Henkes v. Tesla Energy, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG20080233

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:35 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Henkes, Steven, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Telsa Energy, Inc"
No Logo Ochs, Danielle, Attorney
No Logo Wallace, Robert F, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Wrongful Termination
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
Reply Brief in Support of Motion Motion to Compel Arbritration Filed (12 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?
    Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (18 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Statement of Telsa Energy Operations, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None ?
        Proof of Service Filed (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Statement of Steven Henkes Filed (5 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None ?
            Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 03/23/2021 01:30 PM D- 15
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None ?
              Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (141 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                Answer to Complaint Filed for Telsa Energy, Inc (8 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 03/23/2021 01:30 PM D- 15 (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/23/2021 03:00 PM D- 15
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Granted (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Motion to Compel (Motion) Reservation Set for dept: 514 date: 02/09/2021 time: 03:00 PM
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Proof of Service 170.6 Challenge Filed (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Steven Henkes (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Initial Case Management Conference 03/24/2021 03:00 PM D- 514 (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven Henkes (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed (7 Pages)

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 775 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?