Abraham Rothman, et al. v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 20BBCV00876

Tags
Last Updated December 14, 2020 at 1:14 AM EST (11.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rothman Abraham, Plaintiff
No Logo Wiig Kristen, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc."
Type Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - CONDITIONAL
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Mailing
    Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
      Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Case Management Statement
        Case Management Statement
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice Of Posting Of Jury Fees
          Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
            Blank 8 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Personal Service
            Proof of Personal Service
              Blank 7 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Personal Service
              Proof Of Personal Service
                Blank 6 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Notice of Case Management Conference
                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Summons
                      on Complaint
                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Complaint

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 6,832 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?