DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:20-cv-01567-EDK
District Judge Elaine D. Kaplan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 15, 2020 at 5:23 PM ST (9.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDRA SEELY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo CAMERON TARSA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo ERIC OSTERGREN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo MARIAN SHERIDAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo MATTHEW SEELY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo MERCEDES WIRSING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
No Logo PHILIP O'HALLORAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Mongelli, II +1 718 463 7333 +1 718 358 4872 michaelfmongelli@nyc.rr.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 11/10/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 138 - Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Unreported Opinion (Website)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Unreported Opinion (Website)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Request for Filing Fee Pay.gov Refund
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
            Order of Dismissal. Granting [5] Motion to Withdraw - Rule 41(a)(1) and dismissing [1] Complaint; Vacating as moot [4] Order to transfer case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (tjd) Service on parties made.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion to Withdraw
              MOTION to Withdraw [1] Complaint, , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 11/30/2020.(Hearne, Mark)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Unreported OpinionCourt Filing
                UNREPORTED OPINION transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (tjd) Service on parties made.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Notice of AssignmentCourt Filing
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (vds)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against USA (O) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number AUSFCC-6587718) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by CAMERON TARSA, MARIAN SHERIDAN, PHILIP O'HALLORAN, DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ALEXANDRA SEELY, MATTHEW SEELY, ERIC OSTERGREN. Answer due by 1/9/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Civil Cover Sheet)(vds)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 289 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?