Pellechia et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 2009-1-CH-002112

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:36 PM DT (2.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brenda Pellechia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Ronald Giaramita +1 718 748 4440 +1 718 748 4272 marygia1@msn.com
No Logo Jeffrey Amato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Ronald Giaramita +1 718 748 4440 +1 718 748 4272 marygia1@msn.com
No Logo Munoz-myers, Moren, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Pellechia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Ronald Giaramita +1 718 748 4440 +1 718 748 4272 marygia1@msn.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Contruction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC, Defendant
No Logo Atlantic-heydt Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Atlantic Heydt Corp."
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation"
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Canron Construction Corp."
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Entech Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "En-Tech Corp."
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Company, Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz Murray Steficek LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P."
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "HP Environmental"
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Group"
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corp., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Plaza Construction Corp."
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Roger Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Contractors, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tully Construction Co., Inc."
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner/Plaza, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, Defendant
No Logo Vallurupalli, Aneal, Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, LLC, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/14/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
Case Type Civil Harassment
Case Status Closed/Inactive
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
cf 4/8/9 lc; Legacy Name = CV Ord AH:Petn/HR; Decision = G; Closed = 04/08/2009
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Order: Restraining Order After Hearing
    cf 3/3/9 lc; Legacy Name = CV Ord AH:Petn/HR; Decision = G; Closed = 03/03/2009
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment
      P/ Granted dlc; cf 2/10/9 lc; Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Hrg & TRO/HR; Decision = G; Closed = 03/05/2009
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Case Designated ECF.
        Case Designated ECF. (laq)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
          CV Case Cover Sheet; Decision = M; Closed = 02/10/2009
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Case Designation
            Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (laq)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Request: Restraining Order
              P/ fees exempt dlc; Legacy Name = CV Req:Orders Stop Harass; Decision = G; Closed = 02/10/2009
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Summons Issued
                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Silverstein Development Corp., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Survivair, Tishman Interiors Corporation, 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Tishman Speyer Properties, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., Turner/Plaza, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, Verizon New York Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties L.L.C., WSP Cantor Seinuk, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 5 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., A Russo Wrecking, ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Company, FTI Trucking, Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., HP Environmental, Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Group, Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Moretrench American Corp., MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Olympic Plumbing & Heating, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Pro Safety Services L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Roger Silman Associates, The City of New York, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corp., Silverstein Contractors, Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties Inc., AMEC Contruction Management, Inc.. (laq)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 67 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?