Williams v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:20-cv-08208-HSG
District Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 20, 2021 at 7:21 PM DT (2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zachery Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office Oakland
Filed 11/20/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 195 - Contract Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting [36] Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 Order on Motion for Hearing
                      ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. [39] Joint Motion for Hearing on Tesla's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims. The Court takes the pending Dkt. No. [36] motion under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for June 10, 2021 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                        CORRECTED CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NOS. [41]. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on [36] motion to dismiss, previously set for June 3, 2021, is continued to June 10, 2021 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: 6/1/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                          CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to [36] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims Alleged in the First Amended Complaint.,. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Clerks Notice
                            CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. [36]. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the motion set for June 3rd will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021, Terminated: 6/9/2021 Motion for Hearing
                              Joint MOTION for Hearing on Tesla's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims filed by Tesla, Inc., and Michael Ma. (Mallow, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                REPLY (re [36] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims Alleged in the First Amended Complaint ) filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Model S Quick Guide)(Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                  Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims Alleged in the First Amended Complaint (re [36] Amended MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byMichael Ma. (Wright, David) (Filed on 4/28/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: 4/2/2021, Terminated: 6/21/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                    Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims Alleged in the First Amended Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/28/2021. Replies due by 5/19/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021, Terminated: 4/5/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                      ***RE-FILED, SEE DOCKET NO. [36]*** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Ma's Claims Alleged in the First Amended Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/28/2021. Replies due by 5/19/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 3/31/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting [33] Stipulation to Stay Plaintiff Zachery Williams' Claims and to Continue the Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 02:00 PM.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021, Terminated: 3/26/2021 stipulation
                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Plaintiff Zachery Williams' Claims and to Continue the Case Management Conference filed by Tesla, Inc., Michael Ma, and Zachery Williams. (Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 3/25/2021) Modified on 3/26/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Clerks Notice
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. [30]. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for April 6, 2021 will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Notice of change of address
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Amir M. Nassihi (Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting [29] Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Continuance of Case Management Conference. Motions due by 3/31/2021; Responses due by 4/28/2021; Replies due by 5/19/2021; and Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 02:00 PM.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021, Terminated: 2/25/2021 stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Continuance of Case Management Conference re [7] Amended Complaint, filed by Tesla, Inc., Michael Ma and Zachery Williams. (Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 2/24/2021) Modified on 2/25/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: 2/9/2021 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Tesla, Inc. (Straus, Rachel) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Zachery Williams (Richards, Mark) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Michael Ma (Richards, Mark) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. (Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nalani Lin Crisologo (Crisologo, Nalani) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Amir M. Nassihi (Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Aleeza Straus (Straus, Rachel) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lawrence Mallow (Mallow, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2021, Entered: 1/18/2021 stipulation
                                                                    STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re [7] Amended Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc., Michael Ma, and Zachery Williams. (Nassihi, Amir) (Filed on 1/18/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 16, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 9th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-08208-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 12/9/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/9/20.Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/09/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 waiver of service executed
                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Zachery Williams, Michael Ma. Service waived by Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Wright, David) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Ma, Zachery Williams.. (Wright, David) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Alan Haskins as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Haskins, Steven) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Mark I. Richards as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Richards, Mark) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Wright, David) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byZachery Williams, Michael Ma. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - SAMR Statement, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Tesla Letter, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Tesla Blog Post, # (4) Exhibit 4 - TSB 13-31-003, # (5) Exhibit 5 - TSB-17-31-001, # (6) Exhibit 6 - TSB - 17-31-001, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff Williams Invoice, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Plaintiff Ma Invoice, # (9) Affidavit Venue Affidavit - Plaintiff Ma)(Wright, David) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/7/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Affidavit
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT re [1] Complaint,, as to Consumer Legal Remedies Act Venue by Zachery Williams. (Wright, David) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Wright, David) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15224732.). Filed byZachery Williams. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - China SAMR Statement, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Blog Post, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Tesla Letter to NHTSA, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Technical Service Bulletin 13-31-003, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Technical Service Bulletin 17-31-001, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Technical Service Bulletin 19-31-001, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Repair Invoice, # (8) Civil Cover Sheet)(Wright, David) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 772 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?