In re: IAS Service Group, L.L.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 18-51006

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2020 at 3:44 PM EST (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo In Re: Ias Service Group, L.l.c., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidney Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Katherine Powell +1 828 651 9543 +1 828 684 5343 sidneypowell@federalappeals.com
v.
No Logo Barbara Buckley, Individually, And As Co-trustee Of The Buckley Family Trust Dated 6/21/01, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Cannon & Nelms APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Lawrence Cannon +1 714 637 4400 +1 714 637 4444 tcannon@cannonnelms.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 743 4500 +1 214 743 4545 rob.hoffman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space Leslie Ritchie Robnett +1 817 878 3520 +1 817 878 9720 leslie.robnett@kellyhart.com
No Logo James Buckley, Individually, And As Co-trustee Of The Buckley Family Trust Dated 6/21/01, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Cannon & Nelms APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Lawrence Cannon +1 714 637 4400 +1 714 637 4444 tcannon@cannonnelms.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 743 4500 +1 214 743 4545 rob.hoffman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space Leslie Ritchie Robnett +1 817 878 3520 +1 817 878 9720 leslie.robnett@kellyhart.com
No Logo Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Cannon & Nelms APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Lawrence Cannon +1 714 637 4400 +1 714 637 4444 tcannon@cannonnelms.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 743 4500 +1 214 743 4545 rob.hoffman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space Leslie Ritchie Robnett +1 817 878 3520 +1 817 878 9720 leslie.robnett@kellyhart.com
Nature of Suit
Case Type Original Proceedings
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=5:14-CV-180
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=5:14-CV-180
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504764078 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None ?
COURT ORDER denying Motion for writ of mandamus filed by Petitioner IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [8932088-2]. [18-51006] (RAJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504760179 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None ?
    RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Ms. Barbara Buckley, Mr. James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated [8941359-1] to the Motion filed by Petitioner IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [8932088-2] Date of Service: 12/13/2018 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Cannon, Hoffman, Keltner, Robnett; Attorney for Petitioner: Powell. [18-51006] (David E. Keltner )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504744345 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None ?
      EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for writ of mandamus [8932088-2] filed by Petitioner IAS Service Group, L.L.C. Date of Service: 11/30/2018 [18-51006] (SDH)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504744337 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None ?
        MOTION filed by Petitioner IAS Service Group, L.L.C. for writ of mandamus [8932088-2]. Date of service: 11/30/2018 Response/Opposition due on 12/13/2018. [18-51006] (SDH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None ?
          ORIGINAL PROCEEDING CASE docketed. [18-51006] (SDH)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 43 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?