USA v. Gary Beach
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 18-11619

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2020 at 3:44 PM ST (8.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary Michael Beach, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidney Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Katherine Powell +1 828 651 9543 +1 828 684 5343 sidneypowell@federalappeals.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily Baker Falconer +1 214 659 8822 emily.falconer@usdoj.gov
Space Leigha Amy Simonton leigha.simonton@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Andrew Magliolo-DOJ +1 214 659 8600 +1 214 659 8803 joseph.magliolo@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit
Case Type Direct Criminal
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:16-CR-472-1
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:16-CR-472-1
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505158231 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [18-11619] (NFD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505126532 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None ?
    JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [18-11619] (DTG)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505126520 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [18-11619 Affirmed ] Judge: JLW , Judge: JEG , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 10/15/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (DTG)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None ?
        ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Wiener, Graves, Oldham. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Joseph Andrew Magliolo arguing for Appellee United States of America; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Sidney Katherine Powell arguing for Appellant Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (SME)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505066263 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None ?
          LETTER filed referencing Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach in 18-11619 [9004801-2]. [18-11619]
          REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: ADDENDUM TO BRIEF FILED by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach Date of Service: 08/06/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Falconer, Magliolo, Simonton; Attorney for Appellant: Powell [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None ?
            Exhibits, 1 envelope (Govt's Admitted Exhibits - 2 DVDs), FILED ROA deadline satisfied. [18-11619] (DDL)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
              Government's EXHIBITS REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:16-CR-472-1. ROA due on 07/18/2019 [18-11619] (MBC)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                Paper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach in 18-11619 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [18-11619] (SBS)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00505005248 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                  APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED
                  Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/25/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach. [18-11619]
                  REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Gary Michael Beach. Date of service: 06/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Falconer, Hendrix, Magliolo; Attorney for Appellant: Powell [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                    CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Wednesday, 08/07/2019 in Houston -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [18-11619] (SME)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                      EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach. Extension Granted to and including 06/21/2019. Reply Brief deadline updated to 06/21/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (MBC)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504964297 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                        CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 08/05/2019. [18-11619] (GAM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                          EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach. Extension Granted to and including 06/18/2019. Reply Brief deadline updated to 06/18/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (PAC)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Paper copies of Appellee Brief filed by Appellee USA in 18-11619 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [18-11619] (SBS)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504955847 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                              APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 06/04/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/20/2019 for Appellee United States of America. [18-11619] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by USA. Date of service: 05/14/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Falconer, Hendrix, Magliolo; Attorney for Appellant: Powell [18-11619] (Joseph Andrew Magliolo )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellee USA. Extension Granted to and including 05/15/2019. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 05/15/2019 for Appellee United States of America [18-11619] (MBC)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504895675 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellee USA for filing appellee's brief until 05/15/2019 [18-11619] (Joseph Andrew Magliolo )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joseph Andrew Magliolo for Appellee USA, in case 18-11619. [18-11619] (DLJ)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Emily Baker Falconer for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 18-11619. [18-11619] (CB)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504880201 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [18-11619] (Joseph Andrew Magliolo )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach in 18-11619 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [18-11619] (SRF)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach in 18-11619 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [18-11619] (SRF)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504879796 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [18-11619] (Emily Baker Falconer )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504872834 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 03/19/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach. [18-11619]
                                                REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach. Date of service: 03/14/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Hendrix; Attorney for Appellant: Powell [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504872825 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED
                                                  A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 04/15/2019 for Appellee United States of America. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/19/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach. [18-11619]
                                                  REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Gary Michael Beach. Date of service: 03/14/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Hendrix; Attorney for Appellant: Powell [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504866237 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach [9000734-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/14/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (MBC)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504865489 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach to extend time to file brief as appellant until 03/14/2019 [9000734-2]. Date of service: 03/08/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Hendrix; Attorney for Appellant: Powell [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504814677 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/11/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach. [18-11619] (DDL)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [18-11619] (DDL)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504782809 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [18-11619] (Shawn McRoberts )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              MEMO FOR FILE. ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:16-CR-472-1. Electronic ROA due on 01/22/2019. [18-11619] (MBC)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 01/04/2019 [18-11619] (MBC)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 02/09/2018. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Electronic Filing Processed: [8953153-2] [18-11619] (MBC)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504781656 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beachfor the Court to process. Date of service: 01/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Hendrix; Attorney for Appellant: Powell. [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                      APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sidney Katherine Powell for Appellant Gary Michael Beach in 18-11619 [18-11619] (RSM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504775444 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                        APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Sidney Katherine Powell for Mr. Gary Michael Beach for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [18-11619] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504769293 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8946581-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/04/2019 for Appellant Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (KGL)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504765747 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                            DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Gary Michael Beach [18-11619] (SDH)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?