Wawanesa General Insurance Company v. Tesla, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 20 584545

Tags
Last Updated November 30, 2020 at 3:28 PM ST (9.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-26-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None
    DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66210148)
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-26-2021 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE DEC-09-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
        Blank 4 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None
        CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-28-2020 CONTINUED TO DEC-09-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None
          SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 65790533), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED JUL-15-2020, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.
            Blank 2 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None
            NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None
              PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT TESLA, INC. DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-28-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-27-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-05-2020

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 13 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?