District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. Hugh Baras
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-10396

Tags
Last Updated December 8, 2020 at 1:48 AM ST (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hugh Leslie Baras, Defendant - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Jonathan Zilversmit +1 415 431 3474
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas G. Moore +1 415 436 7017
Space Arvon J. Perteet +1 415 551 9514
Space Michael G. Pitman +1 415 436 6475
Space Riebli, Frank +1 415 439 1400
Space J. Douglas Wilson +1 415 436 6778
Nature of Suit
Case Type criminal
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=4:11-cr-00523-YGR-1
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=4:11-cr-00523-YGR-1
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028677333 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None ?
MANDATE ISSUED.(RAP, RRC and JBO) [10259331] (Turcios, Margoth)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028677148 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None ?
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028670616 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None ?
      Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 12/14/2015 memorandum). Date of service: 01/05/2017. [10256444] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028659104 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: None ?
        Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras response opposing motion ([67] Motion (ECF Filing), [67] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 01/02/2017. [10251357] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028652015 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None ?
          Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Motion for miscellaneous relief [United States' Second Motion to Revoke Bail]. Date of service: 12/28/2016. [10248431] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028625010 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None ?
            The petition for writ of certiorari was denied on 12/12/2016. Supreme Court number 15-1474. (Panel: RAP, RRC and JBO). [10236699] (RR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028612995 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None ?
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/13/2016. [10231122] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028612983 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None ?
                Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Correspondence: Exhibit to Supplemental Motion to Stay Mandate and for Order Granting Leave to File Successive Petition for Rehearing. Date of service: 12/13/2016 [10231116] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028609966 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None ?
                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Supplemental Motion to stay the mandate. Date of service: 12/12/2016. [10229733] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009028108865 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None ?
                    Received notice from the Supreme Court: petition for certiorari filed on 06/03/2016. Supreme Court Number 15-1474. [10006628] (RR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027989019 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None ?
                      Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 04/21/2016 regarding the application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kennedy, who on April 21, 2016, extended the time to and including June 6, 2016. Application No. 15A1089. [9953326] (RR)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027840050 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None ?
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027840023 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None ?
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027803423 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None ?
                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras response opposing motion ([57] Motion (ECF Filing), [57] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 02/19/2016. [9871893] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027799326 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None ?
                              Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Motion for miscellaneous relief [UNITED STATES' MOTION TO REVOKE BAIL]. Date of service: 02/18/2016. [9870054] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027776290 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None ?
                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion to stay the mandate. Date of service: 02/09/2016. [9859555] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027772036 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None ?
                                  Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and JOHN B. OWENS) The panel has voted to deny the petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The Petition for Rehearing and Suggestion for Rehearing En Banc, filed on January 11, 2016, are DENIED. [9857676] (OC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027693579 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None ?
                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 12/14/2015 memorandum). Date of service: 01/11/2016. [9822107] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027650765 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None ?
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027642721 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None ?
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Unopposed Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 01/12/2016. Date of service: 12/21/2015. [9800046] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027622521 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                                          FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (RICHARD A. PAEZ, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and JOHN B. OWENS) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9790503] (PH)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None ?
                                            ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO RICHARD A. PAEZ, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and JOHN B. OWENS. [9783698] (WWP)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027519397 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None ?
                                              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. J. Douglas Wilson for Appellee USA. [9745368] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027456748 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Marc Jonathan Zilversmit, Esquire for Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. [9717798] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                  REVISED: Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, December 8, 2015 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 4 - San Francisco CA. **NOTE: Date changed.**

                                                  View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.

                                                  When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office.
                                                  [9716998] (GEV)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027454737 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027419622 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. J. Douglas Wilson for Appellee USA. [9701167] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027418123 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Unopposed Motion to reschedule oral argument. Date of service: 09/29/2015. [9700498] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                          Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, December 7, 2015 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 4 - James R Browning US Cthse, 95 7th St, San Francisco, CA.

                                                          View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.

                                                          When you have reviewed the calendar, download the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form, complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office.
                                                          [9700125] (GEV)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                            Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [40] filed by Hugh Leslie Baras.(sent to panel) [9686180] (SD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027365549 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                              Filed clerk order: The reply brief [40] submitted by Hugh Leslie Baras is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9677463] (GV)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027364212 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. Date of service: 09/09/2015. [9676938] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027324197 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): A review of the proposed oversize reply brief of 13,991 words reveals that it may reasonably be shortened. Accordingly, the motion for leave to file an oversize reply brief is granted only in part. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall file a reply brief not to exceed 10,500 words. (Research) [9659019] (SML)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027241956 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. Date of service: 07/27/2015. [9622807] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027210872 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Correspondence: Request not to set oral argument on the October 2015 calendar. Date of service: 07/14/2015 [9609282] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Filed Appellee USA paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [29] in 2 volumes. [9575210] (GV)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Received 7 paper copies of answering brief [29] filed by USA. [9575156] (SD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027131930 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Hugh Leslie Barasto extend time to file the optional reply brief. The appellant's optional reply brief is due by July 27, 2015 [9574326] (TH)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027129331 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Filed clerk order: The answering brief [29] submitted by USA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [29] submitted by USA. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9573261] (GV)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027128885 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 07/27/2015. Date of service: 06/12/2015. [9573054] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027128586 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027088071 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Answering brief and Supplemental Excerpts of Record for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellee USA. Date of service: 05/29/2015. [9555026] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027021970 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee USA; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee USA Appellee brief due 05/29/2015 for United States of America. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9525977] (TH)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009027021461 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/29/2015. Date of service: 05/05/2015. [9525734] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026853748 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee USA; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee USA Appellee brief due 05/15/2015 for United States of America. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9448559] (TH)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026852935 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/15/2015. Date of service: 03/06/2015. [9448193] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Added attorney J. Douglas Wilson for USA, in case 14-10396. [9446588] (Turcios, Margoth)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026848990 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of J. Douglas Wilson for Appellee USA. Date of service: 03/05/2015. [9446495] [14-10396] (Wilson, J.)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [16] filed by Hugh Leslie Baras. [9433809] (SD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Filed Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras paper copies of excerpts of record [14] in 3 volume(s). [9433358] (GV)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Received corrected deficiency of excerpts of record from Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. [9433349] (GV)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026811023 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        ENTRY UPDATED. Received Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras excerpts of record [14] in 3 volumes. Deficiencies: excerpts of record pages are double-sided. Notified counsel (See attached notice). [9429640]--[Edited 02/23/2015 by GV to correct link] (GV)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026800382 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The opening brief [16] submitted by Hugh Leslie Baras is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [14] submitted by Hugh Leslie Baras. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9425091] (GV)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/15/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Merged with entry 16. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [16]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. Date of service: 02/13/2015. [9422149] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026790538 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. Date of service: 02/13/2015. [9420980] [14-10396] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 02/18/2015 by TL] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026712853 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026642147 Filed: 12/20/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening brief and Excerpts of Record for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras. Date of service: 12/20/2014. [9357354] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026574319 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting unopposed Motion (ECF Filing) for a 2nd ext of time to file the opening brief filed by Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 12/23/2014 for Hugh Leslie Baras. Appellee brief due 01/22/2015 for United States of America. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9328429] (TH)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026574071 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 12/23/2014. Date of service: 11/26/2014. [9328324] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026529153 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026516835 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 12/03/2014. Date of service: 11/05/2014. [9303565] [14-10396] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026465776 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 10/17/2014. [9281741] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026463873 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras reply to response (, ,motion for bail pending appeal or trial). Date of service: 10/17/2014. [9280960] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) presentence report UNDER SEAL by Appellee USA. [9274828] (Pitman, Michael)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026447336 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee USA response opposing motion (,motion for bail pending appeal or trial). Date of service: 10/10/2014. [9273836] (Pitman, Michael)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026439370 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion to file addendum in 1 volumes to Motion for Bail on Appeal (Dkt. 2-1). Date of service: 10/08/2014. [9270201] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026412054 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/29/2014. [9258164] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026412031 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 09/29/2014. [9258155] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026412006 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Hugh Leslie Baras Motion for bail pending Appeal. Date of service: 09/29/2014. [9258142] (Zilversmit, Marc)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026288173 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed: 30 Months. Transcript ordered by 09/02/2014. Transcript due 10/02/2014. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 11/12/2014 for Hugh Leslie Baras. Appellee brief due 12/11/2014 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9205418] (SAM)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?