District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Colorado District Court Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Taylor v. Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 07-1202

Tags
Last Updated December 9, 2020 at 11:42 PM ST (7.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ericka F. Houck Englert +1 303 892 7427 +1 303 893 1379 ericka.englert@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Ruvel May +1 303 292 8525 +1 303 294 1879 may@wtotrial.com
No Logo Colordo Attorney General, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
National Archives & Records Administration National Archives & Records Administration, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Thomas Traskos +1 303 454 0184 +1 303 454 0404 Kevin.Traskos@usdoj.gov
No Logo State of Arkansas, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by bethmccann.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 303-866-5037

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Probation Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of Colorado, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo STATE OF FLORIDA, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of Maryland, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of Mississippi, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of New Hampshire, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State Of New Mexico, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of North Dakota, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of Virginia, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo State of West Virginia, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo The State of Wyoming, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth H. McCann +1 720 508 6000 beth@bethmccann.org
Space John W. Suthers +1 720 508 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William V. Allen +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Will.allen@coag.gov
Space Megan Paris Rundlet +1 720 508 6000 megan.rundlet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. Domenico +1 720 508 6000 Domenico_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov
No Logo Katherine Ann Harris, Intervenor - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erica O. Payne +1 303 592 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery, Kolodny, Amatuzio & Dusbabek, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Michael Montgomery +1 303 592 6600 +1 303 592 6666 mmontgomery@mkadlaw.com
No Logo Wayne N. Harris, Intervenor - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erica O. Payne +1 303 592 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery, Kolodny, Amatuzio & Dusbabek, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Michael Montgomery +1 303 592 6600 +1 303 592 6666 mmontgomery@mkadlaw.com
No Logo Mark A. Taylor, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Joseph Navarro +1 303 844 5459

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A. Bruce Jones +1 303 295 8232 +1 303 975 5385 bjones@hollandhart.com
Nature of Suit 4365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=01-cv-02076-LTB-PAC
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cod.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=01-cv-02076-LTB-PAC
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None ?
[9872445] Case file closed.
    LREF
    Legal Document 01007606131 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None ?
    [9632457] Mandate issued.
      LREF
      Legal Document 01007595570 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      [9630263] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Lucero and Hartz denying petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellant Mr. Mark A. Taylor.
        LREF
        Legal Document 01007569350 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None ?
        [9625110] Petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc filed by Mr. Mark A. Taylor. Original and 18 copies. Served on 01/08/2009. Manner of Service: US mail, email.
        LREF
        Legal Document 01007550628 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None ?
        [9622052] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing to 1/8/09. Served on 12/24/2008.
          LREF
          Legal Document 01007550560 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None ?
          [9622025] Appellant's amended and unopposed motion filed by Mr. Mark A. Taylor for extension of time to file petition for panel rehearing and/or rehearing en banc until 01/08/2009. Served on 12/24/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
            LREF
            Legal Document 01007550355 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None ?
            [9621944] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Mark A. Taylor for extension of time to file petition for panel rehearing and/or rehearing en banc until 01/08/2009. Served on 12/23/2008. Manner of Service: US mail, email.
              LREF
              Legal Document 01007446241 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None ?
              [9619324] Judgment for opinion filed. [07-1186, 07-1202]--[Edited 12/16/2008 by KLP to correct the caption of the judgment]
                LREF
                Legal Document 01007446226 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                [9619319] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Kelly, Lucero and Hartz, author. Mandate to issue. [07-1186, 07-1202]
                LREF
                Legal Document 0100147195 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                [9555851] Case argued by Barry Arrington and Bruce Jones for the Appellants; C. Michael Montgomery for the Appellees; Elizabeth McCann for the Amici Curiae; and submitted to Judges Kelly, Lucero and Hartz. [07-1186, 07-1202]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 0100133549 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None ?
                  [9550341] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. At the direction of the panel assigned to this appeal, the motion to participate in oral argument filed by the Attorney General for the State of Colorado is granted. Served on 02/22/2008.
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 0100132138 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None ?
                  [9549770] Motion to Participate entitiled Request of Amici States Colorado, Arkansas, Florida, Maryland, Mississippi, New Hampshire, New Mexico, North Dakota, South Carolina, Virginia, West Virginia and Wyoming to Participate in Oral Argument filed by Amici Curiae State of Colorado, et al. Original only. Served on 02/20/2008. Manner of Service: email.
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 0100113300 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None ?
                    [9542236] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Erica O. Payne for Ms. Katherine Ann Harris and Mr. Wayne N. Harris. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/18/2008. Manner of Service: US Mail.
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 0100106308 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None ?
                      [9539997] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held Monday, March 17, 2008 at 1:00 pm in Denver, Colorado. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms that must be completed and returned to the clerk's office within 10 days. Counsel for Amicus Curiae do not argue and are not expected to return the calendar acknowledgment form
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 010045459 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None ?
                      [9518200] Appellant's reply brief filed by Mark A. Taylor. Original. Served on 10/04/2007. Manner of Service: US Mail/E-Mail.
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 010034332 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None ?
                        [9513563] Appellees' brief filed by Ms. Katherine Ann Harris and Mr. Wayne N. Harris. Original and 7 copies. Served on: 09/17/2007. Manner of service: U.S. Mail. Oral argument requested? y. Appendix filed. Original and 1 copy. Appendix pages: 403. Appellant's reply brief due 10/04/2007 by Mark A. Taylor.
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None ?
                          [2057045] Order filed by Clerk granting appellees' unopposed motion for extension of time to file eres brief [2057041-1] to 9/17/07 (13-day extension) for Katherine Ann Harris and Wayne N. Harris. Parties served by mail.
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None ?
                            [2057041] Appellees' unopposed motion for extension of time to file appellees' brief until 9/17/07 filed by Wayne N. Harris and Katherine Ann Harris. Original and 3 copies. c/s: y.
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 010022063 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None ?
                              [2056333] E-Motion for extension of time to file brief received from Wayne N. Harris, Katherine Ann Harris in 07-1202. Submission type: Email.
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None ?
                                [2055118] Order filed by Clerk (DEC) - the State of South Carolina's request to be included among the list of amicus curiae is granted. Parties served by mail.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None ?
                                  [2054927] Letter received from Colorado Attorney General in 07-1202 requesting that the State of South Carolina be added to the Amicus Curiae brief, but not filed. Original. c/s: y.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None ?
                                    [2053536] Amicus Curiae brief filed by States of Arkansas, Colorado, Maryland, Mississippi State of New Hamp, State of New Mexico, State of North Dak, State of Virginia, State of West Vir, and State of Wyoming in 07-1202. Original and 7 copies. c/s: y. Served on 8/9/07.
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 010022650 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None ?
                                      [2053534] E-attachment received from state of Arkansas, et al. Submission type: Email.
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 01009778 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None ?
                                        [2053531] E-Amici Curiae Brief received from state of Arkansas, et al. Submission Type: Email.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None ?
                                          [2050524] Appellant's brief filed by Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202. Original and 7 copies. c/s: y. Served on 7/30/07. Oral argument? y., Appendix filed. Original and 1 appendix copy. Appendix Pages: 302. Appellee's brief due 9/4/07 for Katherine Ann Harris, and Wayne N. Harris.
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 0100138934 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None ?
                                            [2050444] E-attachment received from Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202. Submission type: EMAIL.
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 0100138931 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None ?
                                              [2050441] E-Brief (opening) received from Appellant Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202. Submission Type: EMAIL.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                [2045198] Order filed by Clerk granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file opening brief [2045196-1]. A/Pet brief and appendix due 7/30/07 (14-day extension) for Mark A. Taylor. Parties served by mail.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                  [2045196] Appellant's unopposed motion filed by Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202 for extension of time to file opening brief until 7/30/07. Original and 3 copies. c/s: y.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 01007729 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                    [2044918] E-Motion for extension received from Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202. Submission type: Email.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                      [2036174] Order filed by Clerk (LSS) re: Solvay's 6/4/07 letter: clerk shall edit caption to show Solvay as defendant below, but not as appellee on appeal. Parties served by mail.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                        [2035983] Letter advising that Solvay is not involved in this appeal filed by counsel for Solvay Pharm Inc in 07-1202. Original.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                          [2035238] Fee paid in District Court on 6/1/07.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                            [2035236] Filed notice record is complete 6/4/07. Appellant's brief and appendix due 7/16/07 for Mark A. Taylor.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                              [2035094] Order filed by Clerk docket fee due 6/14/07 for Mark A. Taylor pursuant to Rule 42. Parties served by mail.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                [2033861] Order filed by Clerk notice of appearance form due 6/11/07 for Solvay Pharm Inc. Parties served by mail.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                  [2031501] Docketing statement filed by Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202. Original and 4 copies. c/s: y.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                    [2031499] Notice received from Appellant Mark A. Taylor in 07-1202 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Notice due that record is complete 5/29/07 for Gregory C. Langham.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                      [2031496] Notice of appearance filed by A. Bruce Jones in 07-1202 as attorney for Mark A. Taylor. CERT. INTERESTED PARTIES (y/n): y.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                        [2030337] Notice of appearance filed by C. Michael Montgomery in 07-1202 as attorney for Wayne N. Harris and Katherine Ann Harris. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES (y/n): n.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                          [2030111] Notice of appearance filed by C. Michael Montgomery as attorney for Wayne N. Harris and Katherine Ann Harris in 07-1202. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES (y/n): n.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None ?
                                                                            [2026665] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 5/3/07. Fee due 5/18/07 for Mark A. Taylor. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 5/18/07 for Mark A. Taylor. Notice of appearance due 5/18/07 for Solvay Pharm Inc and Mark A. Taylor.
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?