Maria Donato v. Solarcity Corporation, et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Cruz, Case No. 20CV00161

Tags
Last Updated November 20, 2020 at 3:45 AM ST (5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donato, Maria, Plaintiff
v.
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None
Case Management Conference
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None
    Notice of Settlement Filed
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None
      Cause Of Action
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None
        30 Day Summons
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None
          Summons Issued / Filed
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None
            Complaint Filed
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None
              Civil Case Cover Sheet

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 75 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?