Idan Gil Zur v. Tesla Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Justice of the Peace Court of Travis County, Texas, Case No. J2-CV-20-000310

Tags
Last Updated November 23, 2020 at 5:52 PM ST (10 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zur, Idan Gil, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None
Motion to Dismiss
    Blank 4 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None
    Return of Service Filed
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None
      Citation
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None
        Citation Issued
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None
          Original Petition (OCA)

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 94 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?