Wilson et al v. McConnell et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-04595-BSJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Simon & Schuster, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Anne McNamara +1 212 603 6437 +1 212 489 8340 lizmcnamara@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brian Smallman +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 dbs@smallmanhansllp.com
No Logo Valerie Plame Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brian Smallman +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 dbs@smallmanhansllp.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo J. Michael McConnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Officer/Director, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 5/31/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County NewYork
Terminated 8/3/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER at the request of the parties in this matter, the Court reviewed Exhibit B to the Declaration of David B. Smallman in Support in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, which was previously filed under seal on 6/29/07, to determine whether one page had been inadvertently omitted as a result of a copying error. Having determined that the page in question was included in Exhibit B, the Court has re-sealed and re-filed this Exhibit in its original form. The parties have informed the Court that this Exhibit B will also be filed publicly subject to certain redactions. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 1/16/08) (cd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER that at the request of the parties in this matter, the Court reviewed Exhibit B to the Declaration of David B. Smallman in Support of Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment to determine whether on page had been inadvertently omitted as a result of a copying error. Having determined that the page in question was included in Exhibit B, the Court has re-sealed and re-filed this Exhibit in its original form. Parties have informed the Court that this Exhibit B will also be filed publicly subject to certain redactions. Plaintiffs have informed the Court in writing that they do no waive and fully reserved "all of their rights with respect to whether any redactions... [to] Exhibit B are proper". Letter from D. Smallman (Dec. 18, 2007). Defendants have informed the Court that the filing of Plaintiffs' Exhibit B in tis redacted form "should not be taken as endorsement or acknowledgment by the government of the documents in that exhibit or any facts or content they contain, or acceptance of the exhibit by the government for any purpose." Letter from B. Torrance (Jan.4, 2008). (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 1/16/08) (dle) Modified on 1/17/2008 (dle).
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
      DECLARATION of David B. Smallman in Support re: [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc... Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Public Version of Exhibit B to Declaration of David B. Smallman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Smallman, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Carolina Fornos dated 12/19/07 re: Request to extend time until 1/4/08 to enable AUSA Torrence to respond to Plaintiffs' letter (to unseal an exhibit). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 12/20/07) (cd)
          LREF
          Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Brian Smallman on behalf of Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. New Address: Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP, 500 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10110, 212-382-3300. (Smallman, David)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
            Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [25] Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [18] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [30] Clerk's Judgment, [32] Notice of Appeal filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [11] Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [24] Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [14] Endorsed Letter, [12] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [19] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [9] Notice (Other) filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [4] Affidavit of Service as to USA, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [17] Order,,, [3] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [27] Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [8] Declaration, filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [1] Complaint, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [29] Memorandum & Opinion,,, [7] Scheduling Order,, [5] Scheduling Order, [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [23] Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [21] Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [6] Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, [22] Notice (Other) filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, [26] Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [20] Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, [2] Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [31] Notice (Other) filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc., [28] Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [32] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to District Judg
                Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: [32] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL from [30] Clerk's Judgment, [29] Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 628352. (nd)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Notice of Correction of Affiliation and Address of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Clerks Judgment
                      CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated August 1, 2007, plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is denied and defendants motion for summary judgment is granted. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 8/3/07) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                        OPINION & ORDER # 94993; In sum, information concerning Wilson's pre-2002 employment for the CIA (if any) is properly classified, has never been declassified, and was not otherwise officially acknowledged by the CIA. The CIA itself did not publicly disclose the information at issue; it was Wilson and/or Representative Inslee who did. Their unofficial disclosures, however, cannot bind the CIA. The government has a compelling interest in censoring the dissemination of classified information and has provided a reasonable basis for doing so here. GRANTING re: [18] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Michael V. Hayden, J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, DENYING [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 8/1/07) (ae)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Beth E. Goldman dated 7/27/07 re: Counsel writes to request an adjournment of time to answer the complaint be adjourned to 8/2/07. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The defendants' time to answer is extended to 8/2/07. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/30/07) (jco)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                            Set Deadlines/Hearings:J. Michael McConnell answer due 8/2/2007; Central Intelligence Agency answer due 8/2/2007; Michael V. Hayden answer due 8/2/2007. (jco)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [18] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment., [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Permanent Injunctive Relief and In Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                DECLARATION of David B. Smallman in Opposition re: [18] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment., [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc... Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Smallman, David)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO [13] Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of Filing of Classified Document re: [21] Declaration in Support of Motion. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                          DECLARATION of Stephen R. Kappes in Support re: [18] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/13/2007 re: request an extension until 7/18/2007, to file the govt's statement of undisputed facts and response to plts' statement of undisputed facts under Local Rule 56.1, and a classified declaration ( to be submitted ex parte) in support of the motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted.. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/13/2007) (jar)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [18] CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden.Responses due by 7/20/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Tumolo Declaration# (2) Puhl Declaration# (3) DiMaio Declaration)(Torrance, Benjamin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER (re: proposed stipulation and protective order and 7/2/07 letters): first, whether certain material is "classified" is at the heart of this matter......No protective Order is necessary to preserve plaintiff's rights in that regard, or in any other regard specified in the stipulation. Second, the stipulation is inherently inconsistent with respect to whether the plaintiffs deem the manuscript, or any portions thereof, proprietary and commercial information. Finally, to the extent that the parties have reached agreement concerning other matters contained in the stipulation, i.e., (1) quoting from the manuscript, and (2) designation of confidential information - no seperate Court order is necessary as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/3/07) Copies Faxed by Chambers.(db)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from David B. Smallman dated 6/28/2007 re: plaintiff are requesting an additional twelve hours to file their opening brief with the COurt, on or before 12 noon Friday, June 29, 2007. No other filing dates would be affected. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(jmi) Modified on 7/6/2007 (Miles, Janeen).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc... Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                          DECLARATION of David B. Smallman in Support re: [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc... Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit A-1# (3) Exhibit A-2# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Exhibit F# (9) Exhibit G# (10) Exhibit H# (11) Exhibit I# (12) Exhibit J Part 1# (13) Exhibit J Part 2# (14) Exhibit K# (15) Exhibit L# (16) Exhibit M# (17) Exhibit M-1# (18) Exhibit M-2# (19) Exhibit N# (20) Exhibit O# (21) Exhibit P# (22) Exhibit Q# (23) Exhibit R# (24) Exhibit S# (25) Exhibit T)(Smallman, David)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc..Responses due by 7/13/2007,Return Date set for 7/20/2007 at 09:30 AM.(Smallman, David)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Classified Document. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Declaration
                                                              DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance annexing Administrative Record (Unclassified). Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Attachments: # (1) Administrative Record (Unclassified) Part 1# (2) Administrative Record (Unclassified) Part 2)(Torrance, Benjamin)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATED REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: plntfs shall serve upon defts and file their motion for summary judgment and any application for injunctive relief no later than 6/28/07. Defts shall serve upon plntfs and file their opposition to plntfs' motion and any application by plntfs for injunctive relief no later than 7/13/07, and defts shall also serve upon plntfs and file their cross-motion for summary judgment no later than 7/13/07. Plntfs shall serve upon defts and file their reply and opposition papers no later than 7/20/07.Motions due by 6/28/2007. Cross Motions due by 7/13/2007. Responses due by 7/13/2007. Replies due by 7/20/2007. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/25/07) (cd)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jones from David Smallman dated 6/22/07 re: extension of time for plaintiffs' opening brief due 6/28, rather than 6/26, defts' cross-motion and opposition would be fld on or before 7/13, rather than 7/11, and reply papers would be fld on or before 7/13, rather than 7/11, and reply papers would be fld by all parties on or before 7/20, rather than 7/18. ENDORSEMENT: application granted.Cross Motion by defts due by 7/13/2007 Plainitffs Motion due by 6/28/2007.,Reply to Response to Brief due by 7/20/2007.,Responses to Brief due by 7/13/2007 (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/25/07) (cd) Modified on 6/29/2007 (Espinell, Antonia).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER:Motion for summary judgment due by 6/26/2007. Responses due by 7/11/2007; Replies due by 7/18/2007. Defendants shall also serve upon plaintiffs and file their cross-motion for summary judgment no latere than 7/11/07. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/18/07) (jco)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Status Conference
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara S. Jones : Status Conference held on 6/12/2007. Govt. will proceed on CIA-certified administrative record. Record should be provided within the next few weeks. There may be sealing isses with this record. Parties suggest a one-shot summary judgment/cross-motion motion practice. The administrative record and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by June 26, 2007. Government's Opposition and cross motion for summary judgment due July 11, 2007. Parties will submit a stipulated proposed scheduling order to donfirm dates. Parties will also notify the Court if there are any delays. (tro)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Affidavit of Service as to USA
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. J. Michael McConnell served on 5/31/2007, answer due 7/30/2007; Michael V. Hayden served on 5/31/2007, answer due 7/30/2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson; Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Central Intelligence Agency served on 5/31/2007, answer due 7/30/2007. Service was accepted by Aretha Charles, Clerk. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson; Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying CBS Corporation (Delaware Corporation), CBS Operations Inc. (a Delaware Corporation), French Street Management LLC (a Delaware limited liability Company) as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc..(mbe)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 616876)Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(mbe)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Case Designation
                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (mbe)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (mbe)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?