AMBAR et al v. FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-03587

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 19, 2021 at 10:31 AM DT (4.5 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to foreign state or agency
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk - 28USC1608(a)(4)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 314 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?