DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE et al JML
State Civil Lawsuit District of Columbia Superior Court, Case No. 2020 CA 000488 B

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2020 at 11:32 PM ST (9.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

District of Columbia District of Columbia, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, Defendant
Trump Old Post Office LLC Trump Old Post Office LLC, Defendant
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 106 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020
Praecipe to Enter Appearance Filed. submitted 12/02/2020 12:58. mw Attorney: PRO SE (999999) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
    Legal Document 105 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
    Additional eFiling Document to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESERVING TIME FOR QUESTIONING DURING DEPOSITION Filed. Submitted 12/01/2020 19:07. ts.
      Legal Document 104 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
      DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RESERVING TIME FOR QUESTIONING DURING DEPOSITION Filed. Submitted 12/01/2020 19:07. ts. Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202)
        Blank 103 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020
        Order Granting Motion for Protective Order signed by J/Lopez. submitted 11/24/2020 14:28. NB
          Blank 102 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020
          Order Granting Motion for Protective Order Entered on Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved November 24, 2020. DMC
            Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020
            Additional eFiling Document to Reply Brief Filed. submitted 11/20/2020 19:07. NB Attorney: REED, ALEXANDER R (1643688)
              Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020
              Reply Brief Filed. submitted 11/20/2020 19:07. NB Attorney: REED, ALEXANDER R (1643688)
                Blank 99 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020
                Additional eFiling Document to District of Columbia's Oppposition to Defendant's' Joint Motion for Protective Order. Submitted 11/13/2020 16:39. kd Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) MATTHEW D JAMES (Attorney) on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff)
                  Blank 98 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020
                  District of Columbia's Oppposition to Defendant's' Joint Motion for Protective Order Filed. Submitted 11/13/2020 16:39. kd Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) MATTHEW D JAMES (Attorney) on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff)
                    Blank 97 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020
                    Affidavit of Service of Subpoena
                      Blank 96 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020
                      Affidavit of Service of Subpoena
                        Blank 95 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020
                        Affidavit of Service of Subpoena
                          Blank 94 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020
                          Affidavit of Service of Subpoena
                            Blank 93 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020
                            Affidavit of Service of Subpoena
                              Blank 92 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020
                              Additional eFiling Document to Defendants' Motion For Protective Order Filed. submitted 10/30/2020 19:14. NB Attorney: REED, ALEXANDER R (1643688)
                                Blank 91 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020
                                Defendants' Motion For Protective Order Filed. submitted 10/30/2020 19:14. NB Attorney: REED, ALEXANDER R (1643688)
                                  Blank 90 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020
                                  Defendant 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Equitable Relief, Including Constructive Trust, Over Improperly Spent Funds of Nonprofit Corporation Filed. Submitted 10/26/2020 12:23. ajm Attorney: LEVISS, DAVID J (1003724)
                                    Blank 89 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020
                                    Defendants Trump Organizations LLC and Trump Old Post Office LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Equitable Relief, Including Constructive Trust, Over Imporperly Spent Funds of Nonprofit Corporation Filed. Submitted 10/26/2020 11:41. kd Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) Ms REBECCA WOODS (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant)
                                      Blank 88 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020
                                      Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer Amended ComplaNT. Signed by J/Lopez. Sumbitted 10/26/2020 11:25A. TM
                                        Blank 87 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020
                                        Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint Entered on the Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved October 26, 2020. DMC
                                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020
                                          Additional eFiling Document to Joint Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Complaint Filed. submitted 10/22/2020 18:26. NB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant); TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant);
                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020
                                            Joint Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Complaint Filed. submitted 10/22/2020 18:26. NB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff); TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant); TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant); Receipt: 462577 Date: 10/23/2020
                                              Blank 84 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020
                                              Track 3 - Mediation Scheduling Order signed by J/Lopez on 09/10/2020. Submitted on 09/10/2020 11:11. KT
                                                Blank 83 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020 Court Filing
                                                Event Resulted: The following event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 scheduled for 09/10/2020 at 9:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Scheduling Conference Hearing Held Remotely. Atty Jimmy Rock present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Atty Wood and Leviss present on behalf of the Defendants. Court heard representations made by both parties. This matter is set on Track 3 mediation. All pending motions are moot. Order signed and efiled to parties. km//jml Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020
                                                  Track 3 - Mediation Scheduling Order Entered on the Docket DCM Track Track 3 - Mediation was added on 09/10/2020 with the following milestone(s): Exchange Lists of Fact Witnesses T3 due 12/09/2020 Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Report T3 due 12/23/2020 Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) Report T3 due 01/28/2021 Discovery Request T3 due 02/08/2021 Close of Discovery T3 due 03/09/2021 Filing Motions T3 due 04/08/2021 Dispositive Motions Decided T3 due 05/10/2021 ADR - Mediation T3-1 due 05/24/2021 ADR - Mediation T3-2 due 06/22/2021 Pretrial T3 due 07/22/2021 Pretrial T3-2 due 08/23/2021
                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020
                                                    Omnibus Order Denying Motions to Dismiss signed by J/Lopez on 09/09/2020. Submitted on 09/09/2020 16:28. KT
                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020
                                                      Omnibus Order Denying Motions to Dismiss Entered on the Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved September 9, 2020. DMC
                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                        Praecipe Regarding a Change Address for the Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia Filed submitted 09/04/2020 14:46pm. ae Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938)
                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: 8/26/2020
                                                          Praecipe to Withdraw Appearance Filed. Submitted 08/26/2020 10:15. kd Attorney: CHEN, RANDOLPH T (1032644) RANDOLPH T CHEN (Attorney) on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff)
                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: 8/20/2020
                                                            Praecipe: Notice of Appearance Filed. Submitted 08/20/2020 11:41. kd Attorney: REED, ALEXANDER R (1643688) ALEXANDER R REED (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant)
                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020
                                                              Additional eFiling Document to Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Proposed Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 08/17/2020 19:21. TB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495)
                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020
                                                                Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Proposed Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 08/17/2020 19:21. TB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495)
                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                  District of Columbia's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. submitted 08/10/2020 12:40. TB Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: MIRANDA, LEONOR ELISA (1044293)
                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                    Order Sua Sponte Continuing Scheduling Conference signed by J/Lopez on 08/10/2020. Submitted on 08/10/2020 17:27. KT
                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                      Order Sua Sponte to Continue Scheduling Conference to September 10, 2020 Entered on Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved August 10, 2020. DMC
                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Court Filing
                                                                        Event Scheduled Event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 Date: 09/10/2020 Time: 9:30 am Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Court Filing
                                                                          Event Resulted: The following event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 scheduled for 08/11/2020 at 10:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Scheduling Conference Hearing Vacated Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020
                                                                            Praecipe to Withdraw/Strike Appearance Filed. Submitted 08/07/2020 10:09. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) MARGARET ABERNETHY (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant)
                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020
                                                                              Additional eFiling Document to Defendants' Opposed Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. Submitted 08/05/2020 13:54. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) Mr K L BLALACK II (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant); Ms REBECCA WOODS (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant)
                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020
                                                                                Defendants' Opposed Joint Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 08/05/2020 13:54. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) Mr K L BLALACK II (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant); Ms REBECCA WOODS (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant) Receipt: 458956 Date: 08/06/2020
                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020
                                                                                  Order Sua Sponte Continuing Scheduling Conference signed by J/Lopez on 08/03/2020. Submitted on 08/03/2020 15:52. KT
                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020
                                                                                    Order Sua Sponte Continuing Scheduling Conference signed by J/Lopez on 08/03/2020. Submitted on 08/03/2020 13:05. KT
                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020
                                                                                      Order Sua Sponte to Continue 8/10 Hearing to 8/11/20 Entered on Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved August 3, 2020. DMC
                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                        Event Scheduled Event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 Date: 08/11/2020 Time: 10:30 am Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                          Event Resulted: The following event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 10:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Event Cancelled Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020
                                                                                            Order Sua Sponte setting Virtual Heairng for August 10, 2020 Entered on Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved August 3, 2020. DMC
                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                              Event Scheduled Event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 Date: 08/10/2020 Time: 10:30 am Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                                Event Resulted: The following event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 9:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Event Cancelled Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020
                                                                                                  District of Columbia's Reply in Support of Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. submitted 07/02/2020 13:43. TB Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938) Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) Attorney: MIRANDA, LEONOR ELISA (1044293) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020
                                                                                                    Additional eFiling Document to Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 06/30/2020 17:17. chd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020
                                                                                                      Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 06/30/2020 17:17. chd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020
                                                                                                        District of Columbia's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Filed. Submitted 06/25/2020 11:46. chd Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020
                                                                                                          Additional eFiling Document to Defendants' Opposed, Joint Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Filed. Submitted 06/19/2020 16:23. chd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020
                                                                                                            Defendants' Opposed, Joint Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Filed. Submitted 06/19/2020 16:23. chd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant); TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant); Receipt: 456989 Date: 06/22/2020
                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020
                                                                                                              Praecipe: Notice of Appearance Filed. Submitted 06/17/2020 10:46 TB Attorney: ABERNETHY, MARGARET (1655549)
                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020
                                                                                                                Additional eFiling Document to District of Columbia's Opposed Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 06/16/2020 18:34. TB DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020
                                                                                                                  District of Columbia's Opposed Motion for Scheduling Order Filed. Submitted 06/16/2020 18:34. TB Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938) Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) Attorney: MIRANDA, LEONOR ELISA (1044293) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                    Praecipe to Withdraw/Strike Appearance Filed. submitted 06/12/2020 19:41. NB Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                      Additional eFiling Document to Defendant Reply Filed. submitted 06/12/2020 19:32. NB Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                        Defendant Reply Filed. submitted 06/12/2020 19:32. NB Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                          Defendant Old Post Office LLC D/B/A Trump International Hotel Washington, D.C.'s Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 06/12/2020 16:42. chd Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant);
                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                            Additional eFiling Document to Defendant Reply Brief Filed. submitted 06/12/2020 17:18. NB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant);
                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                              Defendant Reply Brief Filed. submitted 06/12/2020 17:18. NB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant);
                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020
                                                                                                                                Omnibus Order Granting Motions to Extend Page Limit for Reply to Motion to Dismiss signed by J/Lopez on 05/28/2020. Submitted on 05/28/2020 10:12. KT
                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020
                                                                                                                                  Omnibus Order Granting Motions to Extend Page Limit for Reply to Motion to Dismiss Entered on the Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved May 28, 2020. DMC
                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020
                                                                                                                                    Additional eFiling Document to Consent Motion fo the Trump Organization for Leave to File its Reply Brief with Additional Pages Filed. Submitted 05/27/2020 10:24. chd Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020
                                                                                                                                      Consent Motion fo the Trump Organization for Leave to File its Reply Brief with Additional Pages Filed. Submitted 05/27/2020 10:24. chd Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant); Receipt: 455997 Date: 05/27/2020
                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: 5/26/2020
                                                                                                                                        Additional eFiling Document to Joint Consent Motion of 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee and Trump Old Post Office LLC for Leave to File Reply Briefs With Additional Pages Filed. Submitted 05/26/2020 15:29. ajm Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: 5/26/2020
                                                                                                                                          Joint Consent Motion of 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee and Trump Old Post Office LLC for Leave to File Reply Briefs With Additional Pages Filed. Submitted 05/26/2020 15:29. ajm Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020
                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Plaintiff District of Columbia┬┐s Consent Motion for Leave to File an Opposition Brief with Additional Pages signed by J/Lopez on 05/19/2020. Submitted on 05/19/2020 10:27. KT
                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: 5/19/2020
                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion to Extend Page Limit for Plaintiff's Opposition Entered on the Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved May 19, 2020. DMC
                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                Additional eFiling Document to District of Columbia's Opposition to Defendant Trump Organization LLC's Motion to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 05/15/2020 14:47. ajm Attorney: CHEN, RANDOLPH T (1032644)
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                  District of Columbia's Opposition to Defendant Trump Organization LLC's Motion to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 05/15/2020 14:47. ajm Attorney: CHEN, RANDOLPH T (1032644) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                    Additional eFiling Document to District of Columbia's Combined Opposition to Defendants 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's and Trump Hotel's Motions to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 05/15/2020 14:26. ajm Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202)
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                      District of Columbia's Combined Opposition to Defendants 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's and Trump Hotel's Motions to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 05/15/2020 14:26. ajm Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff District of Columbia's Consent Motion for Leave to File an Opposition Brief With Additional Pages Filed. Submitted 05/15/2020 13:57. ajm Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                          Praecipe of Appearance Filed. Submitted 05/14/2020 14:41. TB Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: CHEN, RANDOLPH T (1032644) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020
                                                                                                                                                            Sua Sponte Order: Initial Scheduling Conference set for April 24, 2020 is CONTINUED to August 10, 2020 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 212 signed by J/Lopez on 03/23/2020. Submitted on 03/23/2020 16:01. KT
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Event Scheduled Event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 Date: 08/10/2020 Time: 9:30 am Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Event Resulted: The following event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 9:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Event Cancelled Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Sua Sponte to Continue Scheduling Conference to August 10, 2020 Entered on Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved March 23, 2020. DMC
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: 3/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                    Trump Organization LLC's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed. Submitted 03/19/2020 11:44. kd Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) JAMES R BILLINGS-KANG (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: 3/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                      Trump Old Post Office LLC's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed. Submitted 03/19/2020 11:42. kd Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) JAMES R BILLINGS-KANG (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020
                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting District of Columbia's Cosnent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines signed by J/Lopez on March 17, 2020. Submitted 03/17/2020 11:18. kd
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020
                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Motion Entered on the Docket. Signed, Docketed, Mailed/Emailed/Eserved March 17, 2020. DMC
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: 3/16/2020
                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES RELATING TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED. submitted 03/16/2020 16:58. NB Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                              Praecipe for Entry of Appearance Filed 03/10/2020 17:42 TB Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant); TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant);
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                Additional eFiling Document to Praecipe: Courtesy Provision of Public Records Cited in Defendant 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's Opposed Motion to Dismiss. Submitted 03/10/2020 21:09. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) Mr K L BLALACK II (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                  Praecipe: Courtesy Provision of Public Records Cited in Defendant 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's Opposed Motion to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 03/10/2020 21:09. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) Mr K L BLALACK II (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional eFiling Document to Defendant 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's Opposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Submitted 03/10/2020 20:35. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) Mr K L BLALACK II (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's Opposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Filed. Submitted 03/10/2020 20:35. kd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372) Mr K L BLALACK II (Attorney) on behalf of 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE (Defendant) Receipt: 452959 Date: 03/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional eFiling Document to Trump Old Post Office LLC d/b/a Trump International Hotel Washington, D.C. Opposed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. Submitted 03/10/2020 18:44. kd Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) JAMES R BILLINGS-KANG (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                          Trump Old Post Office LLC d/b/a Trump International Hotel Washington, D.C. Opposed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Filed. Submitted 03/10/2020 18:44. kd Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) JAMES R BILLINGS-KANG (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant) Receipt: 452953 Date: 03/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional eFiling Document to Trump Organization LLC's Opposed Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and in the Alternative Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Submitted 03/10/2020 18:39. kd Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) JAMES R BILLINGS-KANG (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                              Trump Organization LLC's Opposed Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and in the Alternative Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Filed. Submitted 03/10/2020 18:39. kd Attorney: BILLINGS-KANG, JAMES R (984152) JAMES R BILLINGS-KANG (Attorney) on behalf of TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant) Receipt: 452951 Date: 03/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                58th Presidential Inaugural Committee's Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed. Submitted 03/09/2020 20:30. chd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Praecipe: Notice of Appearance Filed. Submitted 03/09/2020 20:23. chd Attorney: BLALACK II, Mr K L (452372)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Praecipe for Extension of Time to Respond Filed 02/11/2020 10:25. TB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938) Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) Attorney: MIRANDA, LEONOR ELISA (1044293) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Praecipe for Extension of Time to Respond Filed 02/05/2020 14:41. TB Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff); TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant);
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Praecipe for Extension of Time to Respond Filed 01/29/2020 17:51. TB Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938) Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) Attorney: MIRANDA, LEONOR ELISA (1044293) Attorney: WOODS, Ms REBECCA (468495) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff); TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC (Defendant); TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Defendant);
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Praecipe to Extend Time Filed. Submitted 01/29/2020 15:47pm. ae Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Complaint Package eServed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issue Date: 01/22/2020 Service: Summons Issued Method: Service Issued Cost Per: $ 58TH PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE 250 Brown Hill Court MIDLOTHIAN, VA 23114 Tracking No: 5000223158 TRUMP ORGANIZATION LLC 725 Fifth Ave NEW YORK, NY 10022 Tracking No: 5000223159 TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC 1100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW WASHINGTON, DC 20004 Tracking No: 5000223160
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Event Scheduled Event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 Date: 04/24/2020 Time: 9:30 am Judge: LOPEZ, JOSE M Location: Courtroom 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  eComplaint Filed. Submitted 01/22/2020 09:00. TB Attorney: ROCK, JIMMY R (493521) Attorney: HILL, NICOLE S (888324938) Attorney: JAMES, MATTHEW D (1632202) Attorney: MIRANDA, LEONOR ELISA (1044293) DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Plaintiff);
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Filed Receipt: 448645 Date: 01/22/2020

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?