Transverse, L.L.C. v. Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 20-50271

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2020 at 3:38 PM ST (4.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iowa Wireless Services, L.l.c., Doing Business As I Wireless, Defendant - Appellant Cross-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Allison Kidwell +1 512 305 4766 +1 512 391 4766 skidwell@lockelord.com
Space Thomas F. Loose +1 214 740 8000 tloose@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidney Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Torrence Evans Lewis +1 412 871 5931 torrencelewis@federalappeals.com
Space Sidney Katherine Powell +1 828 651 9543 +1 828 684 5343 sidneypowell@federalappeals.com
No Logo Transverse, L.l.c., Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Raymond E. White +1 512 495 6035 +1 512 505 6331 rwhite@mcginnislaw.com
Nature of Suit 4190 - Contract: Other
Case Type Private Civil Diversity
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:10-CV-517
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:10-CV-517
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Wednesday, 12/02/2020 in New Orleans in the East Courtroom -- PM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [20-50271] (PFT)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505589117 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None ?
    CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 11/30/2020. [20-50271] (PFT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None ?
      Paper copies of Record Excerpts [9388469-2] received as sufficient. Sufficient Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [20-50271] (Iowa Wireless) (CAS)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505545323 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
        Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes They require: physical tabs required # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied.. Sufficient Paper Copies of Record Excerpts Due on 09/02/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (MVM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
          Paper copies of Cross Appellee Brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. [20-50271] (MVM)
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None ?
            Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. [20-50271] (MVM)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
              Paper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [20-50271] (MBC)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided 7 . Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [20-50271] (MBC)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Paper copies of Cross Appellant Brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [20-50271] (MBC)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                    PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Cross-Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [9371049-2]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/31/2020 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                      PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Record Excerpts filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [9335940-2]. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 08/31/2020 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505538933 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                        PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Cross Appellant Brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [9335936-2]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/31/2020 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                          PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Cross Appellee Brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [9356237-2]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/31/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                            PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [9321150-2]. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 08/31/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505538872 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                              PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [9321108-2]. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/31/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505516248 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Transverse, L.L.C. # of Copies Provided: 0 XA/Pet Reply Brief deadline satisfied [20-50271]
                                REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Transverse, L.L.C. Date of service: 08/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Raymond Edward White )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505490969 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  CROSS APPELLEE 'S BRIEF FILED
                                  # of Copies Provided: 0 XE/Res Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Reply Brief due on 08/05/2020 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. [20-50271]
                                  REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Date of service: 07/15/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Susan Allison Kidwell )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505460645 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Transverse, L.L.C. and Transverse, L.L.C. [9335936-2] Date of service: 06/22/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Raymond Edward White )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505455783 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. # of Copies Provided: 0 [20-50271]
                                      REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. Date of service: 06/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Raymond Edward White )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505455774 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        SUFFICIENT CROSS APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED
                                        # of Copies Provided: 0
                                        Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied [20-50271]
                                        REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: CROSS APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Transverse, L.L.C.. Additionally the Brief requires The use of id is not permitted when citing to the record on appeal.. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 XA/Pet Brief deadline satisfied. XE/Res's Brief due on 07/17/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Sufficient Brief due on 07/01/2020 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [20-50271] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Transverse, L.L.C.. Date of service: 06/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Raymond Edward White )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Raymond Edward White for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505430224 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [20-50271]
                                            REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Date of service: 05/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Susan Allison Kidwell )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505430129 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0
                                              A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Brief due on 06/26/2020 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [20-50271]
                                              REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Date of service: 05/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Kidwell, Lewis, Loose, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [20-50271] (Susan Allison Kidwell )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505390678 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Raymond Edward White, Esq. for Transverse, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50271] (Raymond Edward White )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505389775 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9297572-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505386156 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/27/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [20-50271] (CMB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50271] (CMB)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505380916 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9292454-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C., Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 20-50271. NOA filed by Appellee Transverse, L.L.C.. [9292454-1] [20-50271] (RSM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sidney Katherine Powell for party(s) Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C., in case 20-50271 [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505377635 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50271] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Torrence Evans Lewis for party(s) Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C., in case 20-50271 [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:10-CV-517. Electronic ROA due on 04/24/2020. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505377373 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9290396-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505377119 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50271] (Torrence Evans Lewis )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas F. Loose for party(s) Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C., in case 20-50271 [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505375608 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.for the Court to process. Date of service: 04/08/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Kidwell; Attorney for Appellee: White. [20-50271] (Susan Allison Kidwell )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505375470 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-50271] (Thomas F. Loose )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Susan Allison Kidwell for Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 20-50271 [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505374741 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50271] (Susan Allison Kidwell )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505370337 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [20-50271] (RAJ)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?