STATE OF COLORADO et al v. GOOGLE LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:20-cv-03715-APM
District Judge Amit P. Mehta, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2021 at 1:29 PM DT (3.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph S. Betsko +1 717 787 4530 +1 202 705 7110 jbetsko@attorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Commonwealth Of Puerto Rico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Alaska, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Arizona, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Colorado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 303-866-5037

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane Rebecca Hazel +1 720 508 6231 diane.hazel@coag.gov
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Connecticut, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Delaware, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Hawaii, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Idaho, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Illinois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Iowa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Iowa Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Merrick Miller +1 515 281 5926 +1 515 281 6771 Max.Miller@ag.Iowa.gov
No Logo State of Kansas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Maine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Maryland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Minnesota, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Nebraska, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Nevada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marie W.L. Martin +1 775 624 1244 mwmartin@ag.nv.gov
Space Michelle Christine Newman +1 775 684 1164 mnewman@ag.nv.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucas J. Tucker +1 702 486 3256 +1 702 486 3283 ltucker@ag.nv.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of New Hampshire, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo STATE OF NEW JERSEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State Of New Mexico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of New York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of North Dakota, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Ohio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Oklahoma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Oregon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Rhode Island, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of South Dakota, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Tennessee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Dunbar +1 615 741 3519 +1 615 532 2910 chris.dunbar@ag.tn.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Tennessee Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. David McDowell +1 615 741 7663 +1 615 532 2910 david.mcdowell@ag.tn.gov
No Logo State of Utah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Vermont, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State Of Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40111-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Hanson +1 206 464 5419 amy.hanson@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of West Virginia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo State of Wyoming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
No Logo TERRITORY OF GUAM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bruce Sallet +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 jon.sallet@coag.gov
v.
Google LLC Google LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colette Tyrrell Connor +1 202 434 5000 cconnor@wc.com
Space Benjamin M Greenblum +1 202 434 5919 +1 202 434 5029 bgreenblum@wc.com
Space John E. Schmidtlein +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jschmidtlein@wc.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/17/2020
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
120-cv-03010-APM
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-A
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Colette Connor on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Connor, Colette)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Greenblum, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Schmidtlein on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Schmidtlein, John)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Max Merrick Miller on behalf of STATE OF IOWA (Miller, Max)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dunbar on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (Dunbar, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Betsko on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Betsko, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE. GOOGLE LLC waiver sent on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/15/2021. (Hazel, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by J. David McDowell on behalf of STATE OF TENNESSEE (McDowell, J.) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/18/2020) (zeg).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Marie W.L. Martin on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA (Martin, Marie) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/18/2020) (zeg).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Christine Newman on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA (Newman, Michelle) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/18/2020) (zeg).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas J Tucker on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA (Tucker, Lucas) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/18/2020) (zeg).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Hanson on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Hanson, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Bruce Sallet on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Sallet, Jonathan) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/18/2020) (zeg).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Rebecca Hazel on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO, Diane Rebecca Hazel (Hazel, Diane) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/18/2020) (zeg).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendant shall notify the court on or before January 8, 2021, of how it intends to respond to [3] Plaintiffs' Complaint; (2) the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 19, 2021, which proposes a schedule for this matter in light of its pending consolidation with United States v. Google LLC, 20-cv-3010; (3) the parties shall exchange their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before January 20, 2021; and (4) the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on January 21, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Initial disclosures shall be for attorneys' eyes only until a protective order is in place in this matter or until the court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2020. (lcapm2).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WYOMING, TERRITORY OF GUAM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(eg)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GOOGLE LLC. (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(eg)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Motion to consolidate cases
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WYOMING, TERRITORY OF GUAM (Attachment: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(eg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 20-3010. (eg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/18/2020) (znmw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against GOOGLE LLC filed by STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF MAINE, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF NEVADA, TERRITORY OF GUAM, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF ALASKA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF WYOMING, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Summons)(eg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/17/2020. (eg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Exparte
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exparte MOTION to Seal by STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF MAINE, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF NEVADA, TERRITORY OF GUAM, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF ALASKA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF WYOMING, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK (Attachments: # (1) Public Redacted Complaint, # (2) Complaint, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(eg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?