Deed 5-17-02 Doc #2002-7543# (8) Exhibit Deed 5-17-02 Doc #2002-7552# (9) Exhibit Deed 5-29-02 Doc #2003-3563# (10) Exhibit Deed 4-1-03 Doc #2003-4641# (11) Exhibit Purchase & Sale Agmt (R.W. Thew Trust to Curry Family)# (12) Exhibit Affirmation of Bagliebter# (13) Exhibit Notice of Deficiency Waiver# (14) Exhibit Tax Adjustment to Estate of Gerald Thew# (15) Exhibit Title Report# (16) Exhibit Trustee's Certificate# (17) Exhibit Deed 12-19-03 Doc #2003 10736# (18) Exhibit Deed 12-19-03 Doc #2003 10738# (19) Exhibit Closing Statement# (20) Exhibit Deed 12-12-02 Doc #2003 1634# (21) Exhibit Reed Smith Escrow Accounting)(DuVall, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Brief
                                                                            BRIEF re: [14] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Reed Smith LLP's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 with Affidavits of Service annexed (Filed 1/18/05 with First Motion). Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP.(Greenwald, Kenneth)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005, Terminated: 5/4/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Michele Thew, Larry Thew, John Thew, Taconic 82, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Motion# (2) Declaration of Kathryn P. Beller, Esq.# (3) Exhibit Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# (9) Affidavit of Service - Mailing# (10) Affidavit of Service - Mailing (NOM))(Russo, Martin)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005, Terminated: 5/4/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Reed Smith, LLP. (Greenwald, Kenneth)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER extending dft Reed Smith, LLP's time to answer or move with respect to the complaint to 1/14/05. So Ordered: (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/3/05) Copies sent by Clerk's Office.(pf, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Patricia Carson served on 12/1/2004, answer due 12/21/2004. Service was accepted by Megan Carson, daughter. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. O'Hare & O'Hare P.C. served on 11/29/2004, answer due 12/20/2004. Service was accepted by Stephen O'Hare, Partner. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Stephen P. O'Hare served on 11/29/2004, answer due 12/20/2004. Service was accepted by Stephen O'Hare. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:... If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided,... Initial Conference set for 1/21/2005 03:00 PM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/6/04) (Attachments: # (1) Blank Consent Scheduling Order) Copies sent by Clerk's Office.(pf, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. William J. O'Hare served on 11/29/2004, answer due 12/20/2004. Service was accepted by Wife. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Taconic 82, Inc. served on 11/22/2004, answer due 12/13/2004. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Reed Smith, LLP served on 11/22/2004, answer due 12/13/2004. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michele Thew served on 11/23/2004, answer due 12/13/2004. Service was accepted by Michele Thew. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Larry Thew served on 11/23/2004, answer due 12/13/2004. Service was accepted by Larry Thew. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Thew served on 11/23/2004, answer due 12/13/2004. Service was accepted by John Thew. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Curry Family Partnership served on 11/24/2004, answer due 12/14/2004. Service was accepted by Ora Curry, Sr., Managing Partner. Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (DuVall, Richard)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Patricia Carson, Stephen P. O'Hare, William J. O'Hare, O'Hare & O'Hare P.C., Reed Smith, LLP, Taconic 82, Inc., The Curry Family Partnership, John Thew, Larry Thew, Michele Thew. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 522543)Document filed by Melinda Thew Cooper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(mde, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Case Designation
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (mde, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF. (mde, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patricia Carson, Stephen P. O'Hare, William J. O'Hare, O'Hare & O'Hare P.C., Reed Smith, LLP, Taconic 82, Inc., The Curry Family Partnership, John Thew, Larry Thew, Michele Thew. (mde, )
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?