John Does 1 through 7 v. The Taliban et al
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:20-mc-00740-KPF
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2021 at 8:31 PM DT (1.8 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Does 1 through 7, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miami Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Orlando do Campo +1 305 358 6600 +1 305 358 6601 od@dandtlaw.com
v.
Al-Qaeda Al-Qaeda, Defendant
No Logo The Haqqani Network, Defendant
The Taliban The Taliban, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 12/14/2020
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 12/15/2020
Origin
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 4:20-cv-00605-P[Northern District of Texas]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ECF
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Expedite
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [13] Notice (Other) filed by John Does 1 through 7. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' request to deem Respondents Samark Jose Lopez Bello and Yakima Trading Corporation to have actual notice of the proceedings in this case through service on an attorney purportedly representing Respondents in unrelated proceedings. (Dkt. #13). Notably, that attorney has refused to accept service on behalf of Respondents in the instant case. The Court does not have the same confidence as Plaintiffs that the proffered facts "indicate[] that [counsel] is... in communication" with Respondents, much less that there is "ample reason" for the Court to conclude that Respondents "have received actual notice of the instant writ proceedings." Additionally, given that Respondents have retained counsel and appeared in other actions in this District, the Court does not believe, on this record, that it is appropriate to waive the requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4 and 5. Accordingly, Plaintiff's application is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/15/2021) (rro)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: 6/14/2021 Notice - other
                    NOTICE of Service. Document filed by John Does 1 through 7. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Composite Exhibit A).(Do Campo, Orlando)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to serve this Order, along with their moving papers (see Dkt. #8-10) on Respondents, and are further ORDERED to file proof of service with the Court. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for writs of execution. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/5/2021) (rro)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [9] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 9 and 10. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (mro)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit C and Redact Exhibit D of DE 8 addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Orlando do Campo on behalf of Plaintiffs dated 04/30/2021. Document filed by John Does 1 through 7. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C to Motion for Writ of Execution DE 8, # (2) Exhibit D to Motion for Writ of Execution of DE 8).(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Writ of Execution
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 4/30/2021 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                    LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal/Redacted Exhibit to Motion for Writ of Execution addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Orlando do Campo on behalf of Plaintiffs dated 04/30/2021. Document filed by John Does 1 through 7..(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Motion for writ of execution
                                      EX PARTE MOTION for Writ of Execution against Samark Jose Lopez Bello, Yakima Trading Corporation . Document filed by John Does 1 through 7. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Affidavit of John Thornton, # (2) Exhibit B- Complaint, # (3) Exhibit C- Financial Institution Report, # (4) Exhibit D- Financial Institution Report, # (5) Exhibit E- Affidavit of Brian Fonseca, # (6) Exhibit F- Proposed Order, # (7) Exhibit G- Writ Samark, # (8) Exhibit H- Writ Yakima).(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Writ of Execution - Issued
                                        WRIT OF EXECUTION Issued on February 23, 2021, in favor of John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6 and against The Taliban, Al-Qaeda, and the Haqqani Network in the amount of $138,418,741.00.(Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/23/2021).(km)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Abstract of Judgment issued
                                          ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED on February 10, 2021, in favor of John Doe 1 in the amount of $23,179,645.00; in favor of John Doe 2 in the amount of $23,296,980; in favor of John Doe 3 in the amount of $31,775,920.00; in favor of John Doe 4 in the amount of $24,231,823.00; in favor of John Doe 5 in the amount of $14,511,532.00; in favor of John Doe 6 in the amount of $10,672,656.00; in favor of John Doe 7 in the amount of $10,750,185.00 and against The Taliban, Al-Qaeda and The Haqqani Network, jointly and severally. Abstract of Judgment mailed by the Court.(km)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: 2/9/2021 Proposed Abstract of Judgment
                                            PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23878015. Abstract of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by John Does 1 through 7. Document Number of Related Judgment: [5]..(Do Campo, Orlando) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: 2/9/2021 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Orlando Do Campo on behalf of John Does 1 through 7..(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Registration of Foreign Judgment
                                                AMENDED MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT Judgment # 22 in favor of John Does 1 through 7 against Al-Qaeda, The Haqqani Network, The Taliban in the amount of $ 138,418,741.00. Other Court Name: United States District Court - Northern District of Texas. Other Court Case Number: 4:20-cv-00605-P. Document filed by John Does 1 through 7.(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [3] Motion. On the record before the Court, the Court finds that Plaintiffs' interests in proceeding anonymously outweigh the public interest in disclosure and any prejudice to Defendants. See Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant, 537 F.3d 185, 189 (2d Cir. 2008). Therefore, Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Anonymously is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/17/2020) (rro)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020, Terminated: 12/17/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                    MOTION to Proceed Anonymously . Document filed by John Does 1 through 7..(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
                                                      MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Miscellaneous Pleading
                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITATING PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Orlando Do Campo re: Dcument No. [1] Registration of Foreign Judgment. Please file your Motion to Proceed Anonymously. (laq)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                          Case Designated ECF. (vba)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                            MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. .(vba)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Orlando Do Campo. Attorney must electronically file the Miscellaneous Cover Sheet. Use the event type Miscellaneous Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (laq)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Registration of Foreign Judgment
                                                                MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT Judgment in the amount of $ 138,418,741.00. Other Court Name: United States District Court - Northern District of Texas. Other Court Case Number: 4:20-cv-00605-P. (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23023495)Document filed by John Does 1 through 7.(Do Campo, Orlando)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?