Amnesty International USA et al v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-05435-LAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 1:50 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amnesty International Usa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret Lockwood Satterthwaite , +1 212 998 6657 +1 212 995 4031 satterth@juris.law.nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gitanjali S. Gutierrez +1 212 614 6485 +1 212 614 6499 ggutierrez@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Seaton Brown +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 dbrown@mofo.com
Space Madeleine Ann Hensler +1 212 336 4175 +1 212 468 7900 mhensler@mofo.com
No Logo Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret Lockwood Satterthwaite , +1 212 998 6657 +1 212 995 4031 satterth@juris.law.nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Martin Deyoung +1 202 663 6785 +1 202 663 6363 kyle.deyoung@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gitanjali S. Gutierrez +1 212 614 6485 +1 212 614 6499 ggutierrez@ccrjustice.org
Space Emilou MacLean +1 212 614 6424 +1 212 614 6499 emaclean@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Seaton Brown +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 dbrown@mofo.com
Space Madeleine Ann Hensler +1 212 336 4175 +1 212 468 7900 mhensler@mofo.com
No Logo Washington Square Legal Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret Lockwood Satterthwaite , +1 212 998 6657 +1 212 995 4031 satterth@juris.law.nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gitanjali S. Gutierrez +1 212 614 6485 +1 212 614 6499 ggutierrez@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Seaton Brown +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 dbrown@mofo.com
Space Madeleine Ann Hensler +1 212 336 4175 +1 212 468 7900 mhensler@mofo.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
Space Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (202) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: granting 187 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amna Amber Akbar terminated: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/27/2012) (pl) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            MOTION for Amna Amber Akbar to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc..(Brown, David) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 185 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Gitanjali S. Gutierrez terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/30/2011) (ft) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                MOTION for Gitanjali S. Gutierrez to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc..(Azmy, Baher) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Baher Azmy on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc. (Azmy, Baher) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David S. Brown dated 12/23/10 re: Request that the Court reopen the case to permit tha parties to continue with litigation as to the defendants and that the Court clarify its Order accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Case reopened. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/4/11) (db) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, the Court concludes that the CIA's Glomar responses were appropriate for FOIA request categories seven and eight. Furthermore, the Court concludes that the withholding of Document 300 in full is justified under FOIA exemption 5. There being no other outstanding issues, the case is now closed and all pending motions are denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Remark
                        Joint Stipulation of Facts Regarding The CIA's Glomar Response. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, United States of America, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. (cd) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeannette A. Vargas and Brian M. Feldman dated 9/3/10 re: The parties respectfully request (1) that the Court rule on the CIA's Glomar response for categories 7 and 8 based on the Joint Stipulation and the parties' submissions in this letter and (2) that this letter and the enclosed Joint Stipulation be docketed and maintained as part of the record in this case. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/16/10) (db) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                            DECLARATION of Dione Jackson Stearns in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Declaration
                              DECLARATION Joint Stipulation of Facts Regarding the CIA's Glomar Response. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeannette A. Vargas dated 8/13/2010 re: To the extent that the parties are unable to agree, the parties jointly propose the following schedule. The CIA will respond to the Court's order by submitting a letter brief and appropriate declaration(s) no later than September 3, 2010. Plaintiffs' opposition papers will be due no later than September 24, 2010. The CIA's reply, if any, will be due no later than October 1, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 9/24/2010, Replies due by 10/1/2010.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/18/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                  OPINION AND ORDER #99257 re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Central Intelligence Agency, 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Notice of Cross-Motion. filed by Washington Square Legal Services, Inc., Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Amnesty International USA. For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [dkt. no. 141] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [dkt. no. 158] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/2/10); (Attachments: #(1))(djc) Modified on 8/4/2010 (ajc). (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                    DECLARATION of David S. Brown in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brown, David) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion. and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by the Central Intelligence Agency. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Brown, David) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN THE PARTIES REGARDING SEARCHES FOR RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS AND PROTOCOLS FOR THE PROCESSING OF DRAFT DOCUMENTS: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties as follows: DOJ agrees to conduct searches for records responsive to the Detainee FOIA Requests in the following offices and components: the Office of Legal Counsel ("OLC"), the Office of Professional Responsibility ("OPR") the Office of the Deputy Attorney General ("ODAG"), the Civil Division's Federal Programs Branch, the civil Division shall not include records maintained in connection with a habeas corpus petition, an action under the Detainee Treatment Act, or any equivalent administrative or judicial proceedings in which a current or former detainee who was held at Guantanamo Bay Naval Station is challenging the fact of his/her detention. All other provisions as set forth in this order. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/19/2010) (js) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David Brown dated 3/15/10 re: Request to extend time to 5/7/10 for reply and to extend the page limit to 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion. :( Reply due by 5/7/2010.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/22/10) (cd) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeannette Vargas dated 3/5/10 re: Courtesy copies of the listed documents filed and served on Plaintiffs on 3/5/10 and that the Court docket this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court shall docket this letter. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/9/10) (cd) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion. AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' CROSS-MOTION. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                DECLARATION of WENDY M. HILTON in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C (Supplemental Vaughn, 15-103), # 6 Exhibit C (Supplemental Vaughn, 104-362), # 7 Exhibit C (Supplemental Vaughn, 363-382))(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                  DECLARATION of JEANNETTE A. VARGAS in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (ACLU-SDNY Opinion, dated Oct. 13, 2009), # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted Trans. of ACLU-SDNY In Camera Proceedings), # 3 Exhibit C (ACLU-SDNY Trans. of Argument, Sept. 30, 2009))(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                    REPLY AFFIRMATION of WILLIAM K. LIETZAU in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeanette A. Vargas, Brian M. Feldman and Emily E. Daughtry dated 2/19/2010 re: The Government requests a 2-week extension of time, from 2/19/2010, to 3/5/2010, to file the CIA's opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and its reply brief in support of the CIA's motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/19/2010) (tve) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from JEANNETTE A. VARGAS, BRIAN M. FELDMAN and EMILY E. DAUGHTRY dated 2/12/2010 re: CIA's Opposition and Reply papers be due on February 19, 2010 and, with Plaintiffs' reply on March 19, 2010. Court grant the CIA leave to file a 50-page Opposition and Reply. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 3/19/2010, Responses due by 2/19/2010) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/17/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Preet Bharara dated 1/5/2010 re: The Government requests that the briefing schedule for the summary judgment motion be modified be modified, such that the CIA's opposition and reply papers are due on February 16, 2010, and plaintiffs' reply papers are due on March 16, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/6/2010) (js) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David S. Brown dated 11/23/09 re: counsel for plaintiffs request leave to file the Declaration of Margaret Satterthwaite and its exhibits in hard copy in lieu of electronic filing. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/7/09) (dle) Modified on 12/8/2009 (dle). (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Certificate of Service Other
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Brown, David) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion. and in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by the Central Intelligence Agency. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Brown, David) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                  DECLARATION of Margaret L. Satterthwaite in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Regarding Exhibits)(Brown, David) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                    DECLARATION of David S. Brown in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Brown, David) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc..(Brown, David) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Amna Akbar dated 11/10/2009 re: The parties respectfully request that the Court approve the following revised schedule: CIA's motion for summary judgment: 9/22/2009. Plaintiffs' opposition and Cross-Motion for summary judgment: 11/20/2009. CIA's Opposition and reply: 1/22/2010. Plaintiffs' reply 2/19/2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/16/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David Brown dated 10/30/09 re: Request that the Court approve the following revised briefing schedule re summary judgment motions. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. ( Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 11/17/2009. CIA's Motion due by 9/22/2009. Reply due by 1/19/2010. Response due by 11/17/2009 and Plaintiffs' Reply 2/16/10) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/2/09) (cd) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, the undersigned counsel, Emilou Harris MacLean, who is no longer employed by the Center for Constitutional Rights, respectfully requests to withdraw her appearance as one of the counsel for the Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Plaintiffs, in the above-captioned matter. Gitanjali S. Gutierrez of the Center for Constitutional Rights, who has already entered an appearance, will continue to represent the Center for Constitutional Rights in the above-captioned matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/5/2009) (rw) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN THE PARTIES REGARDING THE PROCEDURES GOVERNING THE CIA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: (1) On September 18,2009, the CIA shall inform the plaintiffs, for each category of the Categories 5-10 and 15-17 of the Specific Documents Request, whether or not the CIA intends to assert a Glomar response to that category.........(9) The CIA will file the Third CIA Summary Judgment Motion by September 22, 2009, if the Additional Sample Set contains no more than 18 records. If the CIA files its Third Summary Judgment Motion of September 22, 2009, Plaintiffs will file their Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on November 3,2009; the CIA will file its Opposition and Reply on December 18, 2009; and Plaintiffs will file their Reply on January 29, 2010. If, however, following the good-faith negotiations set forth in paragraph 5 above, the Additional Sample Set contains more than 18 records, the CIA will file the Third CIA Summary Judgment Motion on a date after September 22, 2009, on a motion schedule as agreed to by the parties; provided that Plaintiffs recognize that each increase in the number of records included in the Additional Sample Set requires additional time for the CIA to file the Third CIA Summary Judgment Motion.........(13) The parties understand and agree that this Stipulation and Order and the First CIA Stipulation, contain the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements, or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the parties or their counsel that are not included within these two stipulations shall be ofany force or effect. (Cross Motions due by 11/3/2009. Motions due by 9/22/2009. Replies due by 12/18/2009. Responses due by 11/3/2009) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/25/09) (db) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment. CORRECTED MEMORANDUM (correcting Table of Contents and Table of Authorities only). Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                  DECLARATION of WENDY M. HILTON in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Part II of the Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A (Vaughn 1-25), # 3 Exhibit A (Vaughn 26-50), # 4 Exhibit A (Vaughn 51-75), # 5 Exhibit A (Vaughn 76-100), # 6 Exhibit A (Vaughh 101-125), # 7 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 126-150), # 8 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 151-175), # 9 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 176 - 200), # 10 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 201-225), # 11 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 226-250), # 12 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 251-275), # 13 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 276-300), # 14 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 301-325), # 15 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 326-350), # 16 Exhibit A (Vaughn Docs 351-360), # 17 Exhibit B (CCR FOIA Request), # 18 Exhibit C (CIA Feb. '05 Response), # 19 Exhibit D (CCR Oct. 2003 Request), # 20 Exhibit E (CCR May 2004 Request), # 21 Exhibit F (Amnesty Ghost Detainee Request), # 22 Exhibit G (Amnesty Reporting Request), # 23 Exhibit H (Specific FOIA Request), # 24 Errata I (First CIA Stipulation), # 25 Exhibit J (April 2009 OLC Memos, Part 1), # 26 Exhibit J (April 2009 Releases, Part 2), # 27 Exhibit J (April 2009 Releases, Part 3), # 28 Exhibit J (April 2009 Releases, Part 4), # 29 Exhibit J (April 2009 Releases, Part 5), # 30 Exhibit J (April 2009 Releases, Part 6), # 31 Exhibit K (Second CIA Stipulation), # 32 Errata L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 1), # 33 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 2), # 34 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 3), # 35 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 4a), # 36 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 4b), # 37 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 5), # 38 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 6a), # 39 Exhibit L (Vaughn Release in Parts, Part 6b), # 40 Exhibit M (Declaration of Leon E. Panetta, Director, CIA), # 41 Exhibit N (Memorandum to Director, Central Intelligence Agency, from Dennis Blair, Director of National Intelligence, dated September 18, 2009))(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Daughtry, Emily) Modified on 9/24/2009 (jar). (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                      DECLARATION of DIONE JACKSON STEARNS in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Document 127), # 2 Exhibit B (Document 269), # 3 Exhibit C (Document 274))(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                        DECLARATION of DAVID J. BARRON in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                          DECLARATION of MARGARET P. GRAFELD in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                            DECLARATION of JAMES P. HOGAN in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (First Donley Declaration), # 2 Exhibit B (Second Donley Declaration), # 3 Exhibit C (Feb. 2005 Memo), # 4 Exhibit D (Feb. 2009 Letter))(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                              DECLARATION of PHILLIP J. MCGUIRE in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                DECLARATION of KAREN L. HECKER in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Document 250))(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jeannette A. Vargas in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of MARK H. HERRINGTON in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of JOHN F. HACKETT in Support re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. Responses due by 10/30/2009(Feldman, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Preet Bharara dated 9/16/09 re: The Government and Plaintiffs jointly write the Court to request that the Court grant the parties leave to file 60 page memoranda in support of these motions. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/16/09) (js) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER: Addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeannette A Vargas, Brian M. Feldman, and Emily E. Daughtry dated June 5, 2009, re: we respectfully write, jointly, on behalf of the Plaintiffs and the Government, to inform the Court that the parties are withdrawing their respective motion for summary judgment, consisting of the Government's motions of April 21, 2008, and November 14, 2008 and Plaintiffs' cross-motions of June 26, 2008, and December 22, 2008. The parties agree on the withdrawal of theses motions at this time. [dkt. nos. 46, 116, 76, 124] ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/9/2009) (rw) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Emily Daughtry dated 5/29/09 re: Update on the Freedom of Information Act requests. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall report by letter no later than 6/30/09. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/3/09) (cd) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 5/19/09 re: Request to inform the court by joint letter no later than 6/5/09 on the status regarding the 2 summary judgment motions and if an agreement has been reached. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Status Report due by 6/5/2009.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/21/09) (db) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeanette A. Vargas, Brian M. Feldman and Emily E. Daughtry dated 4/9/2009 re: The Government respectfully requests a 60-day extension of time, from 4/14/2009, until 6/15/2009, to file a reply in further support of the Central Intelligence Agency and the Department of Justice's motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Recognizing Plaintiff's opposition, the request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/14/2009) (tve) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gitanjali S. Gutierrez dated 2/11/2009 re: Counsel writes in response to the Central Intelligence Agency ("CIA") and the Department of Justice Office of Intelligence Policy and Review ("OIPR") request a 90 day extension of time from February 13, 2009 until May 14, 2009 to file a combined reply in further support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the request dated February 6, 2009, of the CIA and OIPR for a 90 day extension of time in which to file a reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion and Plaintiff's, consent to a 60 day extension the time to file is extended 60 days without prejudice to additional requests. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/14/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Pierre G. Armand dated 2/6/09 re: Counsel requests a 90-day extension of time, from February 13, 2009 until May 14, 2009, to file a combined reply in further support of their motions for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Time is extended to February 16, to permit Plaintiffs to consider Defendants' request. This extension is without prejudice to additional extensions if the parties are unable to agree. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/9/09) (mme) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian Feldman dated 1/20/09 re: counsel for the Government requests that the Court notify the parties if any further briefing on this issue could be of assistance to the Court and that this letter be docketed and retained as part of the record in this case. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court shall docket this letter. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/27/09) (dle) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Pierre Armand dated 1/23/99 re: counsel for the Government requests a two week extension of time until 2/13/09 to file a combined reply in further support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiffs' cross motion for summary judgment and permission to file a 60 page opposition/reply brief and a 45 page reply. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/26/09) (dle) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Errata I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB)(Brown, David) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Having considered the Governments letter of December 16, 2008 and Plaintiffs' letter dated December 23, 2008 (both attached) (deemed the Governments motion and the Plaintiffs' opposition, respectively), the Governments request for a two-month extension of the stay of the CIA's obligations to search, process, and produce responsive releaseable information pursuant to Categories 11 and 13 of Plaintiffs' Supplementary CIA For A Request, dated December 28, 2007, which this Court stayed on the record on August 29, 2008, and then by written order on September 24, 2008,is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/08) (mme) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O, # 2 Exhibit P, # 3 Exhibit Q, # 4 Exhibit R, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit U, # 8 Exhibit V, # 9 Exhibit W, # 10 Exhibit X, # 11 Exhibit Y, # 12 Exhibit Z, # 13 Exhibit AA, # 14 Exhibit BB)(Brown, David) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jar). (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Brown, David) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jar). (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit aa, # 2 Exhibit bb)(Brown, David) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jar). (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit n, # 2 Exhibit o, # 3 Exhibit p, # 4 Exhibit q, # 5 Exhibit r, # 6 Exhibit s, # 7 Exhibit t, # 8 Exhibit u, # 9 Exhibit v, # 10 Exhibit w, # 11 Exhibit x, # 12 Exhibit y, # 13 Exhibit z)(Brown, David) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jar). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: 124 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a, # 2 Errata b, # 3 Exhibit c, # 4 Exhibit d, # 5 Exhibit e, # 6 Exhibit f, # 7 Exhibit g, # 8 Exhibit h, # 9 Exhibit i, # 10 Exhibit j, # 11 Exhibit k, # 12 Exhibit l, # 13 Exhibit m)(Brown, David) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jar). (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Amnesty International USA.(Brown, David) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA. (Brown, David) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gitanjali S. Gutierrez dated 12/18/2008 re: Requesting leave to file a 60 page memorandum in opposition to the Government's summary judgment motion and in support of their cross-motion for judgment. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/18/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amna Amber Akbar on behalf of Amnesty International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. (Akbar, Amna) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency. (Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/15/2008, Entered: 11/15/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Mark Bradley in Support re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (CCR Request), # 2 Exhibit B (First Amnesty), # 3 Exhibit C (Second Amnesty Request))(Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 11/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/15/2008, Entered: 11/15/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Wendy Hilton in Support re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Supplementary CIA FOIA Request))(Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 11/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency. (Daughtry, Emily) Modified on 11/17/2008 (jar). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 107 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Madeleine A. Hensler dated 9/11/08 re: Plaintiff requests leave from the Court to file a 60 page memorandum of law in further support of plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for a two week extension of time within which to file this memorandum, until October 3, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/11/08) (js)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency.(Daughtry, Emily) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/29/08 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Pierre G. Armand, Brian M. Feldman and Emily E. Daughtry dated 11/12/08 re: Counsel requests that the Court grant the parties leave to file 45-page memoranda in support of these motions. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/13/08) (mme) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION of EMILY E. DAUGHTRY in Support re: [34] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment., [75] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Central Intelligence Agency.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Oral Opinion of Aug. 29, 2008))(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Emily E. Daughtry dated 10/24/08 re: Request for the following revised briefing schedule - CIA/OIPR's Motion for Summary Judgment November 14,2008; Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment December 22,2008; CIA/OIPR's Opposition to Cross-Motion January 30,2009; and Plaintiffs' Reply February 13, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Cross Motions due by 12/22/2008. Motions due by 11/14/2008. Replies due by 1/30/2009. Responses due by 12/22/2008) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/08) (db) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 104 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY AFFIRMATION of RALPH S. DIMAIO in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment., [75] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Central Intelligence Agency.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Vaughn Entry for Doc. 300), # (2) Exhibit B (DNI Authorization))(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment., [75] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Central Intelligence Agency.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Support re: 34 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Madeleine Ann Hensler on behalf of Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. (Hensler, Madeleine)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Madeleine A. Hensler dated 10/2/2008 re: Counsel writes requesting that with the Court's consent, Plaintiff will file their reply on 10/7/2008. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 10/7/2008.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2008) (tve) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 8/29/2008 re: AUSA writes requesting leave for CIA to file a 60-page memorandum of law. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2008) (tve)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Following review of Ms. Hensler's letter of 9/24/08, and Messrs. Armand and Feldman's letter of 9/29/08, and construing them as Plaintiffs' motion for the relief requested therein and Defendants' opposition, Plaintiffs' motion is denied. As set out in the CIA's papers on its motion for summary judgment, it takes the position that the publicly filed materials provide sufficient basis for decision and provides the classified Hilton Declaration ex parte and in camera as additional information, should the Court determine it was necessary to refer to it. Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief promptly. Counsel shall confer and inform the Court by letter when to expect the reply brief. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/08) (tro) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 100 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority on Consent. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (MacLean, Emilou)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 85 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 90 Motion to Stay. For the reasons stated on the record on August 29, 2008, the Government's motion [dkt. no. 90] for a four-month stay with respect to categories 11 and 13 of the CIA's supplemental request is GRANTED. In addition, in light of the schedule agreed to among the parties and memorialized in counsels' August 15, 2008 letter, endorsed by the Court on August 20, 2008, Plaintiffs' motion [dkt. no. 85] for a preliminary injunction is DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/24/2008) (tve) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Seaton Brown on behalf of Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. (Brown, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on August 29,2008 9:15 a.m. before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (mro) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law served on Center for Constitutional Rights, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc., and Amnesty Int'l USA on August 26, 2008. Document filed by United States of America. (Daughtry, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [90] MOTION to Stay Partially the Proceedings.. Document filed by United States of America. (Daughtry, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [90] MOTION to Stay Partially the Proceedings.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeanette A. Vargas dated 8/15/2008; counsel writes for approval of the following schedules: Governments motion for a partial stay 8/12/2008; Plaintiffs opposition 8/20/2008; Government's reply 8/26/2008. CIA's opposition to the plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment and reply brief in support of the CIA's Motion for summary judgment will now be due on 9/4/2008 and plainffs reply brief will be due on 9/19/2008. CIA/OIPR's motion for summary judgment 10/31/2008; Plaintiffs opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment 12/8/2008; CIA/OIPR's opposition to cross-motion 1/16/2009; Plaintiffs reply 1/30/2009. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/20/2008) (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 8/13/2008 re: Counsel respectfully request that the Court permit them to submit the proposed joint scheduling order by Friday, August 15, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/14/2008) (jfe) Modified on 9/17/2008 (jfe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 93 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Emily Daughtry in Support re: [90] MOTION to Stay Partially the Proceedings.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of John H. Durham in Support re: [90] MOTION to Stay Partially the Proceedings.. Document filed by United States of America. (Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [90] MOTION to Stay Partially the Proceedings.. Document filed by United States of America. (Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 90 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Partially the Proceedings. Document filed by United States of America. Return Date set for 8/29/2008 at 09:00 AM.(Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Martha Jane Johnstone dated 7/31/2008 re: Counsel respectfully request that the Court grant me leave to withdraw as counsel. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/8/2008) (jfe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Gitanjali S. Gutierrez dated 7/23/08 re: counsel for plaintiff writes to the court to memorialize the parties agreement to the following proposed schedule for the plaintiffs motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed on 7/18/08: Defendants will file their letter brief in opposition on 7/30/08; Plaintiffs will file their reply on 8/4/08; and the motion will be heard on 8/8/08 at 9:00 a.m. At this time, plaintiffs respectfully request that the hearing be conducted in person rather than telephonically and will notify the Court in their 8/4/08 submission if this position changes. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/4/08) (pl) Modified on 8/7/2008 (pl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Support re: [85] FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments A-B, # (2) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments C-D, # (3) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments E-F, # (4) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment G-1, # (5) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment G-2, # (6) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments H-J, # (7) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments K-Q, # (8) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment R, # (9) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments S-X, # (10) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment Y-1, # (11) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment Y-2, # (12) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments Z-EE, # (13) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments FF-KK)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [85] FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. B. Nov. 30, 2007 Ltr from Defs to Court, # (2) Exhibit Ex. C. Nov. 30, 2007 Ltr from Plaintiffs to Court, # (3) Exhibit Ex. D DOJ Document List, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [87])- DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Support re: [82] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments A-B, # (2) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments C-D, # (3) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments E-F, # (4) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment G-1, # (5) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment G-2, # (6) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments H-J, # (7) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments K-Q, # (8) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment R, # (9) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments S-X, # (10) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment Y-1, # (11) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachment Y-2, # (12) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments Z-EE, # (13) Ex. A Gutierrez Decl. Attachments FF-KK)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 7/22/2008 (kkc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 83 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [86])- MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [82] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA.. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 7/22/2008 (kkc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [85])- MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 7/22/2008 (kkc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Gitanjali S. Gutierrez to RE-FILE Document [81] Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Link to incorrect filing of document#80. (KA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Gitanjali S. Gutierrez to RE-FILE Document [80] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA. ERROR(S): Filing Error of Attachment #80. Supporting Memorandum of Law must be filed individually. Event code located under Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (KA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Support re: [80] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments A-B, # (2) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments C-D, # (3) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments E-F, # (4) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachment G-1, # (5) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachment G-2, # (6) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments H-J, # (7) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments K-Q, # (8) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachment R, # (9) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments S-X, # (10) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachment Y-1, # (11) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachment Y-2, # (12) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments Z-EE, # (13) Gutierrez Declaration, Attachments FF-KK)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 7/21/2008 (KA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA. Document filed by Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against DOJ and the CIA, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B Nov. 30, 2007 Ltr from Defs to Court, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C Nov. 30, 2007 Ltr from Plaintiffs to Court, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D DOJ Records List, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 7/21/2008 (KA).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/22/2008 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Margaret L. Satterthwaite in Opposition re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits A-D, # (2) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits E-I, # (3) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits J-N, # (4) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits O-V, # (5) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits W-Z, # (6) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits AA, # (7) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibit BB, # (8) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits CC-KK, # (9) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits LL-QQ, # (10) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits RR-ZZ, # (11) Exhibit 2, Declaration of Margaret L. Satterthwaite, Exhibits, AAA-end)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Declaration of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez w/Exhibits, pt. 1, # (2) Exhibit 1, Declaration of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez w/Exhibits, pt. 2, # (3) Exhibit 1, Declaration of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez w/Exhibits, pt. 3)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment. By Central Intelligence Agency. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Opposition to CIA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (2) Exhibit 2 Vaughn Index Chart)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Gitanjali Gutierrez to RE-FILE Document [75] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Central Intelligence Agency. ERROR(S): Attachments error. Supporting documents are filed individually. Use event codes Memorandum of Law in Support, Declaration in Support and Affidavit in Support which are found under event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. (jar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Central Intelligence Agency. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # (2) Exhibit Gutierrez Declaration, pt 1, # (3) Exhibit Gutierrez Declaration pt 2, # (4) Exhibit Gutierrez Declaration pt 3, # (5) Exhibit Chart, # (6) Exhibit Satterthwaite Declaration, # (7) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. A-D, # (8) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. E-I, # (9) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Ex. J-N, # (10) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. O-V, # (11) Exhibit Satterthewaite Decl. Exs. W-Z, # (12) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Ex. AA, # (13) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Ex. BB, # (14) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. CC-KK, # (15) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. LL-QQ, # (16) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. RR-ZZ, # (17) Exhibit Satterthwaite Decl. Exs. AAA-end)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 6/26/2008 (jar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Gitanjali S. Gutierrez in Opposition re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gutierrez Declaration, pt 1, # (2) Affidavit Gutierrez Declaration pt 2, # (3) Affidavit Gutierrez Declaration pt 3, # (4) Exhibit Chart, # (5) Affidavit Satterthwaite Decl, pt 1, # (6) Affidavit Satterthwaite A-D, # (7) Affidavit Satterthwaite E-I, # (8) Affidavit Satterthwaite J-N, # (9) Affidavit Satterthwaite O-V, # (10) Affidavit Satterthwaite W-Z, # (11) Affidavit Satterthwaite AA, # (12) Affidavit Satterthwaite BB, # (13) Affidavit Satterthwaite CC-KK, # (14) Affidavit Satterthwaite LL-QQ, # (15) Affidavit Satterthwaite RR-ZZ, # (16) Affidavit Satterthwaite AAA-end)(Gutierrez, Gitanjali) Modified on 6/26/2008 (jar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT served on AMNESTY INTERNATIONAL USA, CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, WASHINGTON SQUARE LEGAL SERVICES, INC. on June 20, 2008. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security. Related document: [68] Amended Complaint, filed by Washington Square Legal Services, Inc., Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc..(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the search undertaken by DHS was adequate and its lone non-disclosure was proper under Exemption 6. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' cross-motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 34] is DENIED, and Defendant DHS's motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 21] is GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/08) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Loretta A. Preska from Emilou MacLean dated 6/6/08 re: that based on communications with Your Honor's law clerk as well as the consensual nature of this amended complaint, we understand that a formal motion for leave to amend is unnecessary. We have thus electronically filed a amended complaint and served Defendant CIA electronically and by federal express. ENDORSEMENT: Filing of the Amended Complaint is approved. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/16/08) (pl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/22/2008 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND THE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR ADJUDICATING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of summary judgement motions. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/9/08) (mme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [61] Motion to Withdraw. The motion is granted.. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/9/08) (mme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security.Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by Washington Square Legal Services, Inc., Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc..(dle) (dle).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emilou Harris MacLean on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc. (MacLean, Emilou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Kyle M. DeYoung, Esq. in Support re: [61] MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel to Plaintiffs Amnesty International USA and Washington Square Legal Services, Inc... Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Deyoung, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on May 22, 2008 @ 9:10 am before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (jab)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kyle De Young dated 5/23/08 re: Plaintiffs request leave from the Court to file a 40-page memorandum of law. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/31/08) (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel to Plaintiffs Amnesty International USA and Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc..(Deyoung, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martha Jane Johnstone on behalf of Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. (Johnstone, Martha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kyle DeYoung dated 5/14/08 re: Plaintiffs' opposition (and brief in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment will be due on Wednesday, 5/28/08. Accordingly, CIA's opposition/reply brief will be due on Friday, 6/27/08 and plaintiffs' reply brief will be due on Friday, 7/11/08. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/14/08) (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 5/28/2008. Response due by 5/28/2008 (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Notice of Motion; (2) Memorandum of Law in Support of the Central Intelligence Agencys Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Declaration of Ralph S. DiMaio; (4) Declaration of Paul P. Colborn; (5) Declaration of Philip J. McGuire; (6) Declaration of Karen Hecker; (7) Declaration of Margaret P. Grafeld; (8) Declaration of Dione Jackson Stearns; (9) Declaration of John F. Hackett; and (10) Declaration of William T. Kammer, and accompanying exhibits served on Plaintiffs on April 21, 2008. Service was made by First Class Mail. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Ralph S. DiMaio (Volume II) in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit I, # (2) Exhibit J (Exemption 1 and 3 Chart))(Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Margaret L. Satterthwaite dated 4/18/2008 re: Updating the Court regarding a change in the agreed upon processing and briefing schedule for the CIA. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/21/2008) (jpo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Ralph S. DiMaio in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1-50), # (2) Exhibit A (51-100), # (3) Exhibit A (101-125), # (4) Exhibit A (126-150), # (5) Exhibit A (151-200), # (6) Errata A (201-225), # (7) Exhibit A (226-250), # (8) Exhibit B, # (9) Exhibit C, # (10) Exhibit D, # (11) Exhibit E, # (12) Exhibit F, # (13) Exhibit G, # (14) Exhibit H (stipulation))(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of William T. Kammer in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John P. Hackett in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Dione Jackson Stearns in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Margaret P. Grafeld in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Karen L. Hecker in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Philip J. McGuire in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Paul P. Colborn in Support re: [46] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency.(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL, that DHS will, in good faith, process all remaining Withheld Records using the redactions made to the Representative Set as a guideline for the withholding of exempt information; provided, however that, in processing the remaining Withheld Records, DHS will segregate non-exempt electronic mail transmittal information. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/16/08) (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gitanjali S. Gutierrez on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc. (Gutierrez, Gitanjali)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeannette A. Vargas dated 4/10/2008 re: Requesting leave form the Court to file a 45 page memorandum of law. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/11/2008) (jpo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 4/23/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/3/08) (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kyle DeYoung dated 2/15/08 re: Request for leave from the Court, nunc pro tunc, to file a 15 page memorandum of law. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/20/08) (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [34] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment., [29] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Vania Lockett in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (part 1), # (2) Exhibit A (part 2), # (3) Exhibit A (part 3), # (4) Exhibit A (part 4), # (5) Exhibit B (part 1), # (6) B (part 2), # (7) B (part 3), # (8) B (part 3), # (9) Exhibit B (part 5), # (10) Exhibit B (part 6), # (11) Exhibit B (part 7), # (12) Exhibit B (part 8), # (13) Exhibit B (part 9), # (14) Exhibit B (part 10), # (15) Exhibit C, # (16) Exhibit D)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [34] CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment., [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Brian Feldman in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY AFFIDAVIT of William T. Kammer in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (part 1), # (2) Exhibit A (part 2), # (3) Exhibit A (part 3), # (4) Exhibit B)(Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of James McNeely in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 6/19/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Kyle M. DeYoung in Support of Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42)(Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Daniel L. Regard in Support of Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. and In Support of Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Vania T. Lockett in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Sandy Ford Page in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Nicole Bertucci in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Shari Suzuki in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Catrina M. Pavlik-Keenan in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Brian M. Feldman, Esq. in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 6/19/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security.(Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman and Jeannette Anne Vargas dated 11/21/2007 re: Grant the parties a brief extension of time, from Monday, November 26, 2007, until Friday, November 30, 2007, to conclude our discussions and submit our respective reports of the Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Status Report due by 11/30/2007.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/26/2007) (jmi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/24/2007. (jar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 9/11/07 re: a request that the Court adjourn the initial pretrial conference in this matter from 9/20/2007 to 10/24/2007 to begin at 9:30 AM. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/12/07) (kco)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeannette A. Vargas dated 9/4/07 re: On behalf of all parties to the above referenced Freedom of Information Act litigation, I write to request an adjournment of the conference scheduled for September 6, 2007, at 11:00 a.m.. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to September 20, at 9:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/6/07) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/6/2007 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/17/07) (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Marc Feldman on behalf of Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security (Feldman, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeannette Anne Vargas on behalf of Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security (Vargas, Jeannette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security. (McShain, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Defense, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security.(McShain, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: Kyle DeYoung is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Amnesty International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc. and Washington Square Legal Services, Inc. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. If this action is assigned to the ECF system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/30/07) (dle) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2007 (Lewis, Diahan). Modified on 8/21/2007 (Lewis, Diahan).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [12] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [11] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 07/20/2007, Receipt Number 621878. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Kyle Deyoung to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.(jco)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 7/19/2007 re: extend the deadline for dfts to respond to the complt in this matter by two weeks. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Department of Justice; Department of State; Department of Defense; Central Intelligence Agency; and Department of Homeland Security answer due 8/3/2007. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/20/2007) (jar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Lakisha Richardson, Paralegal Specialist, Department of Homeland Security. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Willo T. Lee, Mailroom Clerk, Department of Justice. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Mr. Schurle, Central Intelligence Agency. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Department of Defense served on 6/14/2007, answer due 7/4/2007. Service was accepted by Sharon Jacobs-Fisher, Paralegal, Department of Defense. Document filed by Amestey International USA; Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc.; Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Stephanie Minor, Legal Assistant, Department of State. Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.. (Satterthwaite, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amestey International USA.(jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.(jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc.(jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Department of Justice, Department of State, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 617555)Document filed by Amestey International USA, Center for Constitutional Rights, Inc., Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.(jeh) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2007 (Horne, Jenny).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice, Department of State, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 282 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?