Transverse, L.L.C. v. Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 13-51098

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 22, 2020 at 3:47 PM ST (8.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iowa Wireless Services, L.l.c., Doing Business As I Wireless, Defendant - Appellant Cross-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Robert Nelson +1 512 305 4868 +1 512 305 4800 jnelson@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidney Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Torrence Evans Lewis +1 412 871 5931 torrencelewis@federalappeals.com
Space Sidney Katherine Powell +1 828 651 9543 +1 828 684 5343 sidneypowell@federalappeals.com
No Logo Transverse, L.l.c., Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nelia Robbi +1 512 495 6092 +1 512 505 6392 nrobbi@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blaire Allen Knox +1 512 495 6049 +1 512 505 6349 bknox@mcginnislaw.com
Space Raymond E. White +1 512 495 6035 +1 512 505 6331 rwhite@mcginnislaw.com
Nature of Suit 4190 - Contract: Other
Case Type Private Civil Diversity
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:10-CV-517
Lower Court Case https://ecf.txwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:10-CV-517
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503152718 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None ?
MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate pull date satisfied. [13-51098] (NFD)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503143052 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None ?
    COURT ORDER denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [7957507-2], denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. [7957609-2] Mandate pull date is 08/12/2015 [13-51098] (MVM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503142119 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None ?
      REVISED UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7935123-2] [13-51098] (JRS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None ?
        Paper copies of petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503117397 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None ?
          REHEARING MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 [7957609-2]. Sufficient Rehearing due deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 07/21/2015 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (MVM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None ?
            Paper copies of petition for rehearing filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Rehearing due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503111887 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None ?
              PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the petition for rehearing filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 13-51098 [7957507-2]. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 07/15/2015 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (MVM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503110845 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None ?
                PETITION filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. for rehearing [7957609-2] Number of Copies: 0. Sufficient Rehearing due on 07/20/2015 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. Date of Service: 07/09/2015 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: no attachments other then the Court's opinion are allowed without leave of court. [13-51098]
                REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: PETITION filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. for rehearing [7957609-2]. Date of Service: 07/09/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Raymond Edward White )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503110666 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None ?
                  PETITION filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. for rehearing [7957507-2]. Date of Service: 07/09/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503084843 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None ?
                    CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend the time to file a petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. [7940837-2] until 07/09/2015. [13-51098] (PAC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503084479 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None ?
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. to extend the time to file a rehearing until 07/09/2015 at 05:00 pm [7940837-2]. Date of service: 06/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Blaire Allen Knox )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503082280 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None ?
                        CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend the time to file a petition for rehearing filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [7939036-2] until 07/09/2015 Mandate pull date updated to 07/09/2015. [13-51098] (MBC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503081764 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None ?
                          MOTION filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. to extend the time to file a rehearing until 07/09/2015 at 05:00 pm [7939036-2]. Date of service: 06/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None ?
                            COSTS TAXED: Each party to bear its own costs on appeal. [13-51098] (JMA)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503076260 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None ?
                              JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [13-51098] (JMA)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503076053 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-51098 Affirmed in Part, Reversed and Rendered in Part, Vacated in Part, and Remanded ] Judge: WED , Judge: JWE Mandate pull date is 07/02/2015; granting motion view sealed document filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [7563881-3] [13-51098] (JMA)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502829147 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None ?
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. Date of Service: 11/06/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Raymond Edward White )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502822095 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None ?
                                    SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. Date of Service: 10/31/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502820363 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. Date of Service: 10/30/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                        ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges Davis, DeMoss, Elrod. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Sidney Katherine Powell arguing for Appellant Cross-Appellee L.L.C. Iowa Wireless Services; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Raymond Edward White arguing for Appellee Cross-Appellant L.L.C. Transverse [13-51098] (PFT)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502800958 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None ?
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. (2nd FRAP 28j letter) Date of Service: 10/13/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502800949 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None ?
                                            SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. Date of Service: 10/13/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None ?
                                              CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Wednesday, 10/29/2014 in Houston -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [13-51098] (PFT)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502752786 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 10/27/2014. [13-51098] (GAM)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                  Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                    BRIEFING COMPLETE.Reply Brief deadline canceled [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502663876 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                      CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Transverse, L.L.C. Date of service: 06/13/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/23/2014 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (Raymond Edward White )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                        Paper copies of cross appellee brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502642748 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                          CROSS APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. Date of service: 05/27/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 XE/Res Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 06/13/2014 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/09/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                            Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502612716 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 [7615948-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 05/05/2014 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Paper copies of cross appellant brief filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502607720 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                    LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties to disregard the NDA received on 4/24/14, as it was entered in error. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT. Electronic ROA due on 04/28/2014. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502603163 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                        RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. Date of service: 04/21/2014 via clerk - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Nelson, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi; email - Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [13-51098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Record Excerpts not sufficient for the followingt reason: Optional contents exceed page limitations by 19 pages. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 05/06/2014 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. [13-51098] (Raymond Edward White )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502603157 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                          CROSS APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Transverse, L.L.C.. Date of service: 04/21/2014 via clerk - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Nelson, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi; email - Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White [13-51098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 XA/Pet Brief deadline satisfied. XE/Res's Brief due on 05/27/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/28/2014 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (Raymond Edward White )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502595431 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                            COURT ORDER granting motion to supplement the record on appeal with sealed exhibit #643 filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [7563881-2]; carrying with the case motion view sealed document # 643 filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [7563881-3] Judge(s): JLD. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (RSM)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 13-51098 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (RSM)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502566280 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Date of service: 03/18/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.
                                                                                  . # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 03/24/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502563687 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. Date of service: 03/17/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Brief due on 04/21/2014 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C... Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/24/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502527236 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      MOTION filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. to supplement the record on appeal with Sealed Exhibit 643 [7563881-2], to view sealed document.. Date of service: 02/10/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Knox, Robbi, White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502527077 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [13-51098] Counsel was advised to file a motion to supplement the record and view the sealed document. (MBC)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502521597 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/17/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C.. [13-51098] (MCS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [13-51098] (MCS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nelia Robbi for party(s) Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C., in case 13-51098 [13-51098] (RSM)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Blaire Allen Knox for party(s) Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C., in case 13-51098 [13-51098] (RSM)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT. Electronic ROA due on 01/02/2014. [13-51098] (MFY)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502472462 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 12/16/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Raymond Edward White )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502470554 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 12/13/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Lewis, Powell; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: White; US mail - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Nelson [13-51098] (Sidney Katherine Powell )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502469431 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7524671-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/27/2013 for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Raymond Edward White for Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098 [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502468444 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. NOA filed by Appellee Transverse, L.L.C..[7523920-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C., Appellee Cross-Appellant Transverse, L.L.C. in 13-51098. [7523920-1] [13-51098] (NFD)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Torrence Evans Lewis for party(s) Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C., in case 13-51098 [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sidney Katherine Powell for Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. in 13-51098 [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502457702 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7516305-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Electronic ROA due on 12/17/2013. [13-51098] (MVM)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502452847 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Iowa Wireless Services, L.L.C. [13-51098] (LBM)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?