King et al v. Whitmer et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:20-cv-13134-LVP-RSW
District Judge Linda V. Parker, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 27, 2021 at 12:29 PM DT (20.2 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Ritchard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 +1 248 380 5362 gregoryrohl@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory J. Rohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 greg@rohllaw.com
No Logo Daren Rubingh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 +1 248 380 5362 gregoryrohl@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory J. Rohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 greg@rohllaw.com
No Logo James Hooper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 +1 248 380 5362 gregoryrohl@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory J. Rohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 greg@rohllaw.com
No Logo John Haggard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 +1 248 380 5362 gregoryrohl@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory J. Rohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 greg@rohllaw.com
No Logo Marian Sheridan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 +1 248 380 5362 gregoryrohl@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory J. Rohl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 greg@rohllaw.com
No Logo Timothy King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 +1 248 380 5362 gregoryrohl@yahoo.com
Space Gregory J. Rohl +1 248 380 9404 greg@rohllaw.com
v.
No Logo Gretchen Whitmer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik A. Grill +1 517 373 6434 +1 517 373 2454 grille@michigan.gov
Space Heather S. Meingast +1 517 373 4878 meingasth@michigan.gov
No Logo Jocelyn Benson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik A. Grill +1 517 373 6434 +1 517 373 2454 grille@michigan.gov
Space Heather S. Meingast +1 517 373 4878 meingasth@michigan.gov
No Logo Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik A. Grill +1 517 373 6434 +1 517 373 2454 grille@michigan.gov
Space Heather S. Meingast +1 517 373 4878 meingasth@michigan.gov
No Logo City of Detroit, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darryl Bressack +1 248 971 2500 +1 248 971 2600 dbressack@finkbressack.com
Space David H. Fink +1 248 971 2500 +1 248 971 2600 dfink@finkbressack.com
Space Nathan J. Fink +1 248 971 2500 +1 248 971 2600 nfink@finkbressack.com
No Logo Democratic National Committee, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Ellen Gurewitz +1 313 204 6979 megurewitz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R. Eldridge +1 517 483 4942 eldridge@millercanfield.com
No Logo Michigan Democratic Party, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Ellen Gurewitz +1 313 204 6979 megurewitz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R. Eldridge +1 517 483 4942 eldridge@millercanfield.com
No Logo ROBERT DAVIS, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stefanie Lynn Junttila +1 248 270 6689 attorneystefanielambert@gmail.com
Space Andrew A. Paterson, Jr. +1 248 291 0500 +1 248 291 0505 aap43@hotmail.com
No Logo Michigan State Conference NAACP, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Barris, Sott, Denn & Driker, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene Driker +1 313 965 9725 edriker@bsdd.com
Space Stephen E. Glazek +1 313 965 9725 +1 313 965 5398 sglazek@bsdd.com
Space Daniel M. Share +1 313 965 9725 dshare@bsdd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org
Office Detroit
Filed 11/25/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Washtenaw
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag APPEAL
  Entries (188) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Extend - free
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Show Cause
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion & Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Motion - Free
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Show Cause
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 150 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 149 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion & Order
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 148 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 147 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 146 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 117 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021, Terminated: 3/11/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Response - Free
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 116 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 Reply to Response to motion
                                        REPLY to Response re [105] MOTION for Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit A. Cease and Desist letter) (Meingast, Heather)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [117] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 115 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: 2/25/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants Benson and Whitmer to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' [105] MOTION for Sanctions (Reply due by 3/11/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 114 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021 Appeal/Supreme Court Letter
                                                    LETTER from the US Supreme Court denying the petition for writ of certiorari [Supreme Court Case Number: 20-0815] [Court of Appeals Case Number: 20-2205] (SKra)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [113] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021, Terminated: 2/12/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                            Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 112 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Response to motion
                                                                RESPONSE to [105] MOTION for Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit) (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Supplemental Brief
                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [95] Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [109] Motion for Leave to File. Supplement shall be filed by the close of business on 2/9/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 110 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Response to motion
                                                                            RESPONSE to [92] MOTION filed by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021, Terminated: 2/8/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Opposition, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit to Proposed Supplemental Opposition) (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [107] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response re [73] MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions filed by City of Detroit. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Fink, David)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021, Terminated: 2/5/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for an Award of Sanctions by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [106] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 106 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021, Terminated: 1/29/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions Under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit A. Plaintiffs' Petition for Writ of Certiorari, # (3) Exhibit B. Email dated 12.22.2020, # (4) Exhibit C. Wisconsin Voters v Pence, et al, # (5) Exhibit D. Declaration of Heather S. Meingast, # (6) Exhibit E. Declaration of Erik A. Grill) (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Adjourn
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 104 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Intervenor-Defendant City of Detroit's Reply Brief in Support of [73] MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions. (Reply due by 2/4/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Adjourn
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [102] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response re [78] MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies filed by City of Detroit. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17) (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021, Terminated: 1/27/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                        Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions, for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral, and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 101 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                            ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re [64] Federal Circuit Notice of Appeal, filed by John Haggard, Daren Rubingh, Timothy King, James Hooper, Charles Ritchard, Marian Sheridan [Appeal Case Number 20-2205] (SKra)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 100 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Order Requiring Responsive PleadingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Requiring Response to [92] Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Response due by 2/5/2021. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/24/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    OPINION and ORDER Denying Intervenor-Defendant Robert Davis' [97] Emergency Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 97 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021, Terminated: 1/25/2021 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Strike [92] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A- Email Chain) (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 96 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021, Terminated: 1/20/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [94] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; and [96] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [78] MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies filed by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021, Terminated: 1/20/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' opposition to the City of Detroits Motion for Sanctions, Disciplinary actions, Disbarment Referral and for Referral to the State Bar Disciplinary Bodies and to Defendants Whitmer and Benson's Concurrence in the City of Detroit's Motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 93 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [69] MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 1/17/2021, Entered: 1/17/2021 Motion
                                                                                                                                                        [MOTION] NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Robert Davis (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit) (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 1/25/2021 (RLou).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 91 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Michigan Democratic Party (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Michigan Board of State Canvassers (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Democratic National Committee (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Gretchen Whitmer (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to City of Detroit (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Jocelyn Benson (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [72] MOTION to Dismiss , [70] MOTION to Dismiss , [73] MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Notice of Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in [78] MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies filed by City of Detroit by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [82] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021, Terminated: 1/12/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Order to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Striking [80] MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part the [82] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to [70] Motion to Dismiss, [73] Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions, and [72] Motion to Dismiss. (Responses due by 1/14/2021). IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021, Terminated: 1/12/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                  [STRICKEN] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [72] MOTION to Dismiss , [70] MOTION to Dismiss , [73] MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions by Timothy King. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 1/12/2021 (RLou).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Court to Take Judicial Notice of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania against Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. re [69] MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by Robert Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhbit A- Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel filed against Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania) (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [77] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions , for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies by City of Detroit. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 20, # (22) Exhibit 21) (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021, Terminated: 1/7/2021 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion for Sanctions, for Disciplinary Action, for Disbarment Referral and for Referral to State Bar Disciplinary Bodies by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (Response to the [69] Motion for Sanctions is due by 1/19/2021). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021, Terminated: 1/5/2021 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION to Strike [74] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [69] MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by Robert Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email Thread and ECF Notification of Filing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time) (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 74 Filed: 1/3/2021, Entered: 1/3/2021, Terminated: 1/5/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [69] MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 1/5/2021 (RLou).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [71] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [71] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 73 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions by City of Detroit. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit) (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5) (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020, Terminated: 12/23/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Grill, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Grill, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Appeal/Supreme Court Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from the US Supreme Court that a petition for writ of certiorari was filed on 12/11/2020. [Supreme Court Case Number: 20-815] [Court of Appeals Case Number: 20-2205] (SKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corrected Certificate of Service re [64] Federal Circuit Notice of Appeal,. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Julie M Houk appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Houk, Julie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service re [64] Federal Circuit Notice of Appeal. (LGra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Federal Circuit Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs re [62] Order on Motion for TRO. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8208477 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Junttila, Stefanie) Modified on 12/10/2020 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS AN APPEAL TO THE SIXTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: 12/8/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie Lynn Junttila on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Junttila, Stefanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' [7] Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/6/2020, Entered: 12/6/2020 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [8] Emergency MOTION to Seal , [7] Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief, pursuant to E.D. Michigan LR 7.1(f) (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/6/2020, Entered: 12/6/2020 Response - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Response by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court is dispensing with oral argument with respect to the [7] Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief, pursuant to E.D. Michigan LR 7.1(f). IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying Without Prejudice [59] Emergency Motion for the Court To Take Judicial Notice of Newspaper Articles Published In Detroit Free Press and Associated Press. The Court finds the newspaper articles unnecessary to resolve the pending [7] Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: 12/5/2020, Terminated: 12/6/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION Court To Take Judicial Notice of Newspaper Articles Published In Detroit Free Press and Associated Press by Robert Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A-December 4 2020 Detroit Free Press, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B- December 1 2020 AP Article) (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [58] Motion for Leave to File. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020, Terminated: 12/5/2020 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief (ECF 57) by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Response) (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra D Rosenberg on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP. (Rosenberg, Ezra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Amicus Curiae Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Michigan State Conference NAACP (Driker, Eugene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel M. Share appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Share, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen E. Glazek appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Glazek, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Greenbaum on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP. (Greenbaum, Jon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: 12/4/2020 Notice to Withdraw Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Robert Davis of withdrawal of [46] Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 42, 45), [45] Emergency MOTION to Strike [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [48] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Amicus curiae shall file the amicus brief today, December 4, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response re [8] Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response re [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020, Terminated: 12/4/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief , MOTION for Leave to File by Michigan State Conference NAACP. (Driker, Eugene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eugene Driker appearing on behalf of Michigan State Conference NAACP (Driker, Eugene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020, Terminated: 12/4/2020 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 42, 45) by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020, Terminated: 12/4/2020 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Strike [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A- Email from Asst. Attorney General Meingast Advising Counsel for Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis That Written Consent was Not Given to Plaintiffs to file amended complaint [6]) (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020, Terminated: 12/3/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Seeking Permission to file an Amicus Curiae Brief with (Attachments: # (1) Letter Regarding Recommendation, # (2) Letter regarding Bronze Star) by Arthur. J. Clemens (ATee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020, Terminated: 12/3/2020 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Strike [6] Amended Document,,, Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' AMENDED/CORRECTED Emergency Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [6] by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020, Terminated: 12/3/2020 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION to Strike [6] Amended Document,,, by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint [1] by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order, on Arthur J. Clemens Jr., at 400 N. 4th Street, #1008, St. Louis, MO 63102 (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court does not find the proffered information useful or otherwise necessary to the administration of justice. See United States v. State of Mich., 940 F.2d 143, 165 (6th Cir. 1991). Accordingly, the [43] Request Seeking Permission to File an Amicus Curiae Brief is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), Plaintiffs were not required to seek leave of court or permission of the opposing parties prior to filing their Amended Complaint. Intervenor Davis' [41] Motion to Strike and [42] Amended Motion to Strike, are therefore DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [44] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by City of Detroit. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12) (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [6] Amended Document,,, Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Answer to Plaintiffs' Purported First-Amended Complaint [6] by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Exhibit, # (13) Exhibit, # (14) Exhibit, # (15) Exhibit, # (16) Exhibit, # (17) Exhibit, # (18) Exhibit, # (19) Exhibit, # (20) Exhibit, # (21) Exhibit, # (22) Exhibit, # (23) Exhibit, # (24) Exhibit) (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [8] Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [8] Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [8] Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [7] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, # (2) Exhibit 1. Constantino v City of Detroit Wayne Circuit 20-014780-AW Affidavit of Christopher Thomas, # (3) Exhibit 2. Affidavit of Jonathan Brater, # (4) Exhibit 3. Draft minutes 11.23.2020, # (5) Exhibit 4. Electors Transmittal, # (6) Exhibit 5. MRP Electors, # (7) Exhibit 6. Johnson v Benson, et al MI Sup Ct 162286 Petition, # (8) Exhibit 7. Bailey v Antrim Co Antrim Circuit 20-9238-CZ Complaint, # (9) Exhibit 8. Trump v Benson Court of Claims 20-000225-MZ Complaint, # (10) Exhibit 9. Trump v Benson Court of Claims 20-000225-MZ Order, # (11) Exhibit 10. Trump v Benson Court of Appeals 355378 Brief, # (12) Exhibit 11. Stoddard v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-014604-CZ Complaint, # (13) Exhibit 12. Stoddard v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-014604-CZ Order, # (14) Exhibit 13. Constantino v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-01780-AW Complaint, # (15) Exhibit 14. Constantino v City of Detroit, et al Wayne Circuit 20-014780-AW Order, # (16) Exhibit 15. Constantino MI Sup Ct 162245 Order) (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in City of Detroit's Brief in Response to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Declaratory, Emergency, and Permanent Injunctive Relief by City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [8] Emergency MOTION to Seal filed by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION and ORDER Granting [5] [12] [14] Motions to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION (Ex Parte) to Extend Page Limits by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response re [12] Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Robert Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A- Email Chain between Plaintiffs' Counsel and Counsel for Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis Granting Concurrence) (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [5] MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant, [12] Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant, [14] MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [30] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [33] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [27] Application to Extend Page Limits. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik A. Grill appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer (Grill, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT Exhibit A- Email Correspondence between Counsel for Plaintiffs and Counsel for Proposed Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis Granting Concurrence for Intervention re [17] Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Proposed Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 12)., [12] Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Ellen Gurewitz appearing on behalf of Michigan Democratic Party (Gurewitz, Mary Ellen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Ellen Gurewitz appearing on behalf of Democratic National Committee (Gurewitz, Mary Ellen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Proposed Intervenor Defendant Robert Davis' Emergency Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 12). by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Once proper service has been effectuated, Plaintiff shall immediately notify the Court, in writing, and provide information by which the Court may contact opposing counsel to schedule a status conference.If proper service is not effectuated by 5:00 PM today, Plaintiffs shall notify the Court, in writing by 5:30 PM today, regarding the status of serving Defendants. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Responses, if any, to the [5] [12] [14] Motions to Intervene, shall be filed no later than 9:00 AM on Wednesday, December 2, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Paterson, Jr on behalf of Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene by Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, # (2) Exhibit Jaffe Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit MacKenzie Affidavit, # (4) Exhibit Zimmerman Affidavit, # (5) Exhibit Complaint, # (6) Exhibit Order, # (7) Exhibit Appeal Motion, # (8) Exhibit Appellate Docket, # (9) Exhibit Order, # (10) Exhibit Order, # (11) Exhibit Order, # (12) Exhibit Order, # (13) Exhibit Order, # (14) Exhibit Order, # (15) Exhibit Petition, # (16) Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Eldridge on behalf of Democratic National Committee, Michigan Democratic Party. (Eldridge, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Robert Davis. (Paterson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Error directed to: Gregory J. Rohl re [11] Certificate of Service. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Error directed to: Gregory J. Rohl re [10] Certificate of Service. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Error directed to: Gregory J. Rohl re [9] Certificate of Service. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/29/2020, Entered: 11/29/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/29/2020, Entered: 11/29/2020, Terminated: 12/7/2020 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/29/2020, Entered: 11/29/2020 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [DOCUMENT IS TITLED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT] AMENDED by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit Exhibit 101, # (22) Exhibit Exhibit 102, # (23) Exhibit Exhibit 103, # (24) Exhibit Exhibit 104, # (25) Exhibit Exhibit 105, # (26) Exhibit Exhibit 106, # (27) Exhibit Exhibit 107, # (28) Exhibit Exhibit 108, # (29) Exhibit Exhibit 110, # (30) Exhibit Exhibit 111) (Rohl, Gregory) Modified on 11/30/2020 (LGra).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: 11/27/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 Motion to intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by City of Detroit. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: 11/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of City of Detroit. (Fink, Nathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: 11/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of City of Detroit. (Bressack, Darryl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: 11/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of City of Detroit. (Fink, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8187034 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 101, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 102, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 103, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 104, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 105, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 106, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 107, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit 108, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit 109) (Rohl, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?