Eberwein v. Villarnos et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:20-cv-08055-LB
Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 18, 2020 at 12:08 AM ST (5.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Eberwein, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bruce T. Beesley, Defendant
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Greg Villarnos, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla"
No Logo Tesla Human Resource Department, Defendant
No Logo Tesla Information Technology Department, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/16/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,ProSe
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020, Terminated: 11/17/2020 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Eberwein. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Robert Eberwein. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint part 2, # (2) Complaint part 3, # (3) Complaint part 4, # (4) Complaint part 5, # (5) Proposed Order, # (6) Envelope) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 39 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?