Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. et al v. Boockvar et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 4:20-cv-02078-MWB
District Judge Matthew W. Brann, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 21, 2020 at 4:15 PM ST (10.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David John Henry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LINDA A. KERNS +1 215 731 1400 linda@lindakernslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald L. Hicks, Jr +1 412 235 1476 +1 412 235 4510 rhicks@porterwright.com
No Logo Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald L. Hicks, Jr +1 412 235 1476 +1 412 235 4510 rhicks@porterwright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LINDA A. KERNS +1 215 731 1400 linda@lindakernslaw.com
No Logo Lawrence, Robert S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LINDA A. KERNS +1 215 731 1400 linda@lindakernslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald L. Hicks, Jr +1 412 235 1476 +1 412 235 4510 rhicks@porterwright.com
v.
No Logo Allegheny County Board of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Centre County Board of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Chester County Board of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Delaware County Board of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Boockvar, Defendant
No Logo Montgomery County Board of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Northampton County Board of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Defendant
Office Williamsport
Filed 11/9/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Centre
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags EMERG,WMSPT
  Entries (238) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/21/2020, Entered: 11/21/2020 Brief in Support
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Motion to Intervene re [200] MOTION to Intervene pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the Fed. Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Kathy Barnette, Stephanie Borowicz, Clay Breece, Cris Dush, Robert Kaufman, Mike Kelly, Daryl Metcalfe, Luke Negron, PA Voters Alliances, Sean Parnell, Dasha Pruett, Kathy Rapp, Thomas Sankey, David Torres.(King, Thomas)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 200 Filed: 11/21/2020, Entered: 11/21/2020 Motion to intervene
    MOTION to Intervene pursuant to Rule 24(a) of the Fed. Rules of Civil Procedure by Mike Kelly, Kathy Barnette, Sean Parnell, Luke Negron, David Torres, Clay Breece, Dasha Pruett, Daryl Metcalfe, Cris Dush, Thomas Sankey, Kathy Rapp, Robert Kaufman, Stephanie Borowicz, PA Voters Alliances. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Exhibit(s) B, # (3) Exhibit(s) C, # (4) Proposed Order)(King, Thomas)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/21/2020, Entered: 11/21/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument Proceedings, In Re: Motion to Dismiss, held on 11/17/20 before Judge Brann. Court Reporter L. Shuey, Telephone Number 717-215-1270. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2021. (Shuey, Lori)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 198 Filed: 11/21/2020, Entered: 11/21/2020 Reply Brief
        REPLY BRIEF re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction in Further Support Thereof filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts.(Scaringi, Marc)
          LREF
          Legal Document 197 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Daniel T. Brier on behalf of Kathy Boockvar Attorney Barry H. Berke is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5355652.. (Brier, Daniel)
            LREF
            Legal Document 196 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Reply Brief
            REPLY BRIEF re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Centre County Board of Elections, Northampton County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Meacham, Molly)
              LREF
              Legal Document 195 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Opposition
              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration in Support of Opposition, # (2) Exhibit(s) A, # (3) Exhibit(s) B, # (4) Exhibit(s) C, # (5) Exhibit(s) D, # (6) Exhibit(s) E, # (7) Exhibit(s) F, # (8) Exhibit(s) G, # (9) Exhibit(s) H, # (10) Exhibit(s) I, # (11) Exhibit(s) J, # (12) Exhibit(s) K, # (13) Exhibit(s) L, # (14) Exhibit(s) M, # (15) Exhibit(s) N, # (16) Exhibit(s) O, # (17) Exhibit(s) P, # (18) Exhibit(s) Q, # (19) Exhibit(s) R, # (20) Exhibit(s) S)(Holtzblatt, Ari)
                LREF
                Legal Document 194 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Support
                BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [192] MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Accordingly Request for Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Kathy Boockvar.(Brier, Daniel)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 193 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Opposition
                  BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrew F. Szefi, # (2) Affidavit of Seth Bluestein, # (3) Declaration of William Turner, # (4) Declaration of Frank Dean, # (5) Unpublished Opinion(s), # (6) Certificate of Service)(Aronchick, Mark)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 192 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Accordingly Request for Withdrawal of Appearance by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 191 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Opposition
                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-B, # (2) Exhibit(s) Unpublished cases)(De Palma, Claudia)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 190 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Opposition
                        BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Exhibit(s) B, # (3) Exhibit(s) C, # (4) Appendix Unpublished Opinions)(Brier, Daniel)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 189 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Opposition
                          BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [182] MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction filed by Delaware County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit(s) 1 - Parks Declaration, # (3) Exhibit(s) A - to Parks Declaration (DOS Report))(Rogers, Edward)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 188 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                            SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Jonathan Wallace. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/20/2020. (lg)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 187 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                              PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jonathan Wallace on behalf of Democrats Abroad Attorney Jonathan Wallace is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5354866.. (Wallace, Jonathan)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 186 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Mary McKenzie. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/20/2020. (lg)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 185 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Brief in Support
                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re [172] MOTION for Leave to File to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts.(Scaringi, Marc)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 184 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Mary M McKenzie on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Mary McKenzie is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5353824.. (McKenzie, Mary)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Mary McKenzie. (lg)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 183 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Brief
                                        BRIEF by David John Henry, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Lawrence Roberts. in Support of Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by David John Henry, Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Lawrence Roberts.(Scaringi, Marc)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 182 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Motion
                                          MOTION Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction , filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit(s), # (3) Exhibit(s), # (4) Exhibit(s), # (5) Exhibit(s), # (6) Exhibit(s), # (7) Exhibit(s), # (8) Exhibit(s), # (9) Exhibit(s), # (10) Exhibit(s), # (11) Exhibit(s), # (12) Exhibit(s), # (13) Exhibit(s), # (14) Exhibit(s), # (15) Exhibit(s), # (16) Exhibit(s), # (17) Exhibit(s), # (18) Exhibit(s))(Scaringi, Marc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 181 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 appendix
                                            APPENDIX/ADDENDUM by Jeffrey Cutler, pro se to [180] MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # (1) Addendum Cont'd, # (2) Addendum Cont'd, # (3) Addendum Cont'd)(lg)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 180 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Motion to intervene
                                              MOTION to Intervene "Motion to Declare Donald J. Trump, Inc. Victorious For Injunctive Relief..." by Jeffrey Cutler, pro se. (Attachment: # (1) Proposed Order)(lg)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 179 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Reply Brief
                                                REPLY BRIEF re [140] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Joinder , [135] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Centre County Board of Elections, Delaware County Board of Elections, Northampton County Board of Elections.(Meacham, Molly)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 178 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Reply Brief
                                                  REPLY BRIEF re [145] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1)(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 177 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Reply Brief
                                                    REPLY BRIEF re [165] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS PENDING STATE-COURT RESOLUTION OF STATE-LAW QUESTIONS filed by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Unpublished Opinion(s))(Aronchick, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2020 (jr).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 176 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Reply Brief
                                                      REPLY BRIEF re [127] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Unpublished Opinions)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 175 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Reply Brief
                                                        REPLY BRIEF re [161] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Unpublished Opinion(s))(Walczak, Witold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 174 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Order
                                                          ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the appearance of Linda Ann Kerns, Esquire is hereby withdrawn as counsel for the Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/19/2020. (jr)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 173 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Order
                                                            ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the provisions of Middle District of Pennsylvania Local Rule 83.1.1 are suspended relating to the prohibition against the release of the audio recording of the oral argument conducted before the Court on 11/17/2020 and the audio recording shall be posted on the District Court website following the docketing of this Order. The Court believes that the public's interest in this particular case outweighs the Court's general concerns regarding the taping, recording or broadcasting of court proceedings as reflected and articulated in MD LR 83.1.1. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/19/2020. (jr)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION: DOC #172-1 and DOC #172-2 were replaced at the request of counsel. NEF regenerated. (jr)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: DOC #172-1 and DOC #172-2 were replaced at the request of counsel. NEF regenerated. (jr)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File to File Second Amended Complaint by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit(s), # (3) Exhibit(s))(Scaringi, Marc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2020) (jr). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/19/2020) (jr).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 171 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Motion to Expedite
                                                                    MOTION to Expedite by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Statement)(Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 170 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [127] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts.(Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 167 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Order on motion to extend time
                                                                        ORDER granting [164] Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Motion for Preliminary Injunction is extended to 5:00 P.M. on 11/19/2020. The deadline for Defendants to file any opposition briefs is extended to 5:00 P.M. on 11/20/2020. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file any reply brief is extended to 12:00 P.M. on 11/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/18/2020. (jr)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 166 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Joinder of Amici Curiae Brief of Pennsylvania Senate Republican Caucus by Bryan Cutler, Kerry Benninghoff. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wallen, Zachary)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 165 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS PENDING STATE-COURT RESOLUTION OF STATE-LAW QUESTIONS by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 164 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020, Terminated: 11/18/2020 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Extension of Time to File Motion for PI by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 163 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Letter
                                                                                Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs re: filing Motion for Leave to Amended Complaint. (Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 162 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020 Order
                                                                                  ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the evidentiary hearing previously scheduled for 11/19/2020 is CANCELLED. Linda A. Kerns, Esquire's [131] motion for an order to show cause is DENIED. Plaintiffs will file any brief in opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss by 5 P.M. on 11/18/2020. Defendants may file any reply briefs by 12 P.M. on 11/19/2020. Plaintiffs may file a new motion for preliminary injunction by 5 P.M. on 11/18/2020. Defendants may file any opposition briefs by 5 P.M. on 11/19/2020. Plaintiffs may file any reply brief by 12 P.M. on 11/20/2020. Plaintiffs may file a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint by 5 P.M. on 11/18/2020. Defendants are not required to file any response to that motion for the time being. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/18/2020. (jr)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: DOC #168 and #169 deleted. Plaintiffs to refile. (jr)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Motion terminated: [138] MOTION for Joinder in Secretary of the Commonwealth Kathy Boockvar's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [ECF 127] and Notice of Supplemental Authority [ECF 130] filed by Montgomery County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections (NOTE: this document is a Notice of Joinder). (lg)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 161 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gupta, Rani)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 response
                                                                                          RESPONSE by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts to Defendants' Discovery Letter. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                            SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Rudolph Giuliani. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/17/2020. (lg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 157 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 Order on motion to appoint counsel
                                                                                              ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that AP's [150] motion to intervene is DENIED. AP's request for access to the physical courtroom is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/17/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 156 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 petition
                                                                                                Petition Pro Hac Vice , PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marc A. Scaringi on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Rudolph William Giuliani is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5347258., filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Scaringi and/or Attorney Caffrey are instructed to have Attorney Giuliani register as an e-filer with Middle District of Pennsylvania as soon as possible; all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified NY bar record of Attorney Rudolph Giuliani; Attorney Brian Caffrey is generally admitted to Middle District of Pennsylvania and is eligible to be associate counsel as listed on the Petition for Admission. (lg)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 155 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Geffen on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover (Geffen, Benjamin)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 154 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                        ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appearance of Douglas Bryan Hughes and John Scott is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/16/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 153 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                          ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' [152] motion for a continuance (filed on 11/16/2020 at 7:40 PM) is DENIED. Oral argument will take place as scheduled, tomorrow, 11/17/2020. Counsel for the parties are expected to be prepared for argument and questioning. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/16/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020, Terminated: 11/16/2020 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Oral Argument and Hearing by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 151 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020, Terminated: 11/16/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kerns, Scott, Hughes by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 150 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020, Terminated: 11/17/2020 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Amend/Correct , MOTION to Alter Judgment , MOTION to Intervene by Associated Press. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Knudsen Burke, Paula)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 149 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Scaringi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scaringi, Marc)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 148 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Douglas Hughes. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/16/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                      SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney John Scott. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/16/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 146 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                        ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the [82] motion for leave to file an amicus brief by Charles Dent, et al. is GRANTED. The [91] motion for leave to file an amicus brief by Matthew H. Haverstick, et al. is GRANTED. The [129] motion for leave to file an amicus brief by Democrats Abroad is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/16/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 145 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 144 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re [98] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 143 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [127] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, [81] MOTION to Dismiss Based on Abstention and Rule 12(b) filed by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 10 - Guidance Concerning Civilian Absentee & Mail-In Ballot Procedures, # (2) Exhibit(s) 11 - Provisional Voting Guidance, # (3) Exhibit(s) 12 - Memorandum and Order, # (4) Appendix Unpublished Opinions)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re [90] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Unpublished Opinion(s))(Walczak, Witold)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [140] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Joinder filed by Northampton County Board of Elections.(Brennan, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 140 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Joinder by Northampton County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brennan, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 139 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re [92] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS PENDING STATE-COURT RESOLUTION OF STATE-LAW QUESTIONS filed by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections.(Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 138 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020, Terminated: 11/18/2020 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Joinder in Secretary of the Commonwealth Kathy Boockvar's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [ECF 127] and Notice of Supplemental Authority [ECF 130] by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections.(Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 137 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF re [131] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Relating to Harassment filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [135] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Centre County Board of Elections, Delaware County Board of Elections.(Meacham, Molly)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 135 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centre County Board of Elections, Delaware County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Meacham, Molly)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 134 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Letter
                                                                                                                                                Letter from Counsel for Defendants re: Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Exhibit(s))(Meacham, Molly)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 133 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney J. Remy Green. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/16/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 132 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Kathy Boockvar to [131] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Relating to Harassment . (Donovan, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified New York bar record of Attorney J. Remy Green; Sean M. Schulz is generally admitted to Middle District of PA and is eligible to be associate counsel as listed on the Petition for Special Admission. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Kerns is directed to ensure that Attorney John Scott and Attorney Douglas Hughes register as an e-filers as soon as possible; all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified Texas bar record of Attorney Douglas Hughes. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020, Terminated: 11/18/2020 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Show Cause Relating to Harassment by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 130 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 Notice
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Kathy Boockvar re [120] Notice of Supplmental Authority in Support of Motion To Dismiss (Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 129 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020, Terminated: 11/16/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Democrats Abroad. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief on Behalf of Democrats Abroad, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File)(Green, Remy)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Remy Green on behalf of Democrats Abroad Attorney Remy Green is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5343993.. (Green, Remy)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 127 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [90] MOTION to Dismiss , [92] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS PENDING STATE-COURT RESOLUTION OF STATE-LAW QUESTIONS, [96] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Joinder , [82] MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, [85] MOTION to Dismiss , [81] MOTION to Dismiss Based on Abstention and Rule 12(b), [98] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 125 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties, filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) redlined amended complaint)(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief)
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. to [120] Notice . (Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 123 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Linda Ann Kerns on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. Attorney Douglas Hughes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5343708.. (Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                              SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Marian K. Schneider. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marian K Schneider on behalf of Common Cause Pennsylvania Attorney Marian Schneider is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5343463.. (Schneider, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 120 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Kathy Boockvar of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A - Bognet Decision)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Andrew Szefi. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 118 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Motion to compel discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Discovery by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc..(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [106] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appearance of Ronald L. Hicks, Jr., Carolyn B. McGee, and Porter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP, is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Linda Ann Kerns on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. Attorney John Scott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5343167.. (Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew F. Szefi on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections Attorney Andrew Szefi is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5342843.. (Szefi, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                              SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Adriel Durieux. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Ihaab Syed. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Dale Ho. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Sarah Brannon. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Sophia Lin Lakin. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Ezra Rosenberg. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Richard Bernstein. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Nancy Temple. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Marian K. Schneider. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Kerns is directed to ensure that Attorney John Scott register as an e-filer as soon as possible; all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified Texas bar record of Attorney John Scott. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Andrew Szefi. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified NY bar records of Attorney Larkin, Ho, Syed and Durieux. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified MD bar record of Attorney Sarah Brannon. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified NJ and DC bar record of Attorney Ezra Rosenberg. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified IL bar record of Attorney Nancy Temple and DC bar record of Attorney Richard Bernstein. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION: DOC #99 deleted - refiled at DOC #105. (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020, Terminated: 11/13/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Supporting Memorandum by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., David John Henry, Lawrence Roberts.(Hicks, Ronald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT (With Corrected Tables and Pagination) re [98] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 104 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Adriel Cepeda Derieux is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341621.. (Cepeda Derieux, Adriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ihaab Syed on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Ihaab Syed is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341617.. (Syed, Ihaab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Dale E. Ho on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Dale Ho is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341616.. (Ho, Dale)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Sarah E Brannon on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Sarah Brannon is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341612.. (Brannon, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Sophia Lin Lakin on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Sophia Lakin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341607.. (Lakin, Sophia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [96] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for Joinder filed by Northampton County Board of Elections.(Brennan, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Joinder by Northampton County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brennan, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [90] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-E, # (2) Unpublished Opinion(s))(Walczak, Witold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [92] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS PENDING STATE-COURT RESOLUTION OF STATE-LAW QUESTIONS filed by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michele D. Hangley, # (2) Exhibit(s) 1, # (3) Exhibit(s) 2, # (4) Exhibit(s) 3, # (5) Exhibit(s) 4, # (6) Exhibit(s) 5, # (7) Exhibit(s) 6, # (8) Exhibit(s) 7, # (9) Exhibit(s) 8, # (10) Exhibit(s) 9, # (11) Exhibit(s) 10, # (12) Exhibit(s) 11)(Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [81] MOTION to Dismiss Based on Abstention and Rule 12(b) filed by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1, # (2) Exhibit(s) 2, # (3) Exhibit(s) 3, # (4) Exhibit(s) 4, # (5) Exhibit(s) 5, # (6) Exhibit(s) 6, # (7) Exhibit(s) 7, # (8) Exhibit(s) 8, # (9) Exhibit(s) 9, # (10) Appendix Unpublished Opinions)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS PENDING STATE-COURT RESOLUTION OF STATE-LAW QUESTIONS by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020, Terminated: 11/16/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to file brief by Matthew H. Haverstick, Joshua John Voss, Shohin Vance on behalf of Amicus Party Pennsylvania Senate Republican Caucus. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Proposed Order)(Haverstick, Matthew) Modified on 11/13/2020 (to reflect this filing is a motion) (lg).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Lawrence Roberts, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Walczak, Witold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memo Memo In Support, # (2) Appendix Exhibits)(Kerns, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ezra D Rosenberg on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Ezra D. Rosenberg is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341054.. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Richard Bernstein on behalf of Charlies W. Dent, et al. Amici Group Attorney Richard D. Bernstein is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341170., filed by on behalf of Charlies W. Dent, et al. Amici Group.(Bernstein, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [85] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Centre County Board of Elections, Delaware County Board of Elections.(Meacham, Molly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Centre County Board of Elections, Delaware County Board of Elections. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meacham, Molly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Nancy A Temple on behalf of Charlies W. Dent, et al. Amici Group Attorney Nancy A. Temple is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5341152., filed by on behalf of Charlies W. Dent, et al. Amici Group.(Temple, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 83 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia De Palma on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover (De Palma, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020, Terminated: 11/16/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief and in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Charlies W. Dent, et al. Amici Group. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Brief, # (2) Exhibit(s) 1 to Brief, # (3) Appendix A to Brief, # (4) Proposed Order)(DeAngelo, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Based on Abstention and Rule 12(b) by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Rani Gupta. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Shankar Duraiswamy. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney David Zionts. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Seth Waxman. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Ari Holtzblatt. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Rani Gupta on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Rani Gupta is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5340838.. (Gupta, Rani)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Shankar Duraiswamy on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney Shankar Duraiswamy is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5340810.. (Duraiswamy, Shankar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David Meir Zionts on behalf of Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover Attorney David Zionts is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5340792.. (Zionts, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Order on motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the ACLU Intervenors' [30] motion to intervene is GRANTED. The DNC's [39] motion to intervene is GRANTED. Daniel A. Berger's [55] motion to intervene is DENIED. The ACLU Intervenors and the DNC may file responsive pleadings, motions, and briefings on the same schedule as the Defendants. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Lalitha Madduri. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Uzoma Nkwonta. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Marc Elias. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney John Geise. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Seth Waxman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5340143., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Ari Holtzblatt is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5340073., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Exhibit(s))(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Marc Elias is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5340013., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney John Geise is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5340006., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Kyle Semroc. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Uzoma Nkwonta is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339999., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Alex Lacey. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney John Coit. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Christina Matthias. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Lalitha Madduri is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339843., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Clifford Levine. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney John B. Hill. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene by Daniel A. Berger. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Opposition, # (2) Proposed Order)(lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Clifford Levine is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339822., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplement by Democratic National Committee. to [38] Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, Kyle J. Semroc. (Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Virginia Scott. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Jon Greenbaum. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Daniel Donovan. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/12/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplement by Democratic National Committee. to [37] Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, Alex M. Lacey. (Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John B. Hill on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections Attorney John B. Hill is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339678., filed by on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections.(Hill, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christina C Matthias on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections Attorney Christina C. Matthias is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339667., filed by on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections.(Matthias, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John Coit on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections Attorney John G. Coit is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5339656., filed by on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections.(Coit, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Wiygul on behalf of Chester County Board of Elections (Wiygul, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Hangley on behalf of Chester County Board of Elections (Hangley, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Aronchick on behalf of Chester County Board of Elections (Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P Brennan on behalf of Northampton County Board of Elections (Brennan, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Andrew Szefi is directed to file a petition for special admission. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified DC bar records of Attorney Zionts and Duraiswamy and CA bar record of Attorney Gupta. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified DC bar records of Attorney Holtzblatt and Attorney Waxman. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified CA bar record of Attorney Lalitha Madduri. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified NY and DC bar records of Attorney Uzoma Nkwonta. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified DC bar record of Attorney Marc Elias. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified NY bar record of Attorney John Geise. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Clifford Levine. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Alex Lacey. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Kyle Semroc. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney John B. Hill. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA and NY bar records of Attorney Christina Matthias. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney John Coit. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc 42 deleted; incorrectly docketed to this case. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified Ohio bar record of Attorney Daniel Donovan. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Virginia Scott. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified CA bar record of Attorney Jon Greenbaum; Attorney Witold Walczak is generally admitted to Middle District of PA and is eligible to be associate counsel as listed on the Petition for Admission. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: 11/11/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jon Greenbaum on behalf of Meril Lara, Taylor Stover, Joseph Ayeni, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Black Political Empowerment Project, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Natalie Price, Stephanie Higgins, Tim Stevens, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda Attorney Jon Greenbaum is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5338738., filed by on behalf of Meril Lara, Taylor Stover, Joseph Ayeni, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Black Political Empowerment Project, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Natalie Price, Stephanie Higgins, Tim Stevens, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda.(Greenbaum, Jon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: 11/11/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [39] MOTION to Intervene filed by Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: 11/11/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene by Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: 11/11/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Kyle Semroc is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5338364., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: 11/11/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee Attorney Alex Lacey is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5338357., filed by on behalf of Democratic National Committee.(Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Order on Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Kathy Boockvar's [25] motion to transfer the action to the Harrisburg Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania is DENIED. The [28] motion to join in Defendant Boockvar's motion to transfer, filed by multiple Defendants is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the schedule for briefing, argument, and hearing in this matter is set forth as follows: Plaintiffs shall file their motion seeking injunctive relief by 5:00 PM Thursday, 11/12/2020. Defendants shall file their motion(s) to dismiss by 5:00 PM Thursday, 11/12/2020. Plaintiffs shall file their response to any motions to dismiss by 12:00 PM Sunday, 11/15/2020. Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiffs' response by 12:00 PM Monday, 11/16/2020. Oral Argument scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in Williamsport - Courtroom 1 before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. This Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on Thursday, 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom No. 1, Fourth Floor, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, Williamsport, PA 17701. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Taylor on behalf of Northampton County Board of Elections (Taylor, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Virginia Scott on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections Attorney Virginia Scott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5336885.. (Scott, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [30] MOTION to Intervene filed by Joseph Ayeni, Black Political Empowerment Project, Common Cause Pennsylvania, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Ricardo Morales, NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Natalie Price, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Ex 1 Declaration of Suzanne Almeida for Commlon Cause Pennsylvania, # (2) Exhibit(s) Ex 2 Declaration of Tim Stevens, personally and for B-PEP, # (3) Exhibit(s) Ex 3 Declaration of Kenneth Huston for NAACP PA State Conference, # (4) Exhibit(s) Ex 4 Declaration of Terrie Griffin for League of Women Voters Pennsylvania, # (5) Exhibit(s) Ex 5 Declaration of Stephanie Higgins, # (6) Exhibit(s) Ex 6 Declaration of Lucia Gajda, # (7) Exhibit(s) Ex 7 Declaration of Ricardo Morales, # (8) Exhibit(s) Ex 8 Declaration of Natalie Price, # (9) Exhibit(s) Ex 9 Declaration of Joseph Ayeni, # (10) Exhibit(s) Ex 10 Declaration of Lara, # (11) Exhibit(s) Ex 11 Declaration of Taylor Stover)(Walczak, Witold) Modified on 11/10/2020 (aaa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene by NAACP Pennsylvania State Conference, Common Cause Pennsylvania, League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, Black Political Empowerment Project, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, Ricardo Morales, Constance Powers, Natalie Price, Lucia Gajda, Stephanie Higgins, Meril Lara, Tim Stevens, Taylor Stover, Joseph Ayeni. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Walczak, Witold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford B. Levine on behalf of Democratic National Committee (Levine, Clifford)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020, Terminated: 11/10/2020 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Joinder IN MOTION TO TRANSFER (ECF No. 25) by Allegheny County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections.(Hangley, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 3:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2020. (jr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Daniel T Donovan on behalf of Kathy Boockvar Attorney Daniel Donovan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5336561.. (Donovan, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020, Terminated: 11/10/2020 Motion to transfer case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Transfer Case to Harrisburg Division by Kathy Boockvar. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christina C Matthias on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections (Matthias, Christina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Wiygul on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections (Wiygul, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Aronchick on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections (Aronchick, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Dupuis on behalf of Centre County Board of Elections (Dupuis, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D. Hangley on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections (Hangley, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Molly E Meacham on behalf of Centre County Board of Elections (Meacham, Molly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Dempsey on behalf of Kathy Boockvar. (Dempsey, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Walsh on behalf of Kathy Boockvar. (Walsh, Donna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Brier on behalf of Kathy Boockvar. (Brier, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Terence Grugan. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Edward Rogers. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Elizabeth Wingfield. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2020. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Szefi on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections. (Szefi, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boland on behalf of Kathy Boockvar (Boland, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Moniak on behalf of Kathy Boockvar (Moniak, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Mascio Romano on behalf of Kathy Boockvar (Romano, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Keli M. Neary on behalf of Kathy Boockvar (Neary, Keli)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Terence M Grugan on behalf of Delaware County Board of Elections Attorney Terence Grugan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5335655.. (Grugan, Terence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Scott on behalf of Allegheny County Board of Elections. (Scott, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Edward D. Rogers on behalf of Delaware County Board of Elections Attorney Edward Rogers is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5335486.. (Rogers, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Elizabeth Wingfield on behalf of Delaware County Board of Elections Attorney Elizabeth Wingfield is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5335481.. (Wingfield, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Katsiff on behalf of Delaware County Board of Elections (Katsiff, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Christina Matthias is required to file for special admission for this case OR make arrangements to be generally admitted to Middle District of PA. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Edward Rogers has been specially admitted in this case; no further action required. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Edward D. Rogers is required to file for special admission for this case OR make arrangements to be generally admitted to Middle District of PA. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Virginia Scott and Attorney Andrew Szefi are required to file for special admission for this case OR make arrangements to be generally admitted to Middle District of PA. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Terence Grugan; Attorney Katsiff is generally admitted to Middle District of PA and is eligible to be associate counsel as listed on the Petition for Amission. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar records of Attorney Elizabeth Wingfield and Attorney Edward Rogers; Attorney Katsiff is generally admitted to Middle District of PA and is eligible to be associate counsel as listed on the Petitions for Amission. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # (1) Notice/Consent Form, # (2) AO398 Notice, # (3) AO399 Waiver) (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Allegheny County Board of Elections, Kathy Boockvar, Centre County Board of Elections, Chester County Board of Elections, Delaware County Board of Elections, Montgomery County Board of Elections, Northampton County Board of Elections, Philadelphia County Board of Elections ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5334722), filed by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Lawrence Roberts, and David John Henry (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 675 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?