Talkdesk, Inc. v. Mitel Networks (International) LTD.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-01699-RGA
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 20, 2021 at 12:34 AM DT (3.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Talkdesk, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena C. Norman +1 302 571 5029 enorman@ycst.com
Space Robert M. Vrana +1 302 571 6600 rvrana@ycst.com
No Logo Mitel Networks (international) Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
Space Kelly E. Farnan +1 302 651 7705 farnan@rlf.com
No Logo Talkdesk, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena C. Norman +1 302 571 5029 enorman@ycst.com
Space Elena C. Norman +1 302 571 5029 enorman@ycst.com
Space Robert M. Vrana +1 302 571 6600 rvrana@ycst.com
Space Robert M. Vrana +1 302 571 6600 rvrana@ycst.com
Office Wilmington
Filed 12/14/2020
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County New Castle
Terminated 3/19/2021
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,MEDIATION-JLH
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 SO ORDEREDCourt Filing
SO ORDERED, Granting [56] Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2021. (nms)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 ///Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice, by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 3/19/2021 (nms).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 Redacted Document
      REDACTED VERSION of [48] Counterclaim by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 Redacted Document
        REDACTED VERSION of [45] Reply Brief by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: 3/17/2021 Redacted Document
          REDACTED VERSION of [44] Response to Motion by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Redacted Document
            REDACTED VERSION of [41] Declaration of Jay Steinmetz, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/16/2021 (nms).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Redacted Document
              REDACTED VERSION of [40] Declaration of Eric Groene, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/16/2021 (nms).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Redacted Document
                REDACTED VERSION of [39] Declaration of Matthew Clare, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-H)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/16/2021 (nms).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Notice of Service
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's (1) Initial Disclosures and (2) Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Delaward Default Standard for Discovery filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Counterclaim
                    [SEALED] Second Amended Counterclaims, against Talkdesk, Inc. - filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/15/2021 (nms).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 Notice of Service
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff Talkdesk's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), and 2) Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Talkdesk, Inc..(Vrana, Robert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER DENYING TRO: The motion for TRO (D.I. [38]) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/12/2021. (nms)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 Reply Brief
                          [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re [38] AMENDED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: 3/10/2021 Response to motion
                            [SEALED] RESPONSE to [38] AMENDED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 3/10/2021 (nms).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: 3/10/2021 letter
                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Robert M. Vrana, regarding response to Defendant's March 10, 2021 letter (D.I [42]). (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 3/10/2021 (nms).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: 3/10/2021 letter
                                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.'s Amended Motion for TRO. (Farnan, Kelly)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Declaration
                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION re [38] Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/9/2021 (nms).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Declaration
                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re [38] Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/9/2021 (nms).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Declaration
                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re [38] Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-H)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/9/2021 (nms).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021, Terminated: 3/12/2021 Motion for TRO
                                        AMENDED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) 7.1.1 Certification, # (2) Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/9/2021 (nms).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: 3/4/2021, Terminated: 3/4/2021 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                          STIPULATION to Extend Certain Deadlines - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 3/4/2021 (nms).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  SO ORDERED
                                            SO ORDERED, re [37] STIPULATION to Extend Certain Deadlines (*Second Amended Counterclaims due by 3/12/2021; Plaintiff's answer/response to Second Amdned Counterclaims is due by 4/5/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2021. (nms)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021, Terminated: 2/26/2021 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                              STIPULATION to Extend Certain Deadlines - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 2/26/2021 (nms).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                SO ORDERED, re [36] STIPULATION to Extend Certain Deadlines (Reset Answer Deadlines: Talkdesk, Inc. answer due 3/5/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/26/2021. (nms)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                  SO ORDERED, re [35] STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, and for the Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Amended Counterclaims to February 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2021. (nms)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: 2/10/2021, Terminated: 2/11/2021 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, and for the Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Amended Counterclaims to February 26, 2021 - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 2/11/2021 (nms).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 Redacted Document
                                                      REDACTED VERSION of [22] Declaration of Matthew Clare, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-E)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 2/4/2021 (nms).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SO ORDERED Granting [32] Stipulation Regarding Motion for Temporary Retraining Order and Deadline to Exchange Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2021. (nms)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Deadline to Exchange Initial Disclosures by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 Remark
                                                            Remark: The parties contacted Chambers on 2/3/2021, and asked for the Court to hold the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (D.I. [20]) in abeyance while they further work together on the issue. (nms)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Declaration
                                                              DECLARATION of Chad Gaydos re [27] Answering Brief in Opposition, by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Norman, Elena) Modified on 2/2/2021 (nms).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Declaration
                                                                DECLARATION of Charanya "CK" Kannan re [27] Answering Brief in Opposition, by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Norman, Elena) Modified on 2/2/2021 (nms).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Declaration
                                                                  DECLARATION of Amy K. Van Zant re [27] Answering Brief in Opposition, by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-B)(Norman, Elena) Modified on 2/2/2021 (nms).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: 2/2/2021 Answering Brief in Opposition
                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [20] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Talkdesk, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2021. (Norman, Elena)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Add Attorneys Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Amy K. Van Zant, Jason K. Yu, Nathan Shaffer, Maria Sokova for Talkdesk, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                        SO ORDERED, re [26] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy K. Van Zant, Attorney Jason K. Yu, Attorney Nathan Shaffer and Attorney Maria Sokova, filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2021. (nms)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021, Terminated: 1/29/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy K. Van Zant, Attorney Jason K. Yu, Attorney Nathan Shaffer and Attorney Maria Sokova - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Oral OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORAL ORDER: A Response/Answering Brief to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (D.I. [20]) is due by COB on 2/2/2021. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2021. (nms)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 letter
                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Kelly E. Farnan, regarding expedited oral argument on Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.'s Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/28/2021 (nms).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Declaration
                                                                                DECLARATION of Jay Steinmetz re [20] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/28/2021 (nms).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Declaration
                                                                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION of Matthew Clare re [20] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-E)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/28/2021 (nms).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Opening Brief in Support
                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re [20] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/11/2021. (Farnan, Kelly)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021, Terminated: 2/4/2021 Motion for TRO
                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) 7.1.1 Certification)(Farnan, Kelly)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Counterclaim
                                                                                        AMENDED Counterclaims against Talkdesk, Inc. - filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd..(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/28/2021 (nms).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Add Attorneys Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice Attorneys David H. Harper and Ryan N. Gardner for Mitel Networks (International) Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Order Setting Mediation ConferencesCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is scheduled for April 5, 2021 at 11:30 AM Eastern Time before Judge Jennifer L. Hall to discuss ADR. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to chambers. (*See Order for details). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/25/2021. (ceg)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              SO ORDERED Granting [15] Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/21/2021. (nms) (nms).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                                                SO ORDERED, re [16] STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Talkdesk, Inc. answer due 2/3/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/21/2021. (nms)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021, Terminated: 1/21/2021 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 1/21/2021 (nms).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                                                    PROPOSED Protective Order, by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 1/21/2021 (nms).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Oral OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER: The Rule 16(b) Conference set for 1/21/2021, is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2021. (nms)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 11/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2022. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/2/2022, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 3 day Bench Trial is set to start 9/19/2022, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2021. (nms)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Case Referred to Mediation
                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Hall for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (cak)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                                                            SO ORDERED, re [11] MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Harper and Ryan N. Gardner, filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2021. (nms)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 Proposed Order
                                                                                                              PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Letter)(Vrana, Robert) Modified on 1/20/2021 (nms).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021, Terminated: 1/20/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David H. Harper and Ryan N. Gardner - filed by Mitel Networks (International) Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Stipulation to EXTEND Time
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 1/13/2021 (nms).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  SO ORDERED
                                                                                                                    SO ORDERED, re [10] STIPULATION to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Talkdesk, Inc. answer due 1/27/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/13/2021. (nms)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021 letter
                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Robert M. Vrana, regarding dial-in information for the January 21, 2021 Scheduling Conference. (Vrana, Robert) Modified on 1/8/2021 (nms).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Order Setting Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/21/2021, at 2:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2021. (nms)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MLN TopCo Limited for Mitel Networks (International) LTD. filed by Mitel Networks (International) LTD.. (Farnan, Kelly)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [1] Complaint with Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Talkdesk, Inc. by Mitel Networks (International) LTD..(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/4/2021 (nms).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Mitel Networks (International) LTD on December 17, 2020, filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Vrana, Robert)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Summons Issued - Electronic
                                                                                                                                  Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (apk)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mitel Networks (International) LTD. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3395977) - filed by Talkdesk, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) Modified on 12/16/2020 (nms).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?