Filipov v. American Airlines, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-07076-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Loretta Filipov, Plaintiff

Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Boeing Company"
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Globe Aviation Services Corp."
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ICTS International NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Paul Robbins +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 probbins@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Midway Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael D. Steger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Douglas Steger +1 845 727 1750 +1 845 689 2155 msteger@steger-law.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/11/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 5/9/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 78 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File Document
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality. Document filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Steger, Michael)
    LREF
    Legal Document 77 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 76 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 75 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
          LREF
          Legal Document 74 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 73 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, and 4 World Trade Center LLC, contained in the Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 71 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 4/4/2008 Terminate Motions
                  Motions terminated: (1058 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 61 in 1:05-cv-07243-AKH) CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER CONCERNING SETTLEMENT. On May 9,2007, I approved a settlement of this case. Pursuant to agreed and ordered procedure, plaintiff submitted a proposed order for division of the proceeds of settlement. I decline to approve the proposed division. The essential point of disagreement arises from a proposed distribution to plaintiff's attorneys of 25 percent of the net settlement. All settlements thus far have been based on a 15 percent attorney's fee, based on the net settlement proceeds. I have declined to approve settlements that allocated more to attorneys... the Filipov settlement will be approved if attorneys' fees are limited to 15 percent of net proceeds. Plaintiff Filipov and Motley Rice LLC shall resubmit an application for a division of settlement proceeds conforming to this order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 1:03-cv-07076-AKH(rjm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (PANYNJ), contained in the Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant AirTran, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                        AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                          PRIVACY ACT ORDER. To the extent that the Government objects to providing the parties with the requested information on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act, the objection is overruled and the US shall produce the Requested Information to the parties purs. to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11). This Document relates to 21MC101. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government. Memorandum of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey in Support of Focused Discovery from the Government. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Jacob, Beth)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 64 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                DECLARATION of Robert A. Clifford, Gregory P. Joseph, Marc S. Moller, Ronald L. Motley, Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                    DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                      DECLARATION of Wolfgang A. Dase, Esq. in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2007 ~Motion to Sever
                                        CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (This document relates to All Cases); the Cross-Claims by Cross-claim pltffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trace Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trace Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability complaint and Cross-claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against deft AirTran, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(sn)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
                                            FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 7076(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants and without costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/9/07) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 2:03-cv-07076-AKH(ml)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                            NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT... It is hereby agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel that any disclosure of a document or information by the Government shall not constitute a waiver by the Government of any privilege or other protection that may be applicable or information not disclosed. This Non-Waiver Agreement does not constitute and agreement by the Government to produce any particular document or information in the litigation, and is without prejudice to any objections the Government may have to any party's discovery requests. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al. This Document also relates to 21MC101.(rjm)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that deft. AirTran Airways, Inc. is dismissed w/out prejudice and w/out costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97) and in any other actions involving United Airlines Flight 175 departing from Logan Airport in Boston... 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-7153, 02-2802, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-7152, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365. Ptffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 6/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                  DECLARATION of Keith Harris in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                    DECLARATION of Richard A Williamson in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                      DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [47] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [47] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                          MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... that defendant MIDWEST AIRLINES, formally known as MIDWEST EXPRESS AIRLINES, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the following individual action consolidated in the: In Re: September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 1. Feller v AMR Corporation, etal: 04 CV 09627... and as further set forth in said Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that Defts. UAL Corporation and United Airlines, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11th Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-8918, 04-7291, 03-7076, 02-8916, 02-7156, 02-7155, 03-6803, 03-7040, 02-3676, 03-7022, 03-7070, 02-7289, 03-7071, 02-7144... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) (Orig. doc. Filed in case no. 21 MC 97, as doc. #949)(ae)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (rjm, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE that defendant AirTran Airways, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice... without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21MC97) and in any other actions involving American Airlines Flight 11 departing from Logan Airport in Boston or damages arising from the World Trade Center site or the surrounding areas: 02-3676, 02-8918, 03-7076, 03-6809, 02-8916, 02-7156, 03-6803, 02-7155, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7070, 03-7071, 02-7144, 02-7290, 02-7289, 03-7032. This Document relates to All Cases. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 1/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue.(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/06) (Original document filed in 21mc97 as doc. #863) (kco, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL : dft Continental Airlines, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the individual actions consolidated in the In re September 11 Litigation (21MC97) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/06) Original document filed in case #21 MC 97, document #822. (dle, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the above-entitled action is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc., and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/04) (dt, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendant United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. And US AIR Group d/b/a US Airways Express To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jmi, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 6/1/2004, answer due 6/21/2004. Service was accepted by Maria Snow. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (jco, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant America West Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by America West Airlines, INc. (dfe, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Second Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by NorthWest Airlines Corporation. (jp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE of Adoption Master Answer To Plaintiff's Flight 11 Amended Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Continental Airlines Inc. (jmi, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc. (ps, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ADOPTION TO ITS MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corp.. (sac, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, In. to Plaintiffs' Amended Filght 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by American Trans Air, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (laq, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Adoption Of Master Answer Of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (jmi, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Boeing Company. (gf, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(cd, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Motion for Elizabeth Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/22/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21mc97, doc. #334.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                      MOTION for an order pursuant to Local Civl Rule 1.3(c) of the F.R.C.P. granting Elizabeth Smith permission to appear as attorney of record for the plaintiffs; w/ attch. affidavit in support.Document filed by William F. Hunt Jr. (orig. document docketed in 02cv0456 as document #42). Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Order
                                                                                                                        ORDER; that the cases listed immediately below are active cases but plaintiffs in those cases have filed VCF claims. However, these cases were not included in Appendix A to the 3/1/2004 Order. These cases also may be subject to motions to dismiss by defendants but these cases shall remain active subject to any dismissal motions. 02cv452, 02cv458, 02cv6361, 03cv7031, 02cv6364, 02cv7143, 02cv7146, 02cv7147, 02cv7148, 02cv7150, 02cv7224, 03cv7098, 03cv7638, 03cv10325, 02cv7243, 02cv7245, 03cv7075, 02cv7258, 02cv7267, 03cv7133, 02cv7271, 02cv7272, 02cv7290, 03cv6866, 02cv7608, 03cv2004, 02cv10160, 03cv6183, 03cv6801, 03cv6802, 03cv6803, 03cv6804, 03cv6805, 03cv6809, 03cv6811, 03cv6944, 03cv7022, 03cv7028, 03cv7070, 03cv7071, 03cv7076, 04cv1857, 04cv2519. The foregoing cases will be subject to the discovery and briefing schedule originally set forth in the 3/24/2004 Order as modified by Order of 4/7/2004. Accordingly, plaintiffs in the foregoing cases will provide defendants with documents responsive to Richard Williamson's 3/22/2004 letter by 4/16/2004. Thereafter, defendants will review the materials produced by plaintiffs to determine whether depositions will be necessary. If defendants determine that depositions are necessary, defendants will contact plaintiff's counsel in the individual action to obtain consent for the depositions. Defendants will then request a conference with the Court to determine whether defendants may take such depositions. Defendants shall serve and file motions to dismiss by 5/17/2004. Opposing memoranda and affidavits shall be served and filed by 5/31/2004. Reply papers shall be served and filed by 6/7/2004. Oral argument on the motions to dismiss will be held on 6/9/2004 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa, Part I on 4/9/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #332(kkc, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                          CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB at the following address: Securitas AB c/o Lindhagensplan 70, Box 12307, SE-102 28, Stockholm, Sweden on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 970. (ps, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                            CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 970, RECEIVED ON: 3/30/04. (ps, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Thompson for Loretta Filipov, Ronald L. Motley for Loretta Filipov, Jodi Westbrook Flowers for Loretta Filipov, Robert T. Haefele for Loretta Filipov, Donald A. Migliori for Loretta Filipov, Mary F. Schiavo for Loretta Filipov admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2004) Original Endorsements filed in case no. 21 MC 97, docs. # 289 (Jeffrey Scott Thompson), # 290 (Ronald L. Motley), # 291 (Jodi Westbrook Flowers), # 292 (Robert T. Haefele), # 293 (Donald A. Migliori), # 304 (Mary Schiavo).(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon United Airlines, Inc. served on 12/18/2003; answer due 1/7/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Northwest Airlines Corporation on 12/19/03. Service was accepted by Deb Van Ness. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Midway Airlines Corporation served on 12/18/2003, answer due 1/7/2004. Service was accepted by Dionne Miles. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Valerie Holmes. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon America West Airlines, INc. served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004; American Airlines, Inc. served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004; US Airways, Inc. served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Boeing Company served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Service was accepted by Jenise Gogan. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Pinkerton's, Inc. served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Service was accepted by Nichols Knight. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Service was accepted by Nicholas Knight. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Globe Aviation Services Corp. served on 12/18/2003, answer due 1/7/2004. Service was accepted by Todd M.Smith. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Huntleigh USA Corporation served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Service was accepted by Kathy Richardson. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Airtran Airways, Inc. served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004. Service was accepted by Indra Lall. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon American Trans Air, Inc. served on 12/18/2003, answer due 1/7/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 12/18/2003, answer due 1/7/2004. Service was accepted by Carla Brateng. Document filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case; Loretta Filipov served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon Colgan Air, Inc. served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004. Service was accepted by Ted Bridges. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons, Amended Complaint and Order Suspending Case upon AMR Corporation served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Lisa Magdaleno. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Loretta Filipov. ICTS International NV waiver sent on 3/3/2004, answer due 5/3/2004. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. Original Document filed in 21 mc 97, Doc. #269. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Massachusetts Port Authority, NorthWest Airlines Corporation, AMR Corporation, Airtran Airways, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., America West Airlines, INc., American Airlines, Inc., American Trans Air, Inc., Boeing Company, Burns International Security Services Corporation, Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines Inc, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Globe Aviation Services Corp., Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Midway Airlines Corporation, Pinkerton's, Inc., Securitas AB, US Airways, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. Document filed by Loretta Filipov. Received in night deposit box on 1/14/04 at 11:04 p.m. Related document: [1] Complaint.(yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                      Set Answer Due Date re: [5] Amended Complaint,, as to AMR Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Air Transport Association of America, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Airtran Airways, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Alaska Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; America West Airlines, INc. answer due on 1/26/2004; American Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; American Trans Air, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Boeing Company answer due on 1/26/2004; Burns International Security Services Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Colgan Air, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Continental Airlines Inc answer due on 1/26/2004; Delta Air Lines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Does answer due on 1/26/2004; Globe Aviation Services Corp. answer due on 1/26/2004; Huntleigh USA Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; ICTS International NV answer due on 1/26/2004; Midway Airlines Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Pinkerton's, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Securitas AB answer due on 1/26/2004; US Airways, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; United Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; granting [2-1] motion For an Order permitting plaintiff to place the within action on the Courts suspense docket pursuant to this court's Order dated 7/22/03. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Paul J. Hanly Jr., Jayne Conroy . (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                                                                                                                            CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Case consolidated with 1:21-mc-97. (rjm, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                Case accepted as related to 1:21mc97 . Notice of assignment to follow. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003, Terminated: 10/3/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Loretta Filipov For an Order permitting plaintiff to place the within action on the Courts suspense docket pursuant to this court's Order dated 7/22/03 . No Return Date. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484665. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 1:02cv6186 and 1:21mc97. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?