State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Tesla, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 20 587216

Tags
Last Updated November 30, 2020 at 3:19 PM ST (5.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY"
v.
No Logo DOES I THROUGH V, INCLUSIVE, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TESLA, INC., WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TESLA MOTORS, INC."
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None
NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-28-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
    Blank 11 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None
    OBJECTION HEARING HELD ON MAR-03-2021. JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; CLERKS: J. LEE AND V. WU. NOT REPORTED (610)
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None
      DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100125150) FILED BY DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. (FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS "TESLA MOTORS, INC.") HEARING SET FOR MAR-03-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610
        Blank 9 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None
        JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100125149) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. (FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS "TESLA MOTORS, INC.")
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR DEC-06-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-03-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None
            CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 200025414) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None
              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100123442) FILED BY DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. (FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS "TESLA MOTORS, INC.") JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None
                ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100117320) FILED BY DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. (FORMERLY DOING BUSINESS AS "TESLA MOTORS, INC.")
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200019764), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED OCT-29-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TESLA MOTORS, INC.
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None
                      NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None
                        PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TESLA MOTORS, INC. DOES I THROUGH V, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-03-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-01-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-08-2021

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 143 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?