FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. FACEBOOK INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-03590-JEB
District Judge James E. Boasberg, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 8, 2021 at 3:35 PM DT (2.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Casale +1 202 326 2467 mcasale@ftc.gov
Space Krisha A. Cerilli +1 202 326 3337 kcerilli@ftc.gov
Space Eric Cochran +1 202 326 3454 ecochran@ftc.gov
Space Patricia Galvan +1 202 326 2473 pgalvan@ftc.gov
Space Henry J. Hauser +1 202 326 2970 +1 202 326 2286 hhauser@ftc.gov
Space Gary Mitchell London, Jr +1 202 326 2451 glondon@ftc.gov
Space Owen T. Masters +1 202 326 2138 omasters@ftc.gov
Space Michael Mikawa +1 202 326 2511 mmikawa@ftc.gov
Space Noel Miller +1 202 326 3639 nmiller2@ftc.gov
Space Mark Silvia +1 202 326 3291 msilvia@ftc.gov
Space Michael H Smith +1 202 326 2031 msmith9@ftc.gov
Space Rebecca Weinstein +1 202 326 2922 rweinstein@ftc.gov
Space Sylvia Zhang +1 202 326 3229 szhang@ftc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria M DiMoscato +1 202 326 2470 +1 202 326 2286 mdimoscato@ftc.gov
Space Burke Kappler +1 202 326 2043 +1 202 326 2477 bkappler@ftc.gov
Space Daniel John Matheson +1 202 326 2075 +1 202 530 9690 dmatheson@ftc.gov
Space David E. Owyang +1 202 326 3013 +1 202 326 2286 dowyang@ftc.gov
Space Robert E. Zuver, Jr. +1 202 326 3134 +1 202 326 2286 rzuver@ftc.gov
v.
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Klineberg +1 202 326 7928 +1 202 326 7999 gklineberg@kellogghansen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Charles Hansen +1 202 326 7904 +1 202 326 7999 mhansen@kellogghansen.com
Space Kevin Johnson Miller +1 202 326 7952 +1 202 326 7999 kmiller@kellogghansen.com
Space Aaron Martin Panner +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 apanner@kellogghansen.com
Space Silvija Anna Strikis +1 202 326 7900 sstrikis@kellogghansen.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/9/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-A
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 76 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: 8/19/2021 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (2) UNREDACTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Matheson, Daniel)
    LREF
    Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: 8/19/2021 Motion for order
    Unopposed MOTION for Order to file First Amended Complaint Under Seal and Memorandum in Support by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted First Amended Complaint, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: 7/23/2021, Terminated: 7/23/2021 Motion for Extension of Time to
    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cerilli, Krisha)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2021. Answer due by 10/4/2021. Responses to Motion to Dismiss due by 11/17/2021. Reply due by 12/1/2021. (znbn)
        LREF
        Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
        MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed [74] Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ADOPTS the parties' proposed schedule and ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by August 19, 2021; 2) Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint by October 4, 2021; 3) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss, if any, by November 17, 2021; and 4) Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by December 1, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/23/2021. (lcjeb2)
          LREF
          Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION re [72] Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/28/2021. (lcjeb2)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
              ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Facebook's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and (3) Plaintiff shall file any amended Complaint by July 29, 2021. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/28/2021. (lcjeb2)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2021. (znbn)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 6/16/2021 Response to Document
                      RESPONSE re [69] NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (ztth)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021, Terminated: 5/21/2021 motion for leave to file
                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 69) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                              MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [70] Motion for Leave to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's [70-1] Response is deemed filed. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/21/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                LREF
                                Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [70] Motion for Leave to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's [70-1] Response is deemed filed. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/21/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/29/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                    NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Order on motion to compel
                                      MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's [63] Motion to Compel Rule 26(f) Conference is DENIED. Given that Facebook's Motion to Dismiss raises a number of serious challenges to the Complaint, it would be premature for the parties to discuss discovery until the contours of what, if anything, remains are known. As the Court expects to issue a decision next month, moreover, there is little possibility of delay adversely affecting Plaintiff. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/11/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [63] MOTION to Compel A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Memorandum in opposition
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [63] MOTION to Compel A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Response to Document
                                            RESPONSE re [64] NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (ztth)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                              MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [65] Motion for Leave to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's Response, attached as Exhibit 1 to its Motion, is deemed filed. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/3/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/3/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 64) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021, Terminated: 5/11/2021 Motion to compel
                                                    MOTION to Compel A Rule 26(f) Conference by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: 4/21/2021 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [56] MOTION to Dismiss FTC Complaint filed by FACEBOOK INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Mary Casale terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 21-CV-02108. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Memorandum in opposition
                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [56] MOTION to Dismiss FTC Complaint filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel Matheson, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-02017. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-01518. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: 3/10/2021, Terminated: 6/28/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss FTC Complaint by FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration of Mark C. Hansen, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: 2/17/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:21-cv-01117. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-00337. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-00336. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:21-cv-00618. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie V. Pope on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Pope, Leslie)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Huff on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Huff, Kevin)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Redacted Document
                                                                              REDACTED DOCUMENT - Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (ztth)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's [41] Motion to Consolidate is HELD IN ABEYANCE until the Court reviews any forthcoming motions to dismiss or, if such are not filed, the initial scheduling conference. The parties are further advised that the Local Rules do not provide for notices of motions; parties should simply file the motions themselves. Any further motion notices will be stricken. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's [42] Motion. The Court ORDERS that: (1) the Clerk of the Court shall place on the public docket Plaintiff's revised partially redacted Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to the [42] Motion; and (2) Plaintiff's unredacted Complaint shall remain sealed until further Order of the Court. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER GRANTING [39] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LESLIE V. POPE. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER GRANTING [38] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KEVIN B. HUFF. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/10/2021. Responses due by 4/7/2021. Replies due by 4/21/2021. (znbn)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent [48] Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by March 10, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss, if any, by April 7, 2021; and (3) Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by April 21, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/13/2021. (lcjeb2)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                              Case directly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg as there is an earlier related case. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [41] Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Consolidate in State of New York, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., 20-cv-3589-JEB, and [43] Defendant's Notice of Response thereto, the Court, with the consent of Judge Boasberg, hereby directs the Clerk of Court, pursuant to Local Civil Rules 40.5(a)(3) and (c)(2), to transfer this case to the Calendar Committee for reassignment to Judge Boasberg as related to civil action 20-cv-3589. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/12/2021. (lccrc2)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Burke W. Kappler terminated. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 3:20-cv-08817. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 4:20-cv-9217. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Notice - other
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Response to Motion to Consolidate by FACEBOOK INC. re [41] Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Revised Partially Redacted Complaint and Updated Proposal Regarding Sealing re [3] Redacted Document Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Matheson, Daniel) Modified relief on 12/28/2020 (znmw).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Waiver of Service
                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE. FACEBOOK waiver sent on 12/9/2020, answer due 2/7/2021. (Matheson, Daniel) Modified to correct party waiving service on 12/21/2020 (ztd).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Leslie V. Pope, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7978186. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Leslie V. Pope, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kevin)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin B. Huff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-7978098. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FACEBOOK INC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kevin B. Huff, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kevin)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Silvija A. Strikis on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Strikis, Silvija)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Martin Panner on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Panner, Aaron)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Miller on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Miller, Kevin)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Klineberg on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Klineberg, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                            LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FACEBOOK INC. (Hansen, Mark)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Charles Hansen on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Hansen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:20-cv-09130. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Attorney Brian Telpner terminated. (Telpner, Brian)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Telpner on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Telpner, Brian)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:20-CV-08815. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Zuver, Jr on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Zuver, Robert)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Mikawa on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Mikawa, Michael)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Cochran on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Cochran, Eric)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Owen T. Masters on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Masters, Owen)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Mitchell London, Jr on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (London, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Burke W. Kappler on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Kappler, Burke)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J. Hauser on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Hauser, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Galvan on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Galvan, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Maria M. DiMoscato on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (DiMoscato, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Krisha A. Cerilli on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Cerilli, Krisha)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Casale on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Casale, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia Zhang on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Zhang, Sylvia)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H Smith on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Weinstein on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Weinstein, Rebecca)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Silvia on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Silvia, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Owyang on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Owyang, David)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Miller on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Miller, Noel)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 5:20-cv-08721. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-03589. (Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA Correction to Signature Page of Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION [6] Complaint filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Matheson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FACEBOOK INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK INC. (Filing Fee: Waived) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(ztd); (See docket entry no.[3] to view.) Modified on to add fee status 12/14/2020 (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. N.D. Cal 20-cv-363 BLF. (ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. N.D. Cal 28-8570. (ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED DOCUMENT- Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons)(ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1] Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/9/2020. (ztd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?