IAS Service Group, L.L.C. v. Jim Buckley & Associates, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 17-50105

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2020 at 3:46 PM ST (8.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Buckley, Individually, And As Co-trustee Of The Buckley Family Trust Dated 6/21/01, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kendall M Gray +1 713 220 3981 kendallgray@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cannon & Nelms APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Lawrence Cannon +1 714 637 4400 +1 714 637 4444 tcannon@cannonnelms.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 743 4500 +1 214 743 4545 rob.hoffman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space Leslie Ritchie Robnett +1 817 878 3520 +1 817 878 9720 leslie.robnett@kellyhart.com
No Logo James Buckley, Individually, And As Co-trustee Of The Buckley Family Trust Dated 6/21/01, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kendall M Gray +1 713 220 3981 kendallgray@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cannon & Nelms APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Lawrence Cannon +1 714 637 4400 +1 714 637 4444 tcannon@cannonnelms.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 743 4500 +1 214 743 4545 rob.hoffman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space Leslie Ritchie Robnett +1 817 878 3520 +1 817 878 9720 leslie.robnett@kellyhart.com
No Logo Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kendall M Gray +1 713 220 3981 kendallgray@andrewskurth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cannon & Nelms APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Lawrence Cannon +1 714 637 4400 +1 714 637 4444 tcannon@cannonnelms.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 743 4500 +1 214 743 4545 rob.hoffman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Evans Keltner +1 817 332 2500 +1 817 878 9280 david.keltner@kellyhart.com
Space Leslie Ritchie Robnett +1 817 878 3520 +1 817 878 9720 leslie.robnett@kellyhart.com
No Logo IAS Service Group, L.L.C., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidney Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Torrence Evans Lewis +1 412 871 5931 torrencelewis@federalappeals.com
Space Sidney Katherine Powell +1 828 651 9543 +1 828 684 5343 sidneypowell@federalappeals.com
Nature of Suit 3190 - Contract: Other
Case Type Private Civil Federal
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=5:14-CV-180
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=5:14-CV-180
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504668907 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None ?
MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [17-50105] (DTG)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504657650 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
    COURT ORDER denying Petition for rehearing filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [8865024-2] Mandate issue date is 10/04/2018 Judge(s): EBC, SAH and JCH. [17-50105] (SDH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None ?
      Paper copies of Petition for rehearing filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [17-50105] (MVM)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504625616 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None ?
        PETITION for rehearing [8865024-2] Number of Copies: 0. Mandate issue date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 09/10/2018 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C... Date of Service: 08/31/2018 [17-50105]
        REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PETITION filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. for rehearing [8865024-2]. Date of Service: 08/31/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Keltner, Robnett [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504853887 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None ?
          JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. Costs Taxed Against: Each party bear its own costs. [17-50105] (NFD)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504605591 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [17-50105 Affirmed, Reversed, Vacated, and Remanded] Judge: EBC, Judge: SAH, Judge: JCH. Mandate issue date is 09/10/2018 [17-50105] (NFD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504509769 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None ?
              DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Rule 28(j) letter with certification received from Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. because it is unnecessary as the court has accepted the initial Rule 28(j) letter filed by appellant. [17-50105] (SDH)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504509739 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None ?
                COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED striking 28j Response/Opposition filed by Appellees Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Mr. James Buckley and Ms. Barbara Buckley [8797389-2]. [17-50105] (SDH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504508351 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None ?
                  RESPONSE filed by Appellees Ms. Barbara Buckley, Mr. James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated to the 28j Letter filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 [8796370-2] Date of Service: 06/11/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Keltner, Robnett [17-50105] (David E. Keltner )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504506793 Filed: 6/9/2018, Entered: None ?
                    SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. Response to Case Cited by Appellees at Oral Argument Date of Service: 06/09/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Keltner, Robnett [17-50105] (Torrence Evans Lewis )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                      ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Clement, Higginson, Ho. Arguing Person Information Updated for: David E. Keltner arguing for Appellee Barbara Buckley, Appellee James Buckley; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Sidney Katherine Powell arguing for Appellant L.L.C. IAS Service Group [17-50105] (SME)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                        CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Tuesday, 06/05/2018 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [17-50105] (SME)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None ?
                          APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David E. Keltner for party(s) Appellee James Buckley Appellee Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated Appellee Barbara Buckley, in case 17-50105 [17-50105] (MVM)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504404270 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                            APPEARANCE FORM for David Keltner for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50105] (David E. Keltner )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504404217 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                              Attorney David Keltner is advised to resubmit an appearance form to include law firm's address. [17-50105] (LBM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504402423 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                                APPEARANCE FORM for David Keltner for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50105] (David E. Keltner )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504375787 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None ?
                                  TENTATIVE CALENDAR changed from week of 04/30/2018 to week of 06/04/2018. With Argument? Yes. [17-50105] (GAM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504364531 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                    CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 04/30/2018. [17-50105] (GAM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                      Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50105] (MRW)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504205914 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None ?
                                        APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0
                                        Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 10/31/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. [17-50105]
                                        REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. Date of service: 10/23/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504187945 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None ?
                                          LETTER filed referencing appellant brief filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 [8528989-2]. [17-50105] (ALWAYS SEND WITH APPELLANT'S BRIEF)
                                          REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. to correct an error in our opening brief. Date of Service: 10/09/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None ?
                                            Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellees Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Mr. James Buckley and Ms. Barbara Buckley in 17-50105 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50105] (RLL)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504156228 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None ?
                                              CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply brief filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [8589692-2] Reply Brief deadline updated to 10/23/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [17-50105] (MFY)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504154523 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. to extend time to file reply brief until 10/23/2017 [8589692-2]. Date of service: 09/13/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Torrence Evans Lewis )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504147325 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                  APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 09/22/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/19/2017 for Appellees Barbara Buckley, James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated. [17-50105]
                                                  REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Barbara Buckley, Mr. James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated. Date of service: 09/08/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Kendall M. Gray )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                    EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellees Ms. Barbara Buckley, Mr. James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated. Extension Granted to and including 09/12/2017. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 09/12/2017 for Appellees Barbara Buckley, James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated [17-50105] (PAC)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504074176 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                      CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellees Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Mr. James Buckley and Ms. Barbara Buckley [8539233-2] Appellee's Brief due on 09/05/2017 for Appellees Barbara Buckley, James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated [17-50105] (MFY)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504065860 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Ms. Barbara Buckley, Mr. James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated to extend the time to file appellee's brief [8528989-2] until 09/05/2017 at 11:59 pm [8539233-2]. Date of service: 07/10/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Kendall M. Gray )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                          Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50105] (SDH)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                            Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [17-50105] (SDH)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504048005 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                              RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 07/05/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. [17-50105]
                                                              REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. Date of service: 06/26/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504047982 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0
                                                                A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 07/26/2017 for Appellees Barbara Buckley, James Buckley and Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/05/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. [17-50105]
                                                                REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. Date of service: 06/26/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504029571 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                  LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising parties to disregrd the notice of docketing activity issued this date regarding an extension of time to file appellant's brief as the extension was entered in the wrong case [17-50105] (PAC)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503987628 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                    CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [8493611-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/26/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [17-50105] (MFY)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503986896 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                      MOTION filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. to extend time to file brief as appellant until 06/26/2017 at 05:00 pm [8493611-2]. Date of service: 05/10/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Cannon, Gray, Hoffman, Robnett [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                        APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anthony Lawrence Cannon for Appellee Barbara Buckley in 17-50105, Attorney Anthony Lawrence Cannon for Appellee James Buckley in 17-50105, Attorney Anthony Lawrence Cannon for Appellee Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated in 17-50105 [17-50105] (MVM)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503960180 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                          APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Anthony Lawrence Cannon, Esq. for Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Mr. James Buckley and Ms. Barbara Buckley for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-50105] (Anthony Lawrence Cannon )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                            EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. Extension Granted in Part Reason: Requesting Beyond a Level 1 Extension (30 days). A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/16/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [17-50105] (RAJ)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503945987 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                              UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. for filing Opening Brief until 06/26/2017. [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503942278 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/16/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. [17-50105] (MRB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [17-50105] (MRB)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:14-CV-180. Electronic ROA due on 03/21/2017. [17-50105] (NFD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Chris Poage, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 03/06/2017 Transcript deadline satisfied. Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [17-50105] (NFD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503899291 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [17-50105] (Chris Poage )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Leslie Ritchie Robnett for Appellee Barbara Buckley in 17-50105, Attorney Leslie Ritchie Robnett for Appellee James Buckley in 17-50105, Attorney Leslie Ritchie Robnett for Appellee Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated in 17-50105 [17-50105] (MVM)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kendall M. Gray for party(s) Appellee James Buckley Appellee Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated Appellee Barbara Buckley, in case 17-50105 [17-50105] (MVM)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Leslie Ritchie Robnett for Jim Buckley & Associates, Incorporated, Mr. James Buckley and Ms. Barbara Buckley for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [17-50105] (Leslie Ritchie Robnett )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Chris Poage, Est. Completion Dt: 03/13/2017, Est. No.of Pgs: 43, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 02/10/2017, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 03/13/2017, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 06/22/2016. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript due on 03/13/2017 for Chris Poage, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 03/13/2017 for Chris Poage, Court Reporter [17-50105] (MVM)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  APPEARANCE FORM of Kendall M. Gray for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [17-50105] (Kendall M. Gray )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503884928 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Mr. Chris Poage. [17-50105] (Chris Poage )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Torrence Evans Lewis for party(s) Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C., in case 17-50105 [17-50105] (MVM)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sidney Katherine Powell for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. in 17-50105 [17-50105] (MVM)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C.. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Chris Poage, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 06/22/2016. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 03/03/2017 for Chris Poage, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [8427863-2] [17-50105] (JMW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE FORM Torrence E.S. Lewis for IAS Services Group for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [17-50105] (Torrence Evans Lewis )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503878176 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. for the Court to process. Date of service: 02/16/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Powell; Attorney for Appellees: Hoffman, Robnett; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Cannon. [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Sidney Katherine Powell for IAS Service Group, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes.. THE IMAGE FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE VIEWABLE AS IT CONTAINS SENSITIVE INFORMATION. [17-50105] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503875422 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8426046-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/01/2017 for Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [17-50105] (PAC)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503865620 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant IAS Service Group, L.L.C. [17-50105] (RAJ)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?