Jesse Anderson v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Orange, Case No. 30-2020-01168652-CU-BC-CJC

Tags
Last Updated December 1, 2020 at 9:19 PM ST (9.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMANDA ANDERSON, Plaintiff
No Logo JESSE ANDERSON, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY ANDERSON, AMANDA; ANDERSON, JESSE ON 11/16/2020
    Blank 7 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 11/16/2020
    E-FILING TRANSACTION 2958651 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2020 05:33:52 PM.
      Blank 6 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: 11/4/2020
      CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 11/04/2020.
        Blank 5 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020
        PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12804211 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12631250.
          Blank 4 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: 11/4/2020
          SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANDERSON, JESSE; ANDERSON, AMANDA ON 11/04/2020
            Blank 3 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: 11/4/2020
            CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANDERSON, JESSE; ANDERSON, AMANDA ON 11/04/2020
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: 11/4/2020
              COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDERSON, JESSE; ANDERSON, AMANDA ON 11/04/2020
                Blank 1 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020
                E-FILING TRANSACTION 3952202 RECEIVED ON 11/04/2020 04:50:16 PM.

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 29 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?